« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1994-008444
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
6/2/1994
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Merry Bradley
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
David Wolf
Party Name
Jimmy Dean Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/1996
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
4/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/1995
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/12/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1994
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/28/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 6-8-94
Filing Date
6/2/1994
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/3/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/2/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/3/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.