Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV1995-007594 | Judge: | Adleman, Jay |
File Date: | 5/11/1995 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
State Savings Bank Fsb | Plaintiff | None | Michael Cordier |
Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Ken Kriske | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Linda Kriske | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Beazer Homes Sales Arizona Inc | Garnishee Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/16/1996 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 1/3/1997 | |
3/28/1996 | ORD - Order | 4/1/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF CONTINUING LIEN ON NON EXEMPT EARNINGS | |||
3/27/1996 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 4/2/1996 | |
3/15/1996 | APL - Application | 3/19/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: BY JUDG CREDITOR FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN AGAINST GRN | |||
3/6/1996 | ORD - Order | 3/12/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: QUASHING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ON NON EARNINGS | |||
3/4/1996 | NOT - Notice | 3/7/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: JUDGMENT CREDITORS CERTIFICATION OF DELIVERY PURSUANT TO ARS 12-1598.04(D) | |||
2/29/1996 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 3/2/1996 | Garnishee Defendant(7) |
2/27/1996 | MOT - Motion | 3/1/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO QUASH WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ON NONEARNINGS | |||
2/23/1996 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 2/29/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
2/23/1996 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 2/29/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
2/21/1996 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 2/26/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
2/21/1996 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 2/26/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
1/22/1996 4:49:00 PM | JUD - Judgment | 1/22/1996 4:49:00 PM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
1/18/1996 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/23/1996 | |
1/10/1996 | 000 - ME: Minute Entry | 1/17/1996 | |
1/4/1996 | NOT - Notice | 1/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF LODGING OF PROPOSED FORM OF JUDG | |||
1/4/1996 | AFF - Affidavit | 1/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTY FEES | |||
1/4/1996 | APL - Application | 1/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR REASONABLE ATTY FEES AND COSTS | |||
1/4/1996 | STA - Statement | 1/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF COSTS AND NOT/TAXATION | |||
1/4/1996 | AFF - Affidavit | 1/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: REFLECTING COMPUTATION OF INTEREST | |||
12/18/1995 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/19/1995 | |
11/17/1995 | 097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued | 11/21/1995 | |
11/3/1995 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 11/6/1995 | |
10/31/1995 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 11/7/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/31/1995 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 11/7/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/31/1995 | MEM - Memorandum | 11/7/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
10/20/1995 | APL - Application | 10/25/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR ISSUANCE OF CIVIL ARREST WARRANT | |||
10/10/1995 | ORD - Order | 10/12/1995 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY OF RECORD | |||
9/22/1995 | 000 - ME: Minute Entry | 10/6/1995 | |
9/13/1995 | MOT - Motion | 9/18/1995 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY OF RECORD | |||
9/13/1995 | CER - Certificate | 9/18/1995 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS ATTY OF RECORD | |||
8/15/1995 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 8/18/1995 | |
8/10/1995 | STA - Statement | 8/14/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF COSTS & NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
8/10/1995 | AFF - Affidavit | 8/14/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ATTYS FEES | |||
8/10/1995 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 8/14/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
8/9/1995 4:38:00 PM | DJU - Default Judgment | 8/9/1995 4:38:00 PM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
7/11/1995 | ADE - Application For Default | 7/13/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/11/1995 | AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 7/13/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/19/1995 | SUM - Summons | 6/22/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/13/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 6/14/1995 | |
NOTE: P4 AND P6 6-12-95 | |||
6/2/1995 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 6/12/1995 | |
NOTE: AGREEMENT | |||
6/2/1995 | ANS - Answer | 6/6/1995 | Defendant(2) |
5/19/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 5/22/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P2 5-17-95 | |||
5/11/1995 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 5/12/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/11/1995 | COM - Complaint | 5/12/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
F:State Savings Bank Fsb | $732.05 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | |||||
F:State Savings Bank Fsb | $1,795.00 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | |||||
F:State Savings Bank Fsb | $437.28 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | |||||
F:State Savings Bank Fsb | $4,372.77 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | |||||
F:State Savings Bank Fsb | $546.25 | One Time | Default Judgment | ||
A: Ken Kriske | |||||
F:State Savings Bank Fsb | $1,000.00 | One Time | Default Judgment | ||
A: Ken Kriske | |||||
F:State Savings Bank Fsb | $4,372.77 | One Time | Default Judgment | ||
A: Ken Kriske |