« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Kenneth George Boles - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2018-107721-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Kenneth George Boles
Crime Date
2/10/2018
Date
2/21/2018
Description
CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE
ARSCode
13-3623 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Kenneth George Boles
Crime Date
2/10/2018
Date
3/22/2018
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party ()
Docket Date
4/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 3-27-18
Filing Date
4/4/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Quashed 2018-03-27
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO
DISMISS AND QUASH WARRANT
OR SUMMONS
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
163 - ME: Arraign/Vacate/Bench Warr - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2018
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2018-03-13
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/11/2018
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/26/2018
Time
8:33
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/27/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/2/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/13/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/11/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/24/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/10/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/29/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference