« Return to search results Family Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: FC2003-000182 Judge: Thomason, Timothy
File Date: 1/7/2003 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Family Court With Children  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Richard   Strickland   Petitioner  Male  Mary Grenier 
Karen L  Strickland   Respondent  Female  Blake Whiteman 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/17/2004  ORD - Order  9/21/2004   
NOTE: STIPULATED DOMESTIC RELATIONS/ARIZONA STATE RETIREMENT SYSTEM 
4/9/2004  SCD - Stip For Entry Consent Decree  4/21/2004   
4/6/2004  CDS - Consent Decree  4/14/2004   
NOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing 
3/19/2004  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/19/2004   
3/9/2004  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/9/2004   
2/9/2004  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  2/9/2004   
12/5/2003  081 - ME: Trial Vacated  12/5/2003   
12/3/2003  STP - Stipulation  3/13/2004   
NOTE: TO VACATE TRIAL/PLACE CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR 
11/26/2003  STA - Statement  3/13/2004   
NOTE: JOINT PREHEARING 
11/6/2003  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference  11/6/2003   
8/27/2003  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  8/27/2003   
7/23/2003  MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness  7/31/2003   
7/9/2003  PEC - Parent Education Certificate  7/16/2003   
NOTE: RESPONDENT ATTENDED 
5/22/2003  267 - ME: Expedited Services Report/Recommendation/Order  8/20/2003   
4/15/2003  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  4/15/2003   
3/25/2003  268 - ME: Expedited Services Conference Scheduled  3/25/2003   
3/4/2003  PEC - Parent Education Certificate  3/7/2003   
NOTE: PETITIONER ATTENDED 
2/3/2003  ANS - Answer  2/6/2003   
1/27/2003  TRM - Transmittal  1/27/2003   
NOTE: NORTHEAST PHOENIX JUSTICE COURT/PETITION FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION/ORDER OF PROTECTION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: SERVED 12/31/02/REQUEST FOR HEARING/MOTION TO AMEND ORDER OF PROTECTION/COPY OF PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF NON-COVENANT MARRIAGE/JP CIVIL DOCKET SHEET/LETTER/ORDER OF TRANSMITTAL 
1/16/2003  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/29/2003   
NOTE: SERVED 01-08-2003 
1/7/2003  COM - Complaint  1/8/2003   
1/7/2003  PIN - Preliminary Injunction  1/8/2003   
1/7/2003  SUM - Summons  1/8/2003   
1/7/2003  CSI - Child Support Information Form  1/8/2003   
1/7/2003  NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins  1/8/2003   
1/7/2003  ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf  1/8/2003   
1/7/2003  NOT - Notice  1/8/2003   
NOTE: REGARDING CREDITORS 
1/7/2003  AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children  1/8/2003   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/16/200310:00  Expedited Service Conference 
11/3/20039:00  Comprehensive Pre-Trial Confer 
12/2/200313:30  Trial 
3/5/20049:00  Status Conference 
3/17/20049:45  Status Conference 


click here for Self-Service Center