« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV1995-008307 Judge: Stephens, Sherry
File Date: 5/24/1995 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Stephen C Herman   Plaintiff  Male  Ronald Meyer 
Frederick Niswander   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Debi J Niswander   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
U S Collections West Inc   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/14/1995  005 - ME: Hearing  9/18/1995   
9/7/1995 8:50:00 AM  JOR - Judgment And Order  9/7/1995 8:50:00 AM   
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion 
8/8/1995  ADE - Application For Default  8/9/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
8/8/1995  AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default  8/9/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
8/8/1995  ADE - Application For Default  8/9/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
8/8/1995  AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default  8/9/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
8/8/1995  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/9/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: BY PUBLICATION 
8/7/1995  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  8/8/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
6/14/1995  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  6/16/1995   
NOTE: P4 6-12-95 
5/24/1995  NOT - Notice  5/25/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS 
5/24/1995  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  5/25/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
5/24/1995  COM - Complaint  5/25/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
  F:Stephen C Herman  $0.00    Judgment And Order   
  A: Frederick Niswander         
click here for Law Library Resource Center