« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Capital Litigation
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Lauritano, Sheri
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2013-416818-001
Party Name
Nicholas Malicki - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Kratter, Marci
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2013-416818-002
Party Name
B Witness - (4)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
M
Attorney
SHRIVER, GARY
Judge
Case #
CR2013-416818-002
Party Name
B Witness - (5)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2013-416818-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
4/24/2013
Description
KIDNAP
ARSCode
13-1304 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
4/24/2013
Description
KIDNAP
ARSCode
13-1304 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
3/13/2017
Description
KIDNAP
ARSCode
13-1304 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
3/13/2017
Description
KIDNAP
ARSCode
13-1304 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
3/13/2017
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
6/27/2017
Description
MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS
ARSCode
13-3102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
6/27/2017
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
6/27/2017
Description
RESISTING ARREST
ARSCode
13-2508 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
8/25/2017
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3407 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
8/25/2017
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3408 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
8/25/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
8/25/2017
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
8/25/2017
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
8/25/2017
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
6/27/2017
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Anthony Brian Giunta
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
6/27/2017
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Nicholas Malicki
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
1/15/2020
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Nicholas Malicki
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
1/15/2020
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Nicholas Malicki
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
1/15/2020
Description
MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS
ARSCode
13-3102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Nicholas Malicki
Crime Date
4/15/2013
Date
1/15/2020
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER SEAL ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON JOINT MOTION TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL 9/13/18 MOTION FOR PRODUCTION AND 9/20/18 ORDER
Filing Date
12/10/2020
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2020
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
12/1/2020
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/1/2020
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
12/1/2020
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
12/1/2020
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
8/31/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2020
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
8/20/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2020
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
4/28/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
1/17/2020
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2020
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/15/2020
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSSE TO STATES MOTION IN LIMINE-DETECTIVE CHAMPIONS DISCIPLINARY RECORDS
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/7/2020
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2019
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RETRIAL WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE ANY MENTION OF
CHAMPION’S DIRCIPLINE UNRELATED
TO INTEGRITY OR HONESTY
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE ANY MENTION OF
COLLATERAL MATTERS RE: MERCER
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE ANY MENTION OF
CHAMPION’S DIRCIPLINE UNRELATED
TO INTEGRITY OR HONESTY
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE ANY MENTION OF
COLLATERAL MATTERS RE: MERCER
Filing Date
10/10/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Champion 10/04/19
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/04/2019
Filing Date
10/3/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR MINUTE ENTRY TO PERMIT INVESTIGATOR TO ASSIST WITH TRIAL
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Malicki SERVED 09/16/19
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Malicki SERVED 09/18/19
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Malicki SERVED 09/17/19
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 09/16/19
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 09/16/19
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 09/16/19
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND INTERVIEW
OF RETIRED DETECTIVE MERAZ
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL SECOND
INTERVIEW OF RETIRED DETECTIVE
MERAZ
PURUSANT TO RULE 15.1(g)
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF FILING LAB AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUS
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / OF STATE'S INTERFERENCE AND NON-COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER
Filing Date
7/16/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL IN SUPPORT OF OMNIBUS MOTION
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF FILING JANUARY 26,
2017 DISCOVERY LETTER AND RECEIPT
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF FILING DATES OF
TRANSCRIPTION OF GUZMAN-CHAMPION
INTERVIEW
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Request to Present Rebuttal Witness
Filing Date
7/5/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST TO PRESENT REBUTTAL WITNESS TO REBUT CLAIM THAT MECER IS AN INFORMATION SOURCE
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REPLY
Filing Date
6/18/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-17-19
Filing Date
6/17/2019
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY
Filing Date
6/13/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-12-19
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-11-19
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-11-19
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 06/11/19
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-11-19
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-11-19
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/OF OMNIBUS MOTION RESPONSE ATTACHMENTS
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS OR
PRECLUDE WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/28/2019
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF
TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S OMNIBUS MOTION
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MEMORANDUM OF LAW RE: RULE 15.1(g) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND CARPENTER
Filing Date
5/3/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2019
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO PRECLUDE WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/15/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 04/09/19
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA CRIMINAL RULE 15.3
AND ARIZONA CIVIL RULE 30(b)(6)
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
states status report discovery orders dates 04/04/2019
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE TO COMPLETE THE
RECORD FOR COURT-ORDERED
DEPOSITIONS
Filing Date
3/21/2019
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
FOR DEPOSITION ISSUED TO
OFR. HOPKINS, #5285
EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED
Filing Date
3/18/2019
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA CRIMINAL RULE 15.3 AND ARIZONA CIVIL RULE 30(b)(6) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Filing Date
2/20/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 02/20/19
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE’S
INTERFERENCE AND NONCOMPLIANCE
WITH COURT
ORDER
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 2-5-19
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Malicki
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Malicki
Filing Date
1/28/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S STATUS REPORT RE:
DISCLOSURE REQUEST DATED 11/15/18
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES STATUS REPORT RE DISCLOSURE REQUEST DATED 11-15-18
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
12/5/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S STATUS REPORT RE: DISCLOSURE REQUEST DATED 11/15/18
Filing Date
11/30/2018
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
11/30/2018
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
11/28/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES STATUS REPORT RE DISCLOSURE REQUEST DATED 11-15-18
Filing Date
11/21/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES STATUS REPORT RE DISCLOSURE REQUEST DATED 11-15-18
Filing Date
11/19/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11-14-18
Filing Date
11/14/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MALICKI RESPONSE TO STATES REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
11/13/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITNESS
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE OF
CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT FILE
Filing Date
11/7/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2018
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT FILE
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
10/26/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10-12-18
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY STATUS
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY STATUS
Filing Date
9/24/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF COMPLETE EMPLOYMENT/DISCIPLINARY FILES OF DETECTIVE CHAMPION INCLUDING CITY OF PHOENIX'S HUMAN RESOURCE FILE AND CR NUMBERS OF AFFECTED CASES
Filing Date
9/18/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MAY EXCEED THE PAGE NUMBER LIMITATIN IN FILING THE REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MALICKI'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/18/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE MARRICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE PROVIDE TO COUNSEL FO THE DEFENDANT THE IDENTITY OF THE DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY IF ANY EMPLOYED BY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS' OFFICE
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MAKICKI'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.7
