« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1995-013144
Judge:
Herrod, Michael
File Date:
8/14/1995
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Camroad Properties Limited Partnership
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
RICHARD MACK
Party Name
Performance Plus Mortgage Corporation
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
James C Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1996
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/7/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/29/1995
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/2/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/31/1995
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/1/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 8-21-95
Filing Date
8/14/1995
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
8/15/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/14/1995
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/15/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.