« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1991-016456
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
12/2/1991
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Janis Couvillion
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Albert Couvillion
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1993 4:00:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
1/26/1993 4:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
1/26/1993
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
1/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
1/11/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/1993
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/7/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PRE-TRIAL
Filing Date
1/4/1993
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
1/7/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
1/5/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
N
Filing Date
1/4/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
1/5/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/4/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
1/5/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/23/1992
Description
222 - 222
Docket Date
6/25/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/1992
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
6/10/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/8/1992
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits
Docket Date
5/11/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/6/1992
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
4/8/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/1992
Description
233 - ME: Referral To Conciliation Services
Docket Date
3/19/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1992
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/5/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCILLIATION
Filing Date
1/14/1992
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
1/17/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
& ENTRY
Filing Date
1/9/1992
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/10/1992
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/27/1991
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/8/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/27/1991
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/8/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
BY MAIL
Filing Date
12/27/1991
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
1/8/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/2/1991
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/2/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/2/1991
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/2/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/2/1991
Description
PET - Petition
Docket Date
12/2/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file