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PRECLUSION OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS
AND FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION
TO DISMISS
Filing Date
9/14/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
9/13/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND SET STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/11/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND SET STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/11/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
PURUSANT TO RULE 15.1
*ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED
Filing Date
9/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR PRECLUDE WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/10/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
9/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE STATES SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS PERSUANT TO RULE 15.7 AND REQUEST TO PRECLUDE NEW THIRD PARTY DEFENSE
Filing Date
9/6/2018
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
9/5/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 8-31-18
Filing Date
8/31/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE PETITION REFERENCED HEREIN IS INCORPORATED BY REFERENCE
Filing Date
8/28/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND PETITION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER
Filing Date
8/28/2018
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE STATES SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.7
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/WITH PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PRECLUSION OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/22/2018
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2018
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2018
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10000
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR MINUTE ENTRY TO PERMIT INVESTIGATOR TO ASSIST WITH TRIAL
Filing Date
8/9/2018
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
8/8/2018
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
7/24/2018
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PETITION TO SECURE THE ATTENDANCE OF PRISONER AS WITNESS
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 051718
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 051718
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 051818
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 051718
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 051818
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
05/18/18
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/31/2018
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5-31-18
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5-31-18
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5-29-18
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5-30-18
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2018
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SECURITY BOND FOR MATERIAL WITNESS TO APPEAR
Filing Date
6/11/2018
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2018
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2018
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
5-31-18
Filing Date
6/5/2018
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
5-31-18
Filing Date
6/1/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/16/2018
Filing Date
6/1/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/21/2018
Filing Date
6/1/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/17/2018
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/24/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/09/18
Filing Date
5/14/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF FILING RELEASE AND EXAMINATIN OF PHYSICAL EVIDENCE STIPULATION
Filing Date
5/10/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT TO HIS SIXTH NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/19/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT TO HIS
SIXTH NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release and Examination of Physical Evidence
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL CONTINUANCE FORM
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PHONE ANALYSIS
Filing Date
2/27/2018
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PETITION FOR ORDER RE: PHONE
ANALYSIS
Filing Date
2/22/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED
Filing Date
2/21/2018
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR TEMPORARY RELEASE OF PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/9/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICE OF CONTRACT COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/18/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF FILING RELEASE AND EXAMINATION OF PHYSICAL EVIDENCE STIPULATION
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/2/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELEASE OF PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/31/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
1-27-16 LORI L THIELMANN
Filing Date
12/8/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF
Filing Date
12/5/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
Filing Date
12/5/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Oral Argument MAY 27, 2016 JANE ANNE WESTLUND,
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
03/21/2017 BY DEBRA R CARNEY
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DESIGNATION OF RECORD
FOR APPEAL
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
BY PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
11/8/2017
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
by attorney general
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
5-2-17 LORI L THIELMANN
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
05/03/17 BY LORI L THIELMANN
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
05/04/2017 BY Lori Thielmann
Filing Date
10/17/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
04/27/17 by Lori Thielmann
Filing Date
10/17/2017
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Trial Day 18, 05/01/17, All Day, Lori Thielmann
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2017
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS FROM THE FIRST TRIAL IN THIS MATTER BE PRODUCED AND PROVIDED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/20/2017
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
9/12/2017
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEAL AND DEFENSE COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2017
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2017
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2017
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2017
Description
AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ENHANCED SENTENCING PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-708(D)
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 4/SIGNED
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IMPASSE
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1/SIGNED
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 4/SIGNED
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 3/SIGNED
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2/SIGNED
Filing Date
6/21/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2017
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
6/8/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2017
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
6/6/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN
SUPPORT OF WILLITS’
INSTRUCTION
Filing Date
6/2/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#110
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#108
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
110
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
109
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
108
Filing Date
5/31/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2017
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUESTED FJINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
5/30/2017
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FSITANATEL’SJ URREYQ UIENSSTTERDU CTIONS
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#102
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#103
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#104
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#106
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
107
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
106
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
105
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
104
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
103
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
102
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
101
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#107
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
99
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
100
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#99
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOITCE OF DISCLOSURE RE: CLERK OF COURT AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/03/17
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#98
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
98
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
97
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
96
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
95
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
94
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
93
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
92
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
90
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
91
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#97
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
85
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
86
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
87
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
88
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
89
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
78
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
79
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
81
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
82
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
83
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
84
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
80
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#89
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#78
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#81
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#82
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#83
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#79
