« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2011-095094
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
10/31/2011
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Peter J Sterling
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Paul Rowley
Party Name
Heather K Sterling
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Yvette Ansel
Party Name
Megan Sterling
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Paul Rowley
Party Name
(4)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Jennifer Mihalovich
Party Name
Principal Life Insurance Company
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Reuben Cawley
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM
Filing Date
7/21/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/7/2014
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/4/2014
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2014
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
9/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2014
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2014
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/27/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Megan Sterling AND PETER STERLING'S Objections to Respondent Heather Sterling's Separate Statement of Facts and Supplemental Statement of Facts
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEGAN STERLING AND PETER STERLING’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/28/2014
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/13/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENT HEATHER STERLING'S SEPARTE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/13/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MEGAN STERLING AND PETER STERLING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
256 - ME: Iv-D Hearing
Docket Date
1/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
1/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Mother's Answer to Petitioner Peter Sterling and Third Party Counterclaimant Megan Sterling's Counterclaim
Filing Date
12/16/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Father's Response to Mother's Petition for Contempt and Enforcement re: Child Support and Request for Arrearage Judgment
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
12/10/2013
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARREARS CALCULATION
Filing Date
12/9/2013
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
12/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Megan Sterling and Peter Sterling's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/9/2013
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
12/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Megan Sterling and Peter Sterling's Application for Entry of Default Against Heather Sterling
Filing Date
12/5/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Acceptance of Service and Waiver of Personal Service
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Acceptance of Service and Waiver of Personal Service
Filing Date
11/19/2013
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
11/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2013
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
11/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIRMED
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE CLARIFICATION TO 10/1/13 ORDER RE PRINICPAL LIFE INSURANCE POLICY
Filing Date
10/30/2013
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
10/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING ENFORCEMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
10/24/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTHER'S/ FOR CLARIFICATION/ADDITION TO 10/1/13 ORDER RE: PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
10/24/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
CCS - Petition For Contempt - Child Support
Docket Date
10/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing
Docket Date
10/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTHER'S EXPEDITED/ RE: MOTHER'S PETITION FOR CONTEMPT AND ENFORCEMENT RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND REQUEST FOR ARREARAGE JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/16/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2013
Description
092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit
Docket Date
9/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO WAIVE PETITIONERS APPEARANCE AT THE RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 9/26/13
Filing Date
9/20/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioner/Father's Position Statement For Resolution Management Conference
Filing Date
9/20/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioner/ Father's Position Statement For Resolution Management Conference
Filing Date
9/20/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Expedited Request To Waive Appearance of Petitioner/Father at Resolution Management Conference on September 26, 2013
Filing Date
9/6/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/6/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Megan and Peter Sterling's Response to Respondent's Motion to Set Expedited Trial
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
RTC - Response To Complaint/Answer
Docket Date
9/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Answer to Third Party Complaint and Counterclaim
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
8/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET EXPEDITED TRIAL
Filing Date
8/22/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ENFORCEMENT HEARING
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Corrected Image for Answer of Principal Life Insurance Company (improperly designated as Principal Financial Group, Inc.) to Third-Party Complaint
Filing Date
8/15/2013
Description
IVE - Intervenor Fee
Docket Date
8/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2013
Description
RTC - Response To Complaint/Answer
Docket Date
8/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer of Principal Life Insurance Company (improperly designated as Principal Financial Group, Inc.) to Third Party Complaint
Filing Date
8/13/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2013
Description
RTC - Response To Complaint/Answer
Docket Date
8/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer to Third Party Complaint
Filing Date
8/12/2013
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
8/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
8/7/2013
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED /
Filing Date
7/25/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
SCM - Subsequent Complaint
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD PARTY
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/18/13
Filing Date
7/18/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2013
Description
SCM - Subsequent Complaint
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2013
Description
SCM - Subsequent Complaint
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Third Party Complaint
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO MOTHER'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioner's Objection To Respondent's Affidavit of Attorney Fees and Application for Attorney Fees and Costs
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ERRATA
Filing Date
6/28/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTHER'S EXPEDITED/ TO JOIN PRINCIPAL MEGAN STERLING AS PARTY UNDER RULE 14(A) ARIZ RULES OF CIV PRO
Filing Date
6/17/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
5/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
5/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
8/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Expedited Motion for Admission of AXA Letter dated March 8, 2013
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT FOR HEAIRN GSET MAY 22, 2013
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Expedited Notice Re: Father's Ability to Attend Hearing May 22, 2013
Filing Date
5/15/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO GATEWAY COMMERCIAL BANK
Filing Date
5/13/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTHER'S RESPONSE TO FATHER'S MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL/FOR HEARING SET MAY 22 2013
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO GATEWAY COMMERCIAL BANK
Filing Date
5/9/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FATHER'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT ON CONTINUED CONTEMPT OF: CHILD SUPPORT; AND MARCH 18, 2013 ORDER
Filing Date
5/6/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER'S EXPEDITED MOTION TO JOIN AXA EQUITABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND MOTION TO SET SUPERSEDEAS BOND
Filing Date
5/6/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF JOHN LINFORD IN OPPOSITION TO MOTHER PETITION FOR CONTEMPT AND ENFORCEMENT AND MOTHERS EXPEDITED MOTION RE FATHERS CONTINUED CONTEMPT AND FRAUDULENT CONVEYANCES
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/01/2013
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
NAC - Notice Providing Arrears Calculation
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2013
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL / ON CONTINUED CONTEMPT OF CHILD SUPPORT AND 3/18/13 ORDER
Filing Date
5/2/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL / FOR 5/7/13 HEARING
Filing Date
5/1/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF JUNE 8 2012 ORDER AND PETITION FOR CONTEMPT RE ALTERING BENEFICIARY IN VIOLATION OF JUNE 8 2012 ORDER
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO DISMISS MOTHER'S EXPEDITED MOTION RE FATHER'S CONTINUED CONTEMPT AND FRAUDULENT CONVEYANCES
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2013
Description
MCS - Petition To Modify Child Support - Osc
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF JUNE 8, 20112 ORDER AND PETITION FOR CONTEMP RE: ALTERNTING BENEFICARY IN VIOLATION OF JUNE 8, 2012 ORDER AND MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
4/22/2013
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO JOIN PRINCIPAL FINANCIAL GROUP/PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE AS FOR PURPOSES OF INJUNCTION
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
4/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
4/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2013
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION FOR CONTEMPT AND ENFORCEMENT RE CHILD SUPPORT AND REQUEST FOR ARREARAGE JUDGMENT AND MOTION RE FATHER'S CONTINUED CONTEMPT AND FRAUDULENT CONVEYANCES
Filing Date
4/9/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE DUE TO LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION
Filing Date
4/8/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PARTIES RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION
Filing Date
4/4/2013
Description
CCS - Petition For Contempt - Child Support
Docket Date
4/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / RE FATHERS CONTINUED CONTEMPT AND FRAUDULENT CONVEYANCES
Filing Date
3/22/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION
Filing Date
3/18/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO ALTER AND AMEND JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/18/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ATTORNEY GENERAL'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE
Filing Date
3/13/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO ALTER AND AMEND JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/11/2013
Description
OAT - Order To Appear By Telephone
Docket Date
3/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
4/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL/FOR MARCH 11 2013 HEARING
Filing Date
3/8/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL/ON PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT RE FATHER'S VIOLATION OF JUNE 8 2012 ORDER
Filing Date
3/8/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT INCLUDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT JENNY HEAFEY
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/06/2013
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT INCLUDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT JENNY HEAFEY
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED/FOR EXPERT WITNESS TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
3/6/2013
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
3/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EMERGENCY AND PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF JUNE 8 2012 ORDER AND PETITION FOR CONTEMPT RE ALTERNING BENEFICIARY IN VIOLATION OF JUNE 8 2012 ORDER
Filing Date
3/6/2013
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECREE RE LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL REQUESTING REGISTRATION UNDER UIFSA
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REGISTRATION
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SWORN / OF HEATHER STERLING RE ARREARAGES
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TRANSMITTAL REQUESTING REGISTRATION UNDER UIFSA AND NOTICE OF FILING UNDER UIFSA
Filing Date
2/28/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
3/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2013
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
2/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENFORECEMENT OF 06/08/12 ORDER AN DPETITON FOR CONTEMPT RE: ALTERING BENEFICIARY IN VIOLATION OF 06/08/12 ORDER
Filing Date
2/14/2013
Description
COT - Petition For Contempt - Other
Docket Date
2/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION
Filing Date
2/11/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/11/2013
Description
IVE - Intervenor Fee
Docket Date
2/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2013
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
2/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSMIT RECORD W/RELATED CASE FC2012-090277
Filing Date
1/28/2013
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
1/9/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR EXECUTION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/2/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
1/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR EXECUTION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER
Filing Date
12/11/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR EXECUTION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/5/2012
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
1/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
10/31/2012
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
11/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
10/26/2012
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/15/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/15/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2012
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
10/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2012
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
10/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2012
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/15/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2012
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
10/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT MOTHERS / RE OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RFLP RULE 51 TO CERTAIN WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS OF PETITIONER FATHER AND FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 65
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION HUSBANDS MOTION IN LIMINE AND MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENTS WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER PURSUANT TO RFLP RULE 72 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE APPOINTMENT OF A PARENTING COORDINATOR UNDER RULE 74
Filing Date
10/2/2012
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OBJECTION TO RFLP RULE 51 TO CERTAIN WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS OF PETITIONER FATHER AND FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 65 AND PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 31 ARFLP
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO COMPEL PURSUANT TO RULE 65 AND FOR SANCTIONS AND RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF COUNSEL AND PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER PURSUANT TO RULE 72 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE APPOINTMENT OF A PARENTING COORDINATOR UNDER RULE 74
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER PURSUANT TO RULE 72 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE APPOINTMENT OF A PARENTING COORDINATOR UNDER RULE 74
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL/FOR HEARING SET OCTOBER 8 2012
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE AND MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENTS WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS
Filing Date
9/27/2012
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED - EROA
Filing Date
9/27/2012
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EROA
Filing Date
9/24/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ERRATA RE OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RFLP RULE 51H TO CERTAIN WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS OF PETITIONER FATHER AND FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 65
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL/FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY IN RESPONSE TO PRODUCTOIN OF DOCUMENTS ISSUED
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE APPOINTMENT OF A PARENTING COORDINATOR
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
9/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CERTAIN WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS OF PETITIONER AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE/OF COUNSEL RE MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY IN RESPONSE TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ISSUED
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE/OF COUNSEL RE OBJECTIONS TO CERTAIN WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS OF PETITIONER AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2012
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
2/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
9/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL /
Filing Date
9/7/2012
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement
Docket Date
9/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2012
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLANTS FILING FEE
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2012
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
8/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2012
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
8/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO ORDER MOTHER TO LIST PETITIONER AS BENEFICIARY ON LIFE INSURANCE POLICY
Filing Date
7/13/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER/FATHER'S JOINDER IN MEGAN STERLING'S MTION TO INTERVENE ON BEHALF OF MEGAN STERLING AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE RULING DATED JUNE 3, 2012
Filing Date
7/13/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPORTING MOTION TO INTERVENE ON BEHALF OF MEGAN STERLING AND REPLY SUPPORTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE RULING DATED 6-6-12
Filing Date
7/13/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
7/9/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
7/6/2012
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
7/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE RULING DATED 6/6/12 AND RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO INTERVENE ON BEHALF OF MEGAN STERLING
Filing Date
6/29/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ORDER MOTHER TO LIST PETITIONER/FATHER AS BENEFICIARY ON LIFE INSURANCE POLICY
Filing Date
6/29/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
6/26/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO AMEND ORDER
Filing Date
6/25/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MEGAN STERLING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO SET ASIDE ORDER
Filing Date
6/25/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO INTERVENE ON BEHALF OF MEGAN STERLING AND / TO SET ASIDE RULING DATED 6/6/12
Filing Date
6/25/2012
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
6/26/2012
Filing Party
Intervenor
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
6/20/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE TO EXPEDITED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED RULING / FOR RECONSIDERATION
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ORDER DATED 6/6/12 AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO AMEND ORDER
Filing Date
6/8/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PEITIONER'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
6/8/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION REQUESTING COURT TO ORDER PETITIONER TO LIST RESPONDENT AS FIRST BENEFICIARY ON LIFE INSURANCE POLICY
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED/PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/30/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION REQUESTING COURT TO ORDER FATHER TO LIST MOTHER AS FIRST BENEFICIARY ON LIFE INSURANCE POLICY
Filing Date
5/12/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/11/2012
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTING COURT TO ORDER PETITIONER/FATHER TO LIST RESPONDENT/MOTHER AS FIRST BENEFICIARY ON LIFE INSURANCE POLICY
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT / OF RESPONDENT
Filing Date
5/3/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL /
Filing Date
5/2/2012
Description
MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically
Docket Date
5/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / OF COUNSEL AT RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 5/8/12
Filing Date
5/2/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTOIN OF HUSBAND/FATHER
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEATHER STERLING ATTENDED
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT/OF RESPONDENT
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/4/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF STRICT COMPLIANCE ARFLP RULE 2(B)(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF HEATHER STERLING
Filing Date
4/25/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO WAIVE APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/25/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/25/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED / TO WAIVE APPEARANCE OF FATHER AT RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 5/8/12
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY AND RESPONSE TO COUNTERMOTION TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT AND PARENTING PLAN
Filing Date
4/17/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/11/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RESPONDENTS / TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT AND PARENTING TIME AND COUNTERCLAIMS
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
3/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2012
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
1/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
POST JUDGMENT/DECREE
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
NFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECREE AND PROOF OF MAILING THEREOF TO RESPONDENT
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
MCS - Petition To Modify Child Support - Osc
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND PARENTING PLAN
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Decree of Dissolution
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/8/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
7/11/2012
Time
14:30
Event
Telephonic
Date
10/8/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/4/2013
Time
13:15
Event
Return
Date
3/11/2013
Time
16:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/29/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Return
Date
5/7/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/22/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/21/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Modification Of Child Support
Date
9/26/2013
Time
14:00
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
12/18/2013
Time
9:00
Event
IV-D Enforcement of Support
Date
2/25/2014
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument