« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1994-009823
Judge:
Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer
File Date:
6/24/1994
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Bank Of America Nt & Sa
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
Christopher Perry
Party Name
Gary G Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Barbara Babcock
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William Babcock
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/1994
Description
WRT - Writ
Docket Date
8/30/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF REST
Filing Date
7/15/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe
Docket Date
7/19/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
WRIT REST
Filing Date
7/7/1994 9:17:00 AM
Description
JFD - Judgment Forcible Detainer
Docket Date
7/7/1994 9:17:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/7/1994
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/15/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/1994
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/8/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED P3/4-06-28-94
Filing Date
6/24/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/27/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/7/1994
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Bank Of America Nt & Sa
A: Gary G Hemphill
Amount
$0.00
Frequency
Type
Judgment Forcible Detainer
Status