« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2012-051183
Judge:
Mata, Julie
File Date:
3/8/2012
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Thomas T Beatie
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Alison Briggs
Party Name
Nancy J Beatie
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
David Higgins
Party Name
Amicus Curiae Transgender Law Center
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Lisa Dodd
Relationship
Court Advisor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Objection To Motion To Set And Certificate Of Readiness
Filing Date
3/5/2024
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
3/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's List Of Witnesses, Exhibits FOR TRIAL SET ON NOVEMBER 28 2023 @8:45 AM
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER'S LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL SET ON NOVEMBER 28, 2023, AT 8:45 A.M.
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Issues
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Issues for Trial scheduled november 28, 2023 at 8:45 am
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
CRC – Court Report Confidential
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT APPOINTED ADVISOR REPORT
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANDING MOTION TO CONTINUE THIS MATTER UNTIL 11/28/23
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SET ON SEPTEMBER 5, 2023 AT 8:45 A.M.
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENTS RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Strike Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response To Petitioner's Rule 35.1 Motion For Reconsideration
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioner's Rule 35.1 Motion for Reconsideration
Filing Date
6/13/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Motion To Continue Evidentiary Hearing
Filing Date
6/7/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE MOTION AND SETTING A TRIAL ON THIS 24 DAY OF AUGUST 2023
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE / MOTION TO TERMINATE DRUG TESTING ORDER FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TERMINATE DRUG TESTING FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
5/31/2023
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
5/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO TERMINATE DRUG TESTING ORDER FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Terminate Drug Testing Order for Petitioner
Filing Date
4/13/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT'S RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioner's Resolution Management Statement
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Temporary Orders
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
3/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order for Drug Testing
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order for Drug Testing
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Separate Prehearing Statement For Petitioner's Motion For Temporary Orders Without Notice
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioner's Separate Prehearing Statement for the Temporary Orders Hearing Set on March 2, 2023 at 2:00 p.m
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Acceptance of Service
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel WITHIN FIRM
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2023
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY ORDERS EVIDENTIARY HEARING/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER RE LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PARENTING TIME WITHOUT NOTICE
Filing Date
2/7/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TEMPORARY ORDERS REGARDING LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AND PARENTING TIME WITHOUT NOTICE
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response To Motion For Psychological Evaluation Of Respondent
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response To Motion For Psychological Evaluation Of Respondent
Filing Date
1/30/2023
Description
TOW – Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice
Docket Date
2/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Temporary Orders Regarding Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time without Notice
Filing Date
1/30/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Psychological Evaluation of Respondent
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response To Amended Petition To Modify Legal Decision Making, Child Custody, Parenting Time And Child Support
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance Of Service
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
AMP - Amended Post Decree Petition/Motion/Request
Docket Date
12/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Petition to Modify Legal Decision-Making, Parenting Time and Child Support
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
230 – ME: Appointment of Child Representative
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND HIS PETITION TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION MAKING PARENTING TIME CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response To Petitioner's Motion For Leave To Amend Petition To Modify Legal Decision Making, Parenting Time, and Child Support
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
230 – ME: Appointment of Child Representative
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Resolution Management Statement
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Leave to Amend Petition to Modify Legal Decision-Making, Parenting Time and Child Support
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance Of Service
Filing Date
11/23/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioner's Resolution Management Statement
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2022
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
10/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
10/24/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING TO PARTY A
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
JFF - Judgment For Fees
Docket Date
8/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment for Fees: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/4/2021
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Response to Application for Respondent Attorneys Fees
Filing Date
7/29/2021
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Application For And Affidavit Of Attorney Fees And Cost
Filing Date
7/21/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/14/2021
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Pretrial Statement and Exhibits for Petition FOR CONTEMPT-TO ENFORCE REIMBURSEMENT OF MEDICAL EXPENSES
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Filing VERIFICATION
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondent's Separate Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition To Enforce Reimbursement For Medical Expenses
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/15/2021
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Second Motion for Court to Review Payment for Petition to Enforce Reimbursement of Medical Expenses Filed 7-27-2020 3 pages
Filing Date
6/7/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
6/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS PETITIONER'S PETITION TO ENFORCE REIMBURSMENT FOR MEDICAL EXPENSES
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Motion for Court to Review Payment for Petition to Enforce Reimbursement of Medical Expenses Filed 7-27-2020
Filing Date
10/15/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Certificate of Completion For Parental Conflict Class
Filing Date
8/14/2020
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PARENTING PLAN FOR: SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING (SOLE LEGAL CUSTODY) TO PARTY A
Filing Date
8/14/2020
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PARENTING PLAN FOR SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING TO PARTY A
Filing Date
8/14/2020
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PETITION TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION-MAKING (LEGAL CUSTODY), PARENTING TIME and CHILD SUPPORT PD 89 R# 27909270
Filing Date
8/14/2020
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
MOTION FOR POST-DECREE TEMPORARY ORDER WITH NOTICE FOR MODIFICATION OF LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AND PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
8/13/2020
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
8/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/12/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/7/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Motion to Accept PIP (Parent Information Program) In Place of PCR (Parental Conflict Resolution) Class
Filing Date
7/27/2020
Description
CMI - Petition For Contempt - Medical Support
Docket Date
7/28/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Petition to Enforce Reimbursement for Medical Expenses PD 89 R# 27880665
Filing Date
7/27/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
7/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING TO PARTY A
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
7/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2020
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
4/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2020
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondents Separate Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
3/10/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2019
Description
CVS - Petition For Contempt - Visitation
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2019
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
12/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2019
Description
AMP - Amended Post Decree Petition/Motion/Request
Docket Date
12/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondents Amended Petition To Enforce Terms Of The Decree And Parenting Plan
Filing Date
11/18/2019
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
11/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE EVIDENTIARY HEARING CONTEMPT
Filing Date
11/18/2019
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
11/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE EVIDENTIARY HEARING CONTEMPT
Filing Date
11/15/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2019
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT
Filing Date
11/8/2019
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondents Resolution Management Statement
Filing Date
11/1/2019
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/4/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
RE UNPAID BILLS/HEALTHCARE AND DECISON MAKING/TELEPHONE ACCESS/EXTRA CURRICULAR/ABUSE AND LACK OF RESPECT
Filing Date
10/28/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
10/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/23/2019
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
9/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2019
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
9/25/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/23/2019
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
9/25/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/23/2019
Description
CVS - Petition For Contempt - Visitation
Docket Date
9/30/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/3/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
8/28/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TO RESCHEDULE FAMILY COURT CONFERENCE AND HEARING DUE TO LACK OF SERVICE
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/31/2017
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Filing Date
6/19/2017
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
6/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
CVS - Petition For Contempt - Visitation
Docket Date
6/19/2017
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
5/24/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2017
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/15/2017
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
COMPLY AND FOLLOW COURT ORDER OF PARENTING PLAN
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2016
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/21/2016
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TAXES SCHOOL PHONE CALLS
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2015
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
10/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Petitioner/Father
Filing Date
9/23/2015
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
9/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
9/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
VACATING ALL FUTURE COURT HEARINGS/TRIALS/STATUS CONFERENCES IN THIS MATTER
Filing Date
8/26/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
8/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement (Joint)
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance on Behalf of Petitioner
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
8/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/7/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PETITIONERS ARIZONA FAMILY LAW NON UNIFORM SET OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO THE RESPONDENT WITH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AFI with Attachment Thomas Beatie Final
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
6/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to withdraw
Filing Date
6/29/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
notice of appearance
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
6/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2015
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
6/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
6/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED/WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
5/29/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2015
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
5/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
4/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
3/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
11/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2014
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
11/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
11/3/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
10/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Expedited Motion for Immediate Re-Enrollment of Minor Child Into Therapy Through Touchstone Behavioral Health
Filing Date
10/8/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM
Filing Date
10/8/2014
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
10/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
9/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2014
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
9/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVERSED AND REMANDED
Filing Date
2/12/2014
Description
237 - ME: Pet Conciliation Not Accepted
Docket Date
2/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
PME - Petition for Mediation
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
CONCILIATION COUNSELING
Filing Date
10/24/2013
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
10/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COA VACATING THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED OCT 8, 2013
Filing Date
10/9/2013
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSMIT RECORD
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSMIT RECORD
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
6/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS/
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EROA
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EROA
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
6/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2013
Description
CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement
Docket Date
5/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
4/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SATISFACTORY ARRANGEMENTS WITH CERTIFIED TRANSCRIBER FOR PAYMENT OF TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
4/5/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
4/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
4/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/29/2013
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2013
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2013
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
4/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL
Filing Date
1/24/2013
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
1/28/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/24/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL
Filing Date
1/24/2013
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
1/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
12/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2012
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED/AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW RE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 7 2012 AT 9:00 A M
Filing Date
12/6/2012
Description
OAT - Order To Appear By Telephone
Docket Date
12/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITNESSES AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR 12/7/12 AT 9:00 AM
Filing Date
11/30/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
12/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORAL ARGUMENT REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED/FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER IN SUPPORT OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURSIDICTION OVER PETITIONERS PETITON FOR DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
12/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L BROWNSTEIN M D FACS
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
12/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
IVE - Intervenor Fee
Docket Date
12/7/2012
Filing Party
Intervenor
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / OF WITNESSAS AT EVIDENTIARY HEARINT SET FOR 12/7/12 AT 9:00 AM
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
9/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2012
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
10/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2012
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
10/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
9/24/2012
Description
293 - ME: Order - Regarding Modification
Docket Date
9/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2012
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
9/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING / THE COURT MODIFIES THE PROTECTIVE ORDER LISTED ABOVE
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPORITNG PARENTING SCHEDULE
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
9/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
8/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT RE: FATHERS CELLULAR TELEPHONIC DISCONNECTON AT 07/26/12
Filing Date
8/14/2012
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
8/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION OVER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
8/3/2012
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
8/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
8/8/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICITON OVER PETITIONERS PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
7/30/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
7/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER PETITIONERS PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
7/30/2012
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PETITIONER
Filing Date
7/27/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE SUPERVISED PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
7/13/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE SUPERVISED PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
6/27/2012
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated
Docket Date
6/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2012
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2012
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2012
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
6/25/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
ASP - Affidavit Of Service Order Of Protection
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5/29/12
Filing Date
5/29/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF PROTECTION MODIFIED
Filing Date
5/29/2012
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
5/23/2012
Description
292 - ME: Order - Regarding Custody
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
POP - Petition/Order Of Protection
Docket Date
5/25/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
5/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2012
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL TEMPORARY ORDERS HEARING /
Filing Date
5/15/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT RE SALE OF MARITAL RESIDENCE AND REMOVAL OF HOME FURNISHINGS AND RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL SALE OF MARITAL RESIDENCE
Filing Date
5/15/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT RE SALE OF MARITAL RESIDENCE AND REMOVAL OF HOME FURNISHINGS AND MOTION TO COMPEL SALE OF MARITAL RESIDENCE
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF THOMAS T BEATIE
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
5/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST PROPOSED CUSTODY AND PARENTING TIME MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
5/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND PROPOSED CUSTODY AND PARENTING TIME /
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CONTEMPT RE SALE OF MARITAL RESIDENCE AND REMOVAL OF HOME FURNISHINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY ORDERS HEARING/
Filing Date
5/4/2012
Description
COT - Petition For Contempt - Other
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE FAILURE TO DISCLOSE FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
5/2/2012
Description
230 – ME: Appointment of Child Representative
Docket Date
5/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/4/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND CONSENT
Filing Date
4/24/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
4/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
4/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
ASP - Affidavit Of Service Order Of Protection
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SERVED 04/12/12 MODIFIED 04/12/12
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SHERIFF OF POSITIVE BRADY INDICATOR
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING / THE COURT MODIFIES THE PROTECTIVE ORDER LISTED ABOVE; BRADY APPLIES
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENTS RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
4/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
THOMAS BEATIE ATTENDED
Filing Date
4/11/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/17/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/9/2012
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
4/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NANCY BEATIE ATTENDED
Filing Date
4/6/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONERS / TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO CONVERT CASE TO A DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Filing Date
4/6/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONERS / TO RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS RE CUSTODY, PARENTING TIME, SUPPORT AND ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
4/5/2012
Description
OPH - Order For Hearing On Order Of Protection
Docket Date
4/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2012
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing
Docket Date
4/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2012
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
3/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONVERT CASE TO A DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Filing Date
3/16/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/16/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2012
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
4/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE CUSTODY/PARENTING TIME/SUPPORT AND ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
3/16/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/4/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
03/11/12
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
POP - Petition/Order Of Protection
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
POP - Petition/Order Of Protection
Docket Date
3/13/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
3/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/12/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Order Of Protection Hearing
Date
4/19/2012
Time
16:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
5/7/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
5/16/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
5/29/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/14/2012
Time
13:31
Event
Review Hearing
Date
6/28/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
7/12/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
7/26/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
8/1/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Family Settlement Conference
Date
8/9/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
8/15/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/23/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
9/12/2012
Time
16:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
9/13/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
9/18/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/4/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
10/18/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
11/15/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
12/7/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/13/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
1/24/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
1/31/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/21/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
3/28/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
4/25/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
11/12/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/31/2015
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2015
Time
16:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/14/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Family Settlement Conference
Date
8/14/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Family Settlement Conference
Date
8/24/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/31/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:15
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/29/2017
Time
13:00
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
9/29/2017
Time
14:15
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/14/2019
Time
9:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
1/24/2020
Time
12:15
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
1/24/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/28/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/2/2020
Time
14:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
6/3/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/13/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/1/2022
Time
15:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
3/2/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
4/13/2023
Time
11:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
8/24/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/5/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/28/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/21/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/2/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing