« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1995-008797
Judge:
Herrod, Michael
File Date:
6/2/1995
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Robert A Brown
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jacklyn K Brown
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Fleetwood Of California Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Robert Blesch
Party Name
Beaudry Rv
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Robert Blesch
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1995
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/28/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
11/20/1995
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
11/28/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
W/PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/17/1995
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
10/10/1995
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
10/17/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/1995
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
10/2/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/1995
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
9/18/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/1995
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/12/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THIS CASE SHALL PROCEED TO ARB AS PROVIDED IN THE UNIFORM RULES OF; PROCEDURE FOR ARB
Filing Date
8/25/1995
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
9/14/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO COMPULSORY ARB
Filing Date
8/21/1995
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
8/24/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/21/1995
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/24/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF FILING RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE STMT
Filing Date
8/9/1995
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/14/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF FILING RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE STMT
Filing Date
7/5/1995
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
7/11/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/5/1995
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/6/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
Filing Date
6/28/1995
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
6/30/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3 6-5-95
Filing Date
6/27/1995
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
6/29/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1995
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/29/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/22/1995
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/23/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P4 6-15-95
Filing Date
6/2/1995
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/5/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/2/1995
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/5/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.