Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV1993-015519 Judge: Kemp, Michael
File Date: 7/16/1993 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Carlos Martinez   Plaintiff  Male  Fred Pain 
Heron Properties Inc   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
Woodmar Iv Homeowners Association   Defendant  None  Kathleen Delarosa 
Woodmar Iv Association Inc   Defendant  None  Patrick McGroder 
Woodmar Iv Condominiums Ho Assoc Inc   Defendant  None  Patrick McGroder 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/24/1998  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  3/30/1998  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
3/18/1998  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  3/19/1998  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
2/23/1998  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  2/26/1998   
2/17/1998  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  2/19/1998  Defendant(3)  
2/17/1998  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  2/20/1998   
1/9/1998  029 - ME: Status Conference  1/13/1998   
12/24/1997  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  1/7/1998   
11/20/1997  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  11/24/1997   
11/7/1997  089 - ME: Trial Setting  11/20/1997   
11/7/1997  029 - ME: Status Conference  11/20/1997   
10/17/1997  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  10/21/1997   
10/17/1997  MAN - Order Of Mandate  10/21/1997   
NOTE: & ORDER/REVERSED & REMANDED 
10/15/1997  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  10/17/1997   
10/9/1997  316 - ME: Case Assigned/Reassigned  10/22/1997   
1/28/1997  ORD - Order  2/11/1997   
NOTE: DEMYING APPELLANTS PETITION FOR REVIEW 
4/2/1996  LET - Letter  4/4/1996   
3/25/1996  REC - Receipt  3/27/1996   
3/1/1996  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  3/4/1996   
NOTE: ORDER FOR ORIGINAL RECORD 
12/13/1995  LET - Letter  12/13/1995   
11/3/1995  019 - ME: Ruling  11/13/1995   
11/3/1995  REC - Receipt  11/9/1995   
11/3/1995  LET - Letter  11/9/1995   
10/31/1995  APP - Appeal  10/31/1995   
NOTE: INDEX 
10/10/1995  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  10/17/1995  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: AFF IN LIU OF BOND 
9/21/1995  AFF - Affidavit  9/26/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: IN LIEU OF BOND ON APPEAL 
9/21/1995  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  9/22/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
8/29/1995  049 - ME: Judgment Signed  9/11/1995   
8/25/1995 2:30:00 PM  JUD - Judgment  8/25/1995 2:30:00 PM   
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion 
8/7/1995  STA - Statement  8/8/1995  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: OF COSTS & NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
8/3/1995  019 - ME: Ruling  8/9/1995   
5/26/1995  005 - ME: Hearing  5/31/1995   
5/24/1995  SOF - Statement Of Facts  5/31/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO DEF'S SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF; FACTS 
5/9/1995  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference  5/11/1995   
5/3/1995  NOT - Notice  5/8/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: JOINT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEM & JOINT PRE TRIAL STMT 
4/21/1995  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  4/24/1995   
4/18/1995  REL - Reply  4/25/1995  Defendant(4)  
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF WOODMARS MOT FOR SUM JUDGMENT 
4/18/1995  REP - Report  4/25/1995  Defendant(5)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL STMT OF FACTS 
4/14/1995  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  4/17/1995   
4/11/1995  STP - Stipulation  4/14/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL 
3/24/1995  STA - Statement  4/3/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMM JUDGMNT 
3/24/1995  RES - Response  4/3/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO MOT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
3/24/1995  STP - Stipulation  4/3/1995  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: RE: MOT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
3/9/1995  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  3/16/1995   
3/1/1995  SOF - Statement Of Facts  3/8/1995  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF P3 MOT FOR SUM JUDG 
3/1/1995  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  3/8/1995  Defendant(3)  
2/7/1995  331 - ME: Settlement Conference  2/9/1995   
2/6/1995  NOT - Notice  2/9/1995  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEF WOODMAR IV ASSOC INC'S OFFER OF JGMT TO P1 
1/31/1995  MEM - Memorandum  2/2/1995   
NOTE: SETTLEMENT CONF MEMO OF DEF 
1/3/1995  LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits  1/4/1995  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: OF DEF WOODMAR IV ASSOC INC/FINAL 
11/3/1994  005 - ME: Hearing  11/9/1994   
10/31/1994  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  11/4/1994   
10/24/1994  NOT - Notice  10/25/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: OF SERVICE 
9/30/1994  056 - ME: Hearing Set  10/6/1994   
8/29/1994  089 - ME: Trial Setting  9/8/1994   
8/29/1994  RES - Response  9/2/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO CONTROVERTING CERTIFICATE 
8/25/1994  CCE - Controverting Certificate  8/31/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
8/11/1994  MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness  8/15/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR TRIAL 
8/8/1994  LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits  8/11/1994  Defendant(3)  
7/15/1994  LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits  7/19/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
5/12/1994  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  5/18/1994   
5/10/1994  NSE - Notice Of Service  5/16/1994   
NOTE: OF DEF DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 
3/24/1994  NSE - Notice Of Service  3/25/1994  Defendant(4)  
NOTE: OF RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 
3/17/1994  NSE - Notice Of Service  3/21/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
2/10/1994  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  2/11/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: W/OUT PREJUDICE 
12/23/1993  NOT - Notice  12/29/1993   
NOTE: OF COMPLIANCE RE ARBITRATION 
12/23/1993  ANS - Answer  12/28/1993  Defendant(4)  
NOTE:  
11/19/1993  019 - ME: Ruling  12/2/1993   
11/12/1993  MOT - Motion  11/17/1993   
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS 
10/20/1993  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service  10/25/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: P3 SERVED ON 10-17-93 
9/3/1993  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service  9/7/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: 082793 
7/16/1993  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  7/21/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
7/16/1993  COM - Complaint  7/19/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
  F:Woodmar Iv Homeowners Association  $386.50  One Time  Judgment Only   
  A: Carlos Martinez