« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2012-092663
Judge:
Coffey, Rodrick
File Date:
4/17/2012
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Richard Capek
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Thomas Ryan
Party Name
Laurie Capek
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Thomas Ryan
Party Name
Jane Doe Juarez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2016
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
2/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2014
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/7/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS DANIEL T. FANG, M.D. AND JANE DOE FANG
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order REGARDING STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/5/2014
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice
Filing Date
3/5/2014
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice AS TO DEFENDANTS DANIEL T. FANG, M.D. AND JANE DOE FANG
Filing Date
2/21/2014
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2014
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
2/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2014
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Request For A Referral to Judge Oberbillig For A Settlement Conference
Filing Date
1/24/2014
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order OF DISMISSAL AS TO
DEFENDANT ST. LUKE’S
MEDICAL CENTER with prejudice
Filing Date
1/23/2014
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/22/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order TO ENLARGE TIME
FOR PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT ST. LUKE’S
MEDICAL CENTER MOTION
FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/21/2014
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT ST. LUKE’S MEDICAL CENTER MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant St. Luke's Medical Center
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant St. Luke's Medical Center
Filing Date
9/27/2013
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
9/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE NEGLIGENCE
CLAIMS AGAINST
DEFENDANTS ST. LUKE’S
MEDICAL CENTER
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION RE NEGLIGENCE
CLAIMS AGAINST
DEFENDANTS ST. LUKE’S
MEDICAL CENTER
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 16 COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PURPOSES OF RESETTING TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Trial Conflict
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant St. Luke's Medical Center's Motion For Protective Order
Filing Date
8/13/2013
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
8/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant St. Luke's Medical Center's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
8/13/2013
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
8/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant St. Luke's Medical Center's Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO EXTEND
DISCOVERY DEADLINES
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES
Filing Date
1/30/2013
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
1/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2012
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Notice of Objection to Defendants' Notices of Non-Parties at Fault
Filing Date
11/1/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2012
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2012
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
10/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Non-Party at Fault
Filing Date
10/8/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2012
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of A.R.S. §12-2603 Motion to Dismiss by St. Luke's Medical Center
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to St. Luke's Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
8/14/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 16 COMPREHENSIVE
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING
ORDER
Filing Date
8/7/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
8/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 16 A.R.C.P. COMPREHENSIVE JOINT PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
8/2/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
8/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss Defendant St. Luke's Medical Center Pursuant to A.R.S.§12-2603
Filing Date
6/26/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
6/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Scheduling Comprehensive Pretrial Planning Conference
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer on Behalf of Defendants Hilario Juarez, M.D. and Abdominal Surgeons, Ltd.
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Demand for Jury Trial on Behalf of Defendants Hilario Juarez, M.D. and Abdominal Surgeons, Ltd.
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration on Behalf of Defendants Hilario Juarez, M.D. and Abdominal Surgeons, Ltd.
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Entry of Default Against Defendants Daniel T. Fang, M.D. and Jane Doe Fang
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Daniel T. Fang, M.D., Jane Doe Fang and Abdominal Surgeons, Ltd.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint / eFile Billing $223.00
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Daniel T. Fang, M.D., Jane Doe Fang and Abdominal Surgeons, Ltd.'s Demand for Jury Trial
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Daniel T. Fang, M.D., Jane Doe Fang and Abdominal Surgeons, Ltd.'s Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
5/14/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
St. Lukes Medical Center Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint / eFile Billing $223.00
Filing Date
5/14/2012
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant St. Luke's Medical Center's Certificate on Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
HILARIO JUAREZ
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JANE DOE JUAREZ
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DANIEL FANG
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER L P
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ABDOMINAL SURGEONS LTD
Filing Date
4/17/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2012
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
4/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY/REGARDING EXPERT TESTIMONY
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/1/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/26/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/20/2013
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/20/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/14/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/12/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2014
Time
14:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/17/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/24/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/31/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.