Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV1995-006215 | Judge: | Agne, Sara |
File Date: | 4/18/1995 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Action Redi Mix Inc | Plaintiff | None | Joseph McDaniel |
Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Hayes Scott | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Kenneth F Kriske | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Linda Sue Kriske | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/25/1997 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 3/27/1997 | |
3/25/1997 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 5/27/1997 | |
1/21/1997 | 208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar | 1/24/1997 | |
1/20/1997 | 208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar | 1/22/1997 | |
11/27/1995 | ORD - Order | 11/27/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
11/15/1995 | APL - Application | 11/18/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
9/24/1995 | ORD - Order | 9/28/1995 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: RE WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY OF RECORD | |||
9/13/1995 | MOT - Motion | 9/18/1995 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY OF RECORD | |||
9/13/1995 | CER - Certificate | 9/18/1995 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS ATTY OF RECORD | |||
6/14/1995 | ADE - Application For Default | 6/20/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/14/1995 | AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 6/20/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/31/1995 | CAG - Certificate Of Agreement | 6/6/1995 | Defendant(2) |
5/31/1995 | ANS - Answer | 6/1/1995 | Defendant(2) |
5/25/1995 | SUM - Summons | 5/26/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/25/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 5/26/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3 5-23-95 | |||
5/12/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 5/18/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P4,6 5-8-95 | |||
5/12/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 5/18/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P5 5-10-95 | |||
5/12/1995 | SUM - Summons | 5/17/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/12/1995 | SUM - Summons | 5/17/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/1/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 5/2/1995 | |
NOTE: P2 4-27-95 | |||
4/18/1995 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 4/20/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/18/1995 | COM - Complaint | 4/20/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |