« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV1993-010083 Judge: LeMaire, Kerstin
File Date: 6/24/1993 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
McCormick Ranch Property Owner Assoc   Plaintiff  None  Mikki Yitzchaki 
Jeffrey L Campbell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Nancy J Campbell   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
City Of Phoenix   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
Arizona Dept Of Revenue   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
City Of Glendale   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
First National Bank Of Arizona   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
United States Internal Revenue Serv   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
City Of Mesa   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
Custom Extrusions Inc   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
U S Collections West Inc   Defendant  None  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/19/1994  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  5/23/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
5/19/1994  ORD - Order  5/23/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: THAT PLA SHALL NOT SEEK THE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST ARIZONA DEPT OF REVENUE 
5/13/1994  022 - ME: Order Signed  5/20/1994   
5/3/1994  STP - Stipulation  5/9/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
4/8/1994  SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment  4/12/1994  Defendant(4)  
4/5/1994  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  4/19/1994   
3/31/1994  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/8/1994   
NOTE: P6 SERVED 3-29-94 
3/31/1994  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service  4/8/1994   
NOTE: P11 SERVED 3-28-94 
3/31/1994  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/8/1994   
NOTE: P4 SERVED 3-29-94 
3/31/1994  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/8/1994   
NOTE: P5 SERVED 3-29-94 
3/31/1994  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/8/1994   
NOTE: P8 SERVED 3-29-94 
3/31/1994  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/8/1994   
NOTE: P10 SERVED 3-28-94 
3/31/1994  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/8/1994   
NOTE: P7 SERVED 3-28-94 
3/30/1994  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/7/1994   
NOTE: P9 SERVED 3-29-94 
3/25/1994  AMC - Amended Complaint  3/30/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
3/25/1994  PRA - Praecipe  3/28/1994  Plaintiff(1)  
7/20/1993  ADE - Application For Default  7/22/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
7/20/1993  ADE - Application For Default  7/22/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
7/20/1993  AFF - Affidavit  7/22/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
7/20/1993  EDE - Entry Of Default  7/22/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
6/28/1993  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service  6/30/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: 062593 
6/24/1993  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  6/25/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
6/24/1993  COM - Complaint  6/24/1993  Plaintiff(1)  
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center