« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV1994-009488 Judge: Contes, Connie
File Date: 6/21/1994 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
First Deposit National Bank   Plaintiff  None  JEROLD KAPLAN 
Gene Steinberg   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Barbara Steinberg   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/7/1996  CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant  8/8/1996   
NOTE: TIME EXPIRED 
8/7/1996  CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant  8/8/1996   
NOTE: TIME EXPIRED 
10/18/1995  LET - Letter  10/24/1995   
7/19/1995  097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued  7/20/1995   
6/22/1995  ORD - Order  6/26/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: APPEAR IN PERSON & ANSWER CONCERNING DEF'S PROPERTY TO COURT HEARING 
6/22/1995  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/26/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: SERVED/06-18-95 
6/8/1995  MOT - Motion  6/19/1995   
NOTE: F/ORDER REQUIRING JUDG DEBTORS TO APPEAR & ANS CONCERNING PROPERTY 
6/22/1994  NFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment  6/23/1994   
6/21/1994 3:03:00 PM  JUD - Judgment  6/21/1994 3:03:00 PM   
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion 
6/21/1994  AFF - Affidavit  6/23/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: OF MAILING 
6/21/1994  NFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment  6/23/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
6/21/1994  COM - Complaint  6/23/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
  F:First Deposit National Bank  $1,642.67  One Time  Judgment Only   
  A: Gene Steinberg         
click here for Law Library Resource Center