« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV1993-010703 Judge: Anderson, Aimee
File Date: 7/6/1993 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff  None  William Holder 
Terry Cooper   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
James Dyer   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/20/1993  ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt  8/25/1993   
8/19/1993  019 - ME: Ruling  8/30/1993   
8/17/1993  RES - Response  8/18/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: MEMORANDUM RE ATTY FEES 
8/4/1993  ANS - Answer  8/10/1993  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: APPELLEES MEMORANDUM RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS MEMORANDUM 
7/16/1993  NOF - Notice Of Filing  7/19/1993   
NOTE: OF CIVIL CASE FILE FROM GLANDALE JC 
7/13/1993  MEM - Memorandum  7/14/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
7/12/1993  NOT - Notice  7/14/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: OF APPEAL 
7/6/1993  NOT - Notice  7/8/1993   
NOTE: OF RECEIPT/FROM GLENDALE JC 7-08-93 
7/6/1993  NOT - Notice  7/8/1993   
NOTE: OF RECEIPT/FROM GLENDALE JC 6-29-93 
7/6/1993  999 - Other  7/8/1993   
NOTE: JC DOCKET; CLERK'S CERTIFICATION-------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR CT PLEADINGS---------------------------- 
6/6/1993  EXH - Exhibit  7/14/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center