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#80
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#73
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#74
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#66
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#75
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#76
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#77
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
76
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
77
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
75
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
73
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
74
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
68
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
69
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
70
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
71
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
72
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#68
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#69
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#70
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#71
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#72
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2017
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#63
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#64
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#67
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
63
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
64
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
65
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
66
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
67
Filing Date
4/19/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-24-17
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#58
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#59
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#60
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#61
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#62
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
58
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
59
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
60
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
61
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
62
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-21-17
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM OF LAW RE: UNPROFESSIONAL CONDUCT
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#52
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#53
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#54
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#55
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#56
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#57
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
51
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
52
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
53
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
54
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
55
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
56
Filing Date
3/27/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
57
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#44
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#46
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#47
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#48
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#49
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#50
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
50
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
44
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
45
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
46
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
47
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
48
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
49
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
23
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
24
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
25
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
26
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
27
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
28
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
29
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
30
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
31
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
32
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
33
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
34
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
35
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
36
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
37
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
38
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
39
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
40
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
41
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
42
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
43
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#37
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#38
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#39
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#40
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#41
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#42
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#43
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#31
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#32
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#33
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#35
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#36
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#23
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#24
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#25
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#26
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#28
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#30
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#19
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#20
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#22
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#17
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#18
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
17
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
16
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
18
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
19
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
20
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
21
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
22
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
14
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
15
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
21
Filing Date
3/20/2017
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2017
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF WITNESS COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
8
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
9
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
10
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
11
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
12
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
13
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
1
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
2
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
3
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
4
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
5
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
6
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
7
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR MINUTE ENTRY TO PERMIT INVESTIGATOR TO ASSIST WITH TRIAL
Filing Date
3/13/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALL OF THE PARTIES STIPULATED THAT FOR THE PURPOSE OF A TRIAL TO A JURY, THE ATTACHED JURY PRESENTATION INDICTMENT WILL BE READ BY THE CLERK OF THE JURY IN PLACE OF THE ORIGINALLY FILED INDICTMENT
Filing Date
3/13/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY PRESENTATION 2ND VERSION
Filing Date
3/13/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
3/13/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY PRESENTATION/2ND VERSION
Filing Date
3/10/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2017
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2017
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
3/7/2017
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
3/6/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JURY PRESENTATION
Filing Date
3/1/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALL OF THE PARTIES STIPULATE THAT FOR PURPOSE OF A TRIAL TO A JURY, ATTACHED JURY PRESENTATION INDICTMENT BE READ BY THE CLERK OF THE JURY IN PLACE OF THE ORIGINALLY FILED INDICTMENT
Filing Date
3/1/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JURY PRESENTATION
Filing Date
3/1/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSRTAELTEIM’IS NARERQY UEJSURTEY D INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MALICKIS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GIUNTAS MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUESTED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUESTED VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUESTED VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MALICKIS REQUESTED MOTION IN LIMINE ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
2/27/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/24/17
Filing Date
2/21/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 2-17-17
Filing Date
2/17/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/16/17
Filing Date
2/16/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
2/15/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/07/17
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/13/17
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/13/17
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MALICKI'S MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/11/17
Filing Date
1/27/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/27/17
Filing Date
1/27/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Nicholas Malicki
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE
OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 01/26/17
Filing Date
1/26/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/11/17
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE REQUEST TO TRANSPORT WITNESS TO DOC IS INCORPORATED BY REFERENCE AND GRANTING THE STATES REQUEST
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE REQUEST TO TRANSPORT WITNESS TO DOC IS INCORPORