« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Reamer, Elizabeth
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Parker, R J
Judge
Cohen
Case #
CR2015-102066-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
Clase, Colleen
Judge
Case #
CR2015-102066-001
Party Name
B Victim - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2015-102066-001
Party Name
B Victim - (5)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
Gattuso, Jessica
Judge
Case #
CR2015-102066-001
Party Name
B Victim - (6)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
Gattuso, Jessica
Judge
Case #
CR2015-102066-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
11/8/1992
Date
1/23/2015
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
11/8/1992
Date
1/23/2015
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
9/21/1993
Date
1/23/2015
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
11/8/1992
Date
1/23/2015
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
9/21/1993
Date
1/23/2015
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
9/21/1993
Date
1/23/2015
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
11/8/1992
Date
4/12/2023
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Court
Disposition
Guilty By Court
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
9/21/1993
Date
4/12/2023
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Court
Disposition
Guilty By Court
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
11/8/1992
Date
4/12/2023
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Court
Disposition
Guilty By Court
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
9/21/1993
Date
4/12/2023
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Court
Disposition
Guilty By Court
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
11/8/1992
Date
4/12/2023
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Court
Disposition
Guilty By Court
Party Name
Bryan Patrick Miller
Crime Date
9/21/1993
Date
4/12/2023
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Court
Disposition
Guilty By Court
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
9/8/2023
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Notice of Appeal from Superior Court
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW
TRIAL
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTED COUNSEL ATTONERY GENERAL
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
8/4/2023
Description
067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION ORDER
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION
FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION REGARDING
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL MINUTE ENTRY/ DEATH SENTENCE/ DAY 71
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion for a New Trial
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL, HEARING
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PENALTY PHASE INSTSRUCTIONS
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTED PENALTY PHASE INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
5/21/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER EVIDENCE RE: VM
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE RE: SEWARD'S REBUTTAL TESTIMONY
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE OTHER ACT REBUTTAL EVIDENCE (PENALTY PHASE)
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE AND OR
LIMIT THE CUMULATIVE TESTIMONY OF
DEFENSE EXPERT WITNESS
CUNNINGHAM
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE AND OR
LIMIT THE CUMULATIVE TESTIMONY OF
DEFENSE EXPERT WITNESS
CUNNINGHAM
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRAFT 2 AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
signed
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGGRAVATION PHASE DRAFT 1
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OFFER OF PROOF RE: SURREBUTTAL TESTIMONY
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUILT PHASE FINAL
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
RMM - Response to Motion to Modify Sentencing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF STATEMENTS
MADE TO DR. GARBY
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2023
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR LIMITED
SURREBUTTAL
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR LIMITED
SURREBUTTAL
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF
STATEMENTS MADE TO DR. GARBY
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST RE TRIAL SCHEDULING
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR LIMITED SURREBUTTAL
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE CUMULATIVE TESTIMONY OF DIAGNOSES BY DR. SEWARD
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. SEWARDS THIRD REPORT
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SET COURT ORDERED INTERVIEW OF DR. SEWARD
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION TO PRECLUDE USE OF NOTES
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE USE OF NOTES
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TESTIMONY OF CYNTHIA ELLIOT
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE
USE OF DR. CUNNINGHAM’S INTERVIEWS
DURING CROSS-EXAMINATION
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE USE OF DR. CUNNINGHAM'S INTERVIEWS DURING CROSS EXAMINATION
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ALLOW STATES EXPERTS TO REVIEW PRIOR TESTIMONY
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW STATE’S EXPERTS TO
REVIEW PRIOR TESTIMONY
Filing Date
12/19/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PLAY STATE’S
INTERVIEW OF PINKY
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST
FOR THE COURT TO REVIEW STATE
INTERVIEW OF DR. BRAND
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO
REVIEW STATE INTERVIEW OF DR.
BRAND
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PLAY STATE INTERVIEW WITH PINKY
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RENEWED MOTION TO PERMIT USE OF THE 08-08-22 POWERPOINT SLIDES
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE 6
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDENTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATES REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE RE WITNESS TESTIMONY: MENNO YODER
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
IN LIMINE 6: OBJECTION TO STATE
ARGUING “SEMEN” WAS IDENTIFIED ON
VAGINAL SWAB RE MS. BROSSO
Filing Date
11/23/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE’S REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATES REBUTTAL WITNESS
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE
HEARSAY TESTIMONY RE: DEFENDANT’S
DAUGHTER’S MENTAL HEALTH AND
DIAGNOSES
Filing Date
11/14/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR LIMITING INSTRUCTION RE ORAL SWABS AND INCONCLUSIVE DNA RESULTS
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. SEWARD'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE 6: OBJECTION TO STATE ARGUING "SEMEN" WAS IDENTIFIED ON VAGINAL SWABS RE MS. BROSSO
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY BASED ON PREINDICTMENT DELAY
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF REBUTTAL
WITNESSES TO NGRI DEFENSE
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF REBUTTAL
WITNESSES TO NGRI DEFENSE
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
RECONSIDER TESTIMONY OF
WITNESS DANIELLE YALDEN
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR.
SEWARD’S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT
TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY BASED UPON
PRE-INDICTMENT DELAY
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request To Disclose Counseling Records
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR.
SEWARD’S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD IN SUPPORT OF ORAL MOTION FOR MISTRIAL AND REQUEST FR DEPOSITION ORDERS
Filing Date
10/14/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Supplement Record in Support of Oral Motion for Mistrial and Request for Deposition Orders
Filing Date
10/14/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Supplement Record in Support of Oral Motion for Mistrial and Request for Deposition Orders
Filing Date
10/14/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR ON RECORD APPROVAL OF
INSANITY DEFENSE
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE 4: OBJECTION TO
MEDICAL EXAMINER TESTIMONY
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion In Limine 3: Objection To Legal Conclusion
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE 5: DR. CUNNINGHAM’S
REVIEW NOTES
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM RE STATE’S
REQUEST FOR RECORD ON
INSANITY DEFENSE
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
019 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
10/7/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Supplement Record in Support of Oral Motion for Mistrial and Request for Deposition Orders
Filing Date
10/7/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO MOTION TO LIMIT TESTIMONY
FROM CIVILIAN WITNESSES DURING
GUILT PHASE
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO MOTION TO LIMIT TESTIMONY
FROM CIVILIAN WITNESSES DURING
GUILT PHASE
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/27/2022
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/27/2022
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO LIMIT
TESTIMONY FROM CIVILIAN WITNESSES
DURING GUILT PHASE
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE 2: VICTIM TESTIMONY
IN PHASE 1
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH
PENALTY DUE TO PREINDICTMENT
DELAY
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE RE DR.
CUNNINGHAM’S ANTICIPATED
TESTIMONY
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY to MOTION FOR EXPERT WITNESS
NOTES
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXPERT WITNESS NOTES
Filing Date
9/25/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
USE NEW OTHER ACT EVIDENCE.
Filing Date
9/25/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
FOR EXPERT NOTES
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXPERT WITNESS NOTES
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO
EDIT EXPERT WITNESSES 722 PAGE
POWERPOINT
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE NEW OTHER
ACT INFORMATION
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE
OF EXPERT NOTES: DR. SEWARD
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO LIMIT TESTIMONY FROM
CIVILIAN WITNESSES DURING GUILT
PHASE
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION RE DR. SEWARD’S ONGOING
WORK
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO
DISCLOSE EXPERT INTERVIEWS
AND REPORT
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S TENTH
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE
OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE ALLEGED STATEMENTS PERTAINING TO OFFENSE AGAINST VM
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE
RE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR NOTICE: SCOPE OF
DR. SEWARD’S TESTIMONY
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NINTH
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE
OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Raw data and testing materials
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
For raw data and testing materials
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
For raw data and testing materials
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
For raw data and testing materials
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
For raw data and testing materials
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
For raw data and testing materials
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
For raw data and testing materials
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOW DR. LORING TO TESTIFY VIRTUALLY DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/1/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDAN’T OBJECTION TO
DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE EXPERT
RAW DATA AND TESTING
THROUGH A THIRD-PARTY
EXPERT
Filing Date
9/1/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO DISCLOSURE OF
DEFENSE EXPERT RAW DATA AND
TESTING THROUGH A THIRDPARTY
EXPERT
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION
TO DISCLOSURE OF RAW DATA THROUGH
DR. SEWARD
Filing Date
8/28/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO THE
STATE’S MOTION FOR IN PERSON
INTERVIEW AND TESTIMONY OF
ALL EXPERTS
RE: DR WELLER
Filing Date
8/26/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO THE STATE'S MOTION FOR IN PERSON INTERVIEW AND TESTIMONY OF ALL EXPERTS RE: DR LORING
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to permit disclosure to experts re defense interviews with state experts
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION TO DISCLOSE
TESTING MATERIALS
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARILY UNSEALING EXHIBITS FROM 08/29/2019 EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR IN PERSON TESTIMONY
AND INTERVIEW OF ALL DEFENSE
EXPERTS
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE DEFENSE INTENT FOR MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS TO CONTINUE TO REVIEW NEW MATERIAL TO FORM EVOLVING OPINIONS (IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED)
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER RE DR. CUNNINGHAM’S SLIDES
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE UNDER A
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE – DEFENSE INTENT FOR MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS TO CONTINUE TO REVIEW NEW MATERIAL TO FORM EVOLVING OPINIONS (IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED)
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE RE DR. CUNNINGHAM’S
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CONTINUED VIOLATION OF
COURT ORDER AND MOTION TO
PRECLUDE
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO NON-PARTY OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF DCS RECORDS
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Motion to Preclude Dr. Brand
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE AND REQUEST TO RECONSIDER RE: OTHER ACT EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Reconsider the Courts Ruling Precluding Phase 1 Experts
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
FOR 8-12-22
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY: APA RESOLUTION AGAINST IMPOSITION OF DEATH AS A PENALTY FOR PERSONS AGED 18 THROUGH 20
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss the Death Penalty: Emotional Immaturity at Time of Offenses
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. LORING
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FILE NON-PARTY OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. BRAND
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE AND REQUEST TO RECONSIDER RE: OTHER ACT EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/20/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
023 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
7/20/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF DCS MENTAL HEALTH RECORD OF WITNESS AMY MILLER/LOVINGS
Filing Date
7/20/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRODUCE DCS RECORDS
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE
DR. LORING
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. LORING
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNSUCESSFUL ATTEMPT
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER
PRECLUSION OF PHASE I EXPERTS AND
MOTION TO PRECLUDE FOR UNTIMELY
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED WITNESS MICHAEL HUENEKE WILL APPEAR FOR A RECORDED INTERVIEW
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED
INTERVIEW
Filing Date
6/8/2022
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SND
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response of the First Amendment Coalition of Arizona and 3TV/CBS5 to (a)Crime Victims Objection to Media Coverage of Trial and (b) Defendants Sixth Renewed Objection to Video Cameras or, in the Alternative to Limit Coverage During Trial
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE COURT’S RULING PRECLUDING PHASE 1 EXPERTS
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIMS’ OBJECTION TO
MEDIA COVERAGE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIXTH RENEWED OBJECTION TO VIDEO CAMERAS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO LIMIT COVERAGE DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
FOR 5-9-22
Filing Date
4/21/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE REQUESTED TESTS AND RAW DATA BE DISCLOSED TO DR. ELIZABETH KOLHEPP, MD
Filing Date
4/21/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/20/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTIES CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES’ AMDENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO
DISCLOSE TESTS AND RAW DATA
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISCLOSE MCMI-IV TEST RESULTS AND DATA
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISCLOSE MMPI-IV TEST RESULTS AND DATA
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES’ REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO
DISCLOSE PSYCHOLOGICAL TEST
REPORTS, RESULTS AND RAW DATA TO
ELIZABETH KOLHEPP, M.D.
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO DISCLOSE
PSYCHOLOGICAL MMPI-IV TEST
REPORTS, RESULTS AND RAW DATA TO
ELIZABETH KOLHEPP, M.D.
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
3/9/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE
EXPERT AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI
DEFENSE
Filing Date
3/3/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND AMENDED INDICTMENT
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF TRIAL BY JURY
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S EIGHTH
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE
OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDICTMENT (AMENDED)
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE: EXPERT AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING SECOND MOTION TO DISCLOSE TESTS AND RAW DATA
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF VICTIM STATEMENT
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S LETTER TO COURT FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 02/04/2022
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SECOND MOTION TO DISCLOSE
TESTS AND RAW DATA
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S UPDATED NOTICE OF EXPERT HEALTH STATUS
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DR. KIRBY PSYCHOLOGICAL SERVICES, PLLC EVALUATION
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Status Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISCLOSE TESTS AND RAW DATA
Filing Date
1/29/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Crime Victims Request for Enforcement of Their Constitutional Right to a Speedy Trial
Filing Date
1/28/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE REQUESTED TESTS AND RAW DATA BE DISCLOSED TO THE STATE
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTON TO SET HEARING TO DETERMINE
EXPERT REPORT SCHEDULE
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF EXPERT HEALTH STATUS AND IMPLICATIONS
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
1/5/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
docket code 926 - document titled under advisement ruling
Filing Date
1/4/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Request for Burden of Proof in Competency Hearing
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/09/21
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/08/21
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/08/21
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/09/21
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/09/21
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/09/21
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/09/21
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/12/09/21
Filing Date
12/13/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR BURDEN OF
PROOF IN COMPETENCY HEARING
Filing Date
12/8/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR BURDEN OF
PROOF IN COMPETENCY
HEARING
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPOINT AN EXPERT
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED
EXPERT ON GUILTY EXCEPT INSANE
Filing Date
10/27/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to Motion for Court Appointed Expert
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT APPOINTED EXPERT
FOR NOT GUILTY BY REASON OF
INSANITY DEFENSE
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 COMPETENCY EVALUATION BY KEVIN HURLEY
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO FILE DEFENDANT'S CONFIDENTIAL ATTACHMENTS TO RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER SUBMITTED BY JOHN R. WALKER
Filing Date
9/30/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 COMPETENCY EVALUATION BY JOHN R. WALKER
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER SUBMITTED BY DR. HURLEY
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE
GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE
GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF EX PARTE PLEADING
RE: CONFIDENTIAL ATTACHMENT
TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE
GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
9/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE NOT GUILTY BY
REASON OF INSANITY DEFENSE
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Fifth Renewed Objection to Video Cameras and Photography or In The Alternative to Limit Coverage During Court Hearings
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
FOR VICTIMS AND
ASSERTION OF VICTIMS’
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Disclosure: Phase 1 Witnesses
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT PLAN
FOR 8-18-21
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR QUALIFIED EXPERTS
AND FUNDING RE COMPETENCY
DETERMINATION
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO CRIME VICTIMS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
8/5/2021
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOURTH RENEWED OBJECTION TO CAMERA REQUEST
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIMS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE AND
PRODUCE MCSO VIDEO RECORDING
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/21/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/21/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF DEFENSE: INSANITY
Filing Date
7/21/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR
DETERMINATION OF
COMPETENCY
Filing Date
7/16/2021
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE: RILE 404(B) EVIDENCE TO PROVE INTENT, PLAN, MOTIVE
Filing Date
6/7/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Complex Case Management Report 6-4-21
Filing Date
5/17/2021
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE: RULE 404(B) EVIDENCE TO PROVE INTENT, PLAN, MOTIVE
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION DATED 03/03/2021
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DATED 03/18/2021
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO FILE MOTION
EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/2/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIMS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
1/15/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST THAT
STATE CLARIFY THEIR NOTICE TO
INTRODUCE 404(B) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
1/13/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/8/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/7/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/23/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE RE: RULE 404 (B)
EVIDENCE TO PROVE INTENT, PLAN,
MOTIVE
Filing Date
12/17/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2020
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO
DEFENSE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5
AND 6
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2020
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE “UNRELIABLE” TESTIMONY ON FORENSIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5 AND 6
Filing Date
9/28/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 5 AND 6 OF THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
9/24/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO
RESPOND TO THE DEFENSE MOTION TO
PRECLUDE TESTIMONY ON FORENSIC
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/18/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
SUPPRESS DNA EVIDENCE
RESULTING FROM UNLAWFUL
SEARCH AND SEIZURE
Filing Date
9/18/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Suppress Statements
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIMS’ REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER POINT TWO OF RULING BY MINUTE ENTRY DATED AUGUST 10, 2020
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Preclude Unreliable Testimony on Forensic Evidence
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
9/9/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO CRIME
VICTIMS’ MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Filing Date
8/28/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance with Courts Order Re Substantive Motions
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
TO SUPPRESS DNA EVIDENCE RESULTING
FROM UNLAWFUL SEARCH AND SEIZURE
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIMS MOTION TO RECONSIDER POINT TWO OF RULING BY MINUTE ENTRY DATED AUGUST 10, 2020
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
TO SUPPRESS DNA EVIDENCE RESULTING
FROM UNLAWFUL SEARCH AND SEIZURE
Filing Date
8/19/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
DEFENDANT MADE TO POLICE
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE
MOTIONS
Filing Date
8/13/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO
EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
8/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
8/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Suppress DNA Evidence Resulting from Unlawful Search and Seizure
Filing Date
8/6/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing: Exhibits to Defendants Motion to Suppress DNA Evidence Resulting from Unlawful Search and Seizure
Filing Date
8/6/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
8/4/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIMS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO LIMIT VICTIM IMPACT STATEMENTS
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/22/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
chronis hearing UA findings
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIME VICTIMS REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
UA FINDINGS (PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND MOTION TO DISMISS)
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
7/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/9/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
UA RULING - DEF'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE ESPECIALLY CRUEL, HEINOUS OR DEPRAVED AGG FACTOR
Filing Date
7/6/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO THE
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
TO LIMIT VICTIM IMPACT
STATEMENTS
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH
PENALTY FOR INABILITY TO RECEIVE
INDIVIDUALIZED SENTENCE
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND THE
INDICTMENT
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO LIMIT VICTIM IMPACT
STATEMENTS
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
6/24/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO FILE MS BENTLEYS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Memorandum Re: Cruelty Aggravator
Filing Date
6/19/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sheriffs Response to Defendants Motion Objecting to the Use of Physical Restraints at Trial
Filing Date
6/18/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2020
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MEMORANDUM RE: CRUELTY
AGGRAVATOR
Filing Date
6/17/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S CONFIDENTIAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO LIMIT
VICTIM IMPACT STATEMENTS
Filing Date
6/14/2020
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for Extension of Time: Substantive Motions Deadline
Filing Date
6/12/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY
FOR INABILITY TO RECEIVE
INDIVIDUALIZED SENTENCE
Filing Date
6/8/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST TO AMEND NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY AND
NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS
Filing Date
6/5/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF’S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION OBJECTING TO THE USE OF PHYSICAL RESTRAINTS AT TRIAL
Filing Date
6/2/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Waive Defendants Presence for 6-9-20 Hearing
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO STRIKE THE ESPECIALLY
CRUEL, HEINOUS OR DEPRAVED
AGGRAVATING FACTOR
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Strike the Especially Cruel, Heinous or Depraved Aggravating Factor
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST DATED 05/19/2020
Filing Date
5/19/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
TO SEVER
Filing Date
5/12/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE MS.BENTLEY'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/12/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
THE DEATH PENALTY BASED ON CJP
DATA AND FINDINGS
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION
OBJECTING TO THE USE OF
PHYSICAL RESTRAINTS AT TRIAL
Filing Date
5/5/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS STATE’S
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK
DEATH PENALTY BASED UPON
CJP DATA
Filing Date
5/5/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SEVER
OFFENSES
Filing Date
4/30/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Death Penalty Based on Age at Time of Offenses
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS DEATH PENALTY BASED
ON CJP DATA AND FINDINGS
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Motion to Dismiss Death Penalty Based on CJP Data and Findings
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING
RE: Notice of Unconstitutionality
Filing Date
4/21/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
THE DEATH PENALTY BASED ON
CJP DATA AND FINDINGS
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/8/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FO DISCOVERY
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/7/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Complex Case Management Plan
Filing Date
4/3/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S UNDER SEAL MOTION TO PRECLUDE IRRELEVANT AND PRJUDICIAL 404(C) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/3/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S UNDER SEAL MOTION RE 404(C) CLARIFICTION
Filing Date
4/2/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS DEATH PENALTY BASED
ON AGE
Filing Date
3/26/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Mitigation Impairment
Filing Date
3/26/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING: EXHIBITS TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
THE DEATH PENALTY BASED ON
AGE AT TIME OF OFFENSES
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss the Death Penalty Based on Age at Time of Offenses
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/11/2020
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Requested Modification to Capital Case Sentencing Instruction 2.3
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SEVENTH SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE
OBJECTING TO MEDICAL
EXAMINER TESTIMONY ON
ULTIMATE ISSUE
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO INTRODUCE CHARACTER TRAIT
OF ACTING WITHOUT REFLECTION
Filing Date
10/31/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DISMISS STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
10/31/2019
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2019
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/18/2019
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY DATED 10/15/2019
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE DATED 09/30/2019
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ASSERT MARITAL COMMUNICATIONS PRIVELEGE AS TO THE TESTIMONY OF AMY MILLER
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER ADVISEMENT RULING RE:404
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Filing
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Plan
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for a Chronis Hearing
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance With Order Re Mitigation Witnesses
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Document under Seal
Filing Date
9/27/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to File Defendants Confidential Memorandum Under Seal and Ex Parte
Filing Date
9/24/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/9/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE RE: MARITAL PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
9/5/2019
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2019
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING JURISIDICTION, GRANTING MOTION TO ACCEPT EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL, AND DENYING MOTION TO STAY
Filing Date
9/5/2019
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2019
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO STATE'S NOTICE OF RULE 404(B) AND 404(C) OTHER ACT EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/02/19
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST DATED 07/26/19
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ASSERT MARITAL
COMMUNICATIONS PRIVILEGE AS TO THE
TESTIMONY OF AMY MILLER
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Pursue Special Action Relief
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST FOR STAY
Filing Date
7/30/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM RE CASE LAW GOVERNING CAPITAL JURY SELECTION
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE STATEMENTS RE CHILD PORNOGRAPHY BY WITNESS AMY LOVINGS
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2019
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION
Filing Date
6/17/2019
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
5/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
5/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S CONFIDENTIAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/26/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 03/15/2019
Filing Date
3/4/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Plan
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE THE MARCH 1, 2019 EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF RULE 404(b) AND 404(c)EVIDENCE AT TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
1/10/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Sixth Supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
12/27/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12-19-18
Filing Date
12/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 12/10/18
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO CLARIFY THE COURTS SEPTEMBER 26, 2018 RULING ON THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE REGARDING VK
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Plan
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
10/22/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT TO CONFIDENTIAL MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/26/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/26/18
Filing Date
9/21/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF OTHER ACT AND STATEMENT EVIDENCE OF THE DEFENDANT UNDER 404(B) AND 404(C)
Filing Date
9/19/2018
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
TRULY BIFURCATED CAPITAL
TRIAL
Filing Date
9/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF ALL CHARACTER OR OTHER ACT EVIDENCE THE STATE INTENDS TO USE DURING ANY PHASE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
9/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE STATEMENT OF WITNESS AMY LOVINGS
Filing Date
9/12/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF 404 EVIDENCE IN THE FORM OF TESTIMONY OF WITNESS AMY LOVINGS
Filing Date
9/7/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/30/18
Filing Date
8/30/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED 8/30/18
Filing Date
8/30/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE SUBMITTED 08/29/18
Filing Date
8/29/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/24/18
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE DURING THE PENALTY STAGE
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO THE STATE'S RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE OF VM DURING THE PENALTY PHASE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Fifth Supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Plan
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MEMO RE TESTIMONY OF
DR. FOGLIA
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Truly Bifurcated Capital Trial
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE DURING THE PENALTY STAGE
Filing Date
8/2/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE VM TESTIMONY
Filing Date
7/30/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/24/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for Appointment of Special Master
Filing Date
7/23/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/23/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO THE STATES RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE STATE FROM INTRODUCTING OTHER ACT EVIDENCE OF VK DURING THE PENALTY PHASE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS THE ALLEGATIONS OF
DANGEROUSNESS ON
ALTERNATIVE COUNTS 1
AND 2 (FELONY MURDER)
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion in Limine to Prohibit the State from Arguing or Implying the Law Requires a Death Sentence
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND RENEWED OBJECTION TO
VIDEO CAMERAS AND
PHOTOGRAPHS OR, IN THE
ALTERNATIVE, TO LIMIT
COVERAGE, DURING COURT
HEARINGS
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT
THE STATE FROM ARGUING OR
IMPLYING “THE LAW REQUIRES”
A DEATH SENTENCE
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Memorandum Re Voir Dire
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE STATE FROM INTRODUCING OTHER ACT EVIDENCE OF VM DURING THE PENALTY PHASE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE STATE FROM INTRODUCING OF VK DURING THE PENALTY PHASE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS ALLEGATION OF DANGEROUSNESS
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT STATE FROM ARGUING OR IMPLYING “THE LAW REQUIRES” A DEATH SENTENCE
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE DEATH NOTICE OR STRIKE CAPITAL JURY INSTRUCTION LANGUAGE
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ADVISE AND INSTRUCT PROSPECTIVE JURORS ON UNCONSCIOUS BIAS
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE DURING THE PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
6/29/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Strike the States Notice of Intent, or in the Alternative to Strike Unconstitutional Language from Capital Jury Instructions
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss the Allegations of Dangerousness on Alternative Counts 1 and 2 (Felony Murder)
Filing Date
6/25/2018
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion in Limine to Prohibit the State from Arguing or Implying "The Law Requires" a Death Sentence
Filing Date
6/25/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ADVISE
AND INSTRUCT PROSPECTIVE
JURORS ON UNCONSCIOUS BIAS
Filing Date
6/25/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing: Attachments to Defendants Motion to Advise and Instruct Prospective Jurors on Unconscious Bias
Filing Date
6/15/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Clarification of the Defendants Position Regarding the Interview of Commissioner McLaughlin
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF MODIFIED
TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER FROM DCS DATED 05/09/2018
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
(TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL)
Filing Date
5/4/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2018
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISK
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TP DEFENDANT'S
MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/24/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 04/23/18
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/5/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR WITNESS INTERVIEW
Filing Date
4/4/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS REGARDING TESTIMONY RE: VICTIMS OF UNCHARGED CRIMES
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR 404(B) NOTICE AND EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE WITNESS V.K.
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON THE ADMISSIBILITY OF PROPOSED WITNESS V.M.'S TESTIMONY
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Response to Request for Witness Interview
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Commissioner McLaughlins Response to Defendants Motion to Order Disclosure of Ex Parte Communication
Filing Date
3/14/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Apply Version of A.R.S. §13-752(G) that was in Effect at Time of Offenses
Filing Date
3/13/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
3/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MS. BENTLEY’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE PAST THE PERIOD PRESCRIBED BY THE RULES OF PROCEDURE
Filing Date
3/13/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NonParty Response and Objection to Judicial Interview Demand
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO
INTERVIEW WITNESS RANDALL
MCGLADE
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION RE FORENSIC EVIDENCE TESTING
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Extension of Time
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Victim and Assertion of Victims Constitutional Rights
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPLY VERSION OF A.R.S. §13-752(G) THAT WAS IN EFFECT AT TIME OF OFFENSES
Filing Date
1/3/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR WITNESS
INTERVIEW
Filing Date
12/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
11/29/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
11/9/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Apply Version of A.R.S. 13-752(G) That was in Effect at Time of Offenses
Filing Date
11/3/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/02/17
Filing Date
10/4/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING ORDER FOR UNREDACTED RECORDS
Filing Date
9/20/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY TO FILE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/14/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Department of Child Safetys Motion to File Motion for Clarification Under Seal
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/08/2017
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED 08/07/2017
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST SUBMITTED 08/07/2017
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/08/2017
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST SUBMITTED 08/07/2017
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED 08/07/2017
Filing Date
7/19/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY CHART - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Report
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/28/17
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DATED 06/28/17
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION DATED 06/27/17
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Preserve and Produce MCSO Video Recording and Documentation Relating to Search of Defendants Cell
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/14/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION SUBMITTED 04/10/17
Filing Date
4/11/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED 04/11/17
Filing Date
4/5/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Continuance of trial
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY CHART
Filing Date
3/6/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/6/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER DISCLOSURE OF EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS MADE DURING JANUARY 14, 2015 INITIAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING THE STATE'S NOTICE TO ADMIT EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B)
Filing Date
1/30/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Report
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY CHART
Filing Date
11/18/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CONTINUING NOTICE OF OTHER ACT EVIDENCE UNDER 404(B) AND 404(C)
Filing Date
11/16/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/27/2016
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION FILED 10/25/2016
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED 10/25/2016
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/12/16
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED 10/12/16
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION SUBMITTED 10/12/16
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL REPLY TO STATES FINAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5
Filing Date
9/1/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S FINAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5
Filing Date
8/31/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
8/15/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2016
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ADDENDUM TO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY CHART
Filing Date
7/26/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE DNA EVIDENCE AND BIOLOGICAL TESTING AND ANALYSIS
Filing Date
7/20/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 07/07/16
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FILED JULY 7, 2016
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FILED JULY 7, 2016
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance
Filing Date
5/23/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY CHART
Filing Date
5/19/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Case Management Report
Filing Date
4/20/2016
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2016
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS CO-
COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/18/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: VIDEO
Filing Date
2/12/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRESERVE AND PRODUCE MCSO VIDEO RECORDING
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 5
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO FILED ATTACHED MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE STORED PACKED DR FITZPATRICK AND CANAL LIST SPREADSHEET
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY CHART
Filing Date
2/10/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF ANY “OTHER ACT” EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for Discovery Re DNA and/or Biological Testing and/or Analysis
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY CHART
Filing Date
12/14/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/30/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITNESSES AND MITIGATING FACTORS
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/12/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8/7/15
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND FOR A NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
7/10/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Filing Date
7/10/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
6/23/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2015
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2015
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK DEATH PENALTY AND NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS
Filing Date
5/12/2015
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion for Specific Discovery
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.1(I)(1) ARCP STIPULATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/6/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED REDACTIONS
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
AND SEAL THE REMAND MOTION
Filing Date
4/14/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REMAND FOR A NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
4/9/2015
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/9/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 4/9/15
Filing Date
4/9/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO APPLICATION OF
PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC. TO
INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED
PURPOSE OF SECURING AN ORDER
TO UNSEAL SEARCH WARRANT
RECORDS
Filing Date
4/1/2015
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Application of Phoenix Newspapers, Inc. to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Securing an Order to Unseal Search Warrant Records
Filing Date
3/27/2015
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO
APPLICATION OF PHOENIX
NEWSPAPERS, INC. TO INTERVENE
FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF
SECURING AN ORDER TO UNSEAL
SEARCH WARRANT RECORDS
Filing Date
3/24/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand to the Grand Jury Pursuant to Rule 12.9 of the Arizona Rules of Criminal Procedure (Second Request)
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC.’s MOTION TO INTERVENE TO UNSEAL SEARCH WARRANT RECORDS
Filing Date
3/16/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2015
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO
CONTINUE IPTC ONE DAY
Filing Date
3/13/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST TO DISCLOSE SW
RECORDS TO DEFENSE COUNSEL AND
REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO
RESPOND TO PHOENIX NEWSPAPER
REQUEST TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
3/4/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC. TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF SECURING AN ORDER TO UNSEAL SEARCH WARRANT RECORDS
Filing Date
3/3/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PNI’S
REQUEST TO UNSEAL SEARCH
WARRANT RECORDS AT THE
PRESENT TIME
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2015
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Renewed Objection to Video Cameras and Photographs or, in the Alternative, to Limit Coverage, During Court Hearings
Filing Date
2/18/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO ASSIST MITIGATION INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
2/18/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT ORDER
Filing Date
2/18/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 2/18/2015
Filing Date
2/18/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF
Filing Date
2/17/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
2/17/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
/PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
2/17/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION OF PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC. TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF SECURING AN ORDER TO UNSEAL SEARCH WARRANT RECORDS
Filing Date
2/12/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand to the Grand Jury Pursuant to Rule 12.9 of the Arizona Rules of Criminal Procedure
Filing Date
2/6/2015
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR
ALLEGATION OF DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
2/2/2015
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Not Bailable As A Matter of Right
Filing Date
2/2/2015
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2015
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to Video Cameras and Photographs or, in the Alternative, to Limit Coverage, During Court Hearings
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF BUCCAL SWABS
Filing Date
1/22/2015
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/22/2015
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2015
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/21/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
1/20/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance
Filing Date
1/20/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Invocation Of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/14/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
1/21/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/23/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/2/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/6/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/23/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/24/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/10/2015
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/24/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/27/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/12/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/7/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/21/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/30/2015
Time
8:3
Event
Trial
Date
10/9/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/29/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/15/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/11/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/14/2016
Time
8:50
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/15/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/20/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/27/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2016
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/23/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/18/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/20/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/27/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/7/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/29/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/19/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/28/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/9/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/16/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/6/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/30/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/1/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/20/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/17/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/24/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/14/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/10/2018
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/22/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/29/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/28/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/7/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/28/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/1/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/29/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/29/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/2/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/17/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/22/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/26/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/2/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/30/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/8/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/10/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/14/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/17/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/10/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/27/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/7/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/15/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/21/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/1/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/9/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/15/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/24/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/3/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/6/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/10/2020
Time
7:55
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/3/2020
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/11/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/25/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/29/2021
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/23/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/19/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/31/2021
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/26/2021
Time
7:50
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/9/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/28/2021
Time
7:50
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/9/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/9/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/11/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/11/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/18/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/30/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/3/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/21/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/30/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/1/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/18/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/3/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/4/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/16/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/22/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/27/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/12/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/15/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/29/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/8/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/22/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/26/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/3/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/4/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/6/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/11/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/13/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/17/2022
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/3/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/8/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/9/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/14/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/15/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/16/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/17/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/21/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/22/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/29/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/30/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/1/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/6/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/8/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/12/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/14/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/15/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/3/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/4/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/5/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/9/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/10/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/11/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/19/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/23/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/24/2023
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/30/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/6/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/7/2023
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/8/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/9/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/14/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/15/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/16/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/21/2023
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/22/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/23/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/6/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/8/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/9/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/13/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/15/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/29/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/3/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/4/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/6/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/11/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/19/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/20/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/27/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/1/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/2/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/12/2023
Time
8:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/15/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/22/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/24/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/25/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/6/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/7/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/12/2023
Time
8:00
Event
Sentencing