« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1994-092370
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
12/19/1994
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michelle Lee Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Richard Gulbrandsen
Party Name
Randy Griffiths
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Donald Fuller
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/1995
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/1/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF DISMISSAL BASED UPON STIP W/ PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/16/1995
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
5/19/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
W/PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/5/1995
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/10/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF SVC OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/24/1995
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/28/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/24/1995
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
2/28/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/16/1995
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/23/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/16/1995
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
2/23/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/28/1994
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/28/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SVD P2 12-20-94
Filing Date
12/19/1994
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
12/20/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/19/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/20/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.