« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1994-020352
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
12/21/1994
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Robert Terrel Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jacob Craig Hamphill
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/1995
Description
344 - ME: Name Change Hearing
Docket Date
1/19/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANT NAME CHANGE TO:JACOB ROBERT HEMPHILL
Filing Date
1/11/1995
Description
OCN - Order Change of Name
Docket Date
1/11/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JACOB ROBERT HEMPHILL
Filing Date
12/21/1994
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
12/23/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF CONSENT
Filing Date
12/21/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/23/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.