« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Brown, Jacob      
Robert Michael Huillier - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Gronski, Jason   Master Calendar  CR2008-009404-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Robert Michael Huillier  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  6/6/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/21/2011 
Robert Michael Huillier  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  6/6/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/21/2011 
Robert Michael Huillier  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  7/1/2005  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/21/2011 
Robert Michael Huillier  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  7/1/2005  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/21/2011 
Robert Michael Huillier  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  10/7/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  12/2/2010 
Robert Michael Huillier  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  10/13/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  12/2/2010 
Robert Michael Huillier  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  10/26/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  12/2/2010 
Robert Michael Huillier  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  7/1/2005  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  12/2/2010 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/24/2018  118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party (001)  1/24/2018   
1/19/2018  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  1/25/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 8
11/8/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  11/8/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
11/8/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/8/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Terminate Probation
3/7/2016  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  3/10/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 7
3/7/2016  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  3/10/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 6
3/7/2016  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  3/10/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 5
6/3/2013  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  6/14/2013   
1/5/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/5/2012   
12/27/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/28/2011   
NOTE: JOINT / OF RESTITUTION STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO VACATE RESTITUTION HEARING
12/5/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/5/2011   
11/17/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/18/2011   
NOTE: FOR RESTITUTION HEARING
8/9/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/11/2011   
NOTE: OF JOINT STIPULATION OF RESTITUTION AND REQUEST FOR RESTITUTION HEARING
8/4/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/4/2011   
8/1/2011  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  8/8/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 8
7/26/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  7/26/2011   
6/28/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  6/30/2011   
2/24/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/24/2011   
1/25/2011  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  1/25/2011   
1/21/2011  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
1/21/2011  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
1/21/2011  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
1/21/2011  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
1/21/2011  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  1/27/2011   
1/21/2011  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
12/7/2010  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  12/7/2010   
12/2/2010  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  12/9/2010   
11/12/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  11/12/2010   
11/8/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/8/2010   
NOTE: Settlement Conference Memorandum
11/3/2010  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/3/2010   
10/28/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  10/28/2010   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
10/5/2010  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/5/2010   
9/29/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/30/2010   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
9/7/2010  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  9/7/2010   
8/27/2010  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/27/2010   
7/22/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/22/2010   
7/21/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/22/2010   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 07/13/10
7/21/2010  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/21/2010   
7/19/2010  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  7/19/2010   
7/14/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  7/14/2010   
7/12/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/12/2010   
7/7/2010  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/7/2010   
NOTE: Motion to continue Trial of 08/02/2010
6/4/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  6/4/2010   
6/2/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/2/2010   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
5/4/2010  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/4/2010   
4/28/2010  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  4/28/2010   
4/27/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  4/27/2010   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
3/23/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  3/23/2010   
2/10/2010  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  2/10/2010   
1/27/2010  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/27/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OF MARCH 22, 2010
1/4/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  1/5/2010   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 01/04/10
11/25/2009  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/25/2009   
11/9/2009  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/13/2009   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO RESTORE PROPERTY
10/27/2009  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  10/27/2009   
10/21/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/21/2009   
NOTE: TO RESTORE PROPERTY
10/20/2009  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/20/2009   
10/6/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/7/2009   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-5-09
10/6/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/7/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 10/05/09
10/5/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/6/2009   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 10/02/09
10/5/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/6/2009   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 10/02/09
10/5/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/6/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 10/02/09
10/1/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/2/2009   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM SERVED 10/01/09
10/1/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/2/2009   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM SERVED 10/01/09
10/1/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/2/2009   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM SERVED 10/01/09
8/26/2009  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  8/26/2009   
8/6/2009  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  8/6/2009   
7/28/2009  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)  7/28/2009   
7/27/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/27/2009   
7/24/2009  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  7/24/2009   
7/23/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/28/2009   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
7/22/2009  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/22/2009   
7/21/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/21/2009   
NOTE:
7/7/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  7/7/2009   
6/17/2009  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  6/17/2009   
6/11/2009  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  6/11/2009   
6/11/2009  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  6/12/2009   
NOTE: Settlement Conference
6/8/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/8/2009   
5/26/2009  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  5/26/2009   
5/13/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  5/13/2009   
4/20/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  4/20/2009   
4/17/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/24/2009   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
4/17/2009  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  4/17/2009   
4/14/2009  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  4/14/2009   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
4/6/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/6/2009   
4/2/2009  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/8/2009   
NOTE: DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND FOR NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
3/31/2009  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  3/31/2009   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENSE / TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY
3/23/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/23/2009   
3/23/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/23/2009   
3/23/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/23/2009   
3/23/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/23/2009   
3/20/2009  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  3/24/2009   
3/20/2009  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  3/24/2009   
3/20/2009  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)  3/24/2009   
3/19/2009  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)  3/19/2009   
3/10/2009  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/10/2009   
3/10/2009  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  3/12/2009   
3/5/2009  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  3/5/2009   
3/5/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/5/2009   
3/2/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/2/2009   
NOTE: to designate complex
2/26/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/3/2009   
2/26/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/3/2009   
2/26/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/3/2009   
2/25/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/2/2009   
NOTE: OF DEFENSES
2/25/2009  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
NOTE: RULE 609
2/25/2009  ALP - State's Allegation Pursuant to ARS 13-702.02 - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
NOTE:
2/25/2009  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
NOTE:
2/25/2009  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
NOTE:
2/25/2009  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
NOTE:
2/25/2009  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
NOTE:
2/12/2009  BON - Bond - Party (001)  2/13/2009   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $100,000 INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE CO
1/28/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  1/28/2009   
NOTE: OFFICE OF CONTRACT COUNSEL
1/16/2009  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  1/16/2009   
1/15/2009  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/15/2009   
1/7/2009  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  1/7/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 1/6/09
12/18/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/7/2009   
12/18/2008  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  1/7/2009   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/14/2009  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
2/25/2009  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/25/2009  8:16   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
4/17/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/6/2009  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/13/2009  9:00   Trial 
6/8/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/9/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/15/2009  9:30   Settlement Conference 
7/20/2009  10:00   Settlement Conference 
7/23/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/23/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/4/2009  9:00   Oral Argument 
8/5/2009  9:00   Oral Argument 
8/25/2009  9:30   Settlement Conference 
9/8/2009  8:00   Trial 
9/8/2009  10:30   Trial 
10/14/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
10/22/2009  10:30   Status Conference 
11/23/2009  8:30   Oral Argument 
3/17/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/22/2010  8:00   Trial 
4/28/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/2/2010  11:00   Settlement Conference 
6/3/2010  8:45   Complex / Capital Case 
7/8/2010  11:00   Settlement Conference 
7/13/2010  15:00   Oral Argument 
7/14/2010  9:30   Oral Argument 
7/26/2010  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/26/2010  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/2/2010  8:00   Trial 
8/20/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/30/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/30/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/1/2010  8:45   Complex / Capital Case 
11/9/2010  11:00   Settlement Conference 
12/2/2010  8:17   Change Of Plea 
1/20/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/20/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/21/2011  11:00   Sentencing 
2/7/2011  8:00   Trial 
2/25/2011  8:16   Status Conference 
8/1/2011  8:30   Review Hearing 
8/1/2011  8:30   Review Hearing 
1/6/2012  10:00   Restitution Hearing 
1/19/2018  8:15   Status Conference 
click here for Law Library Resource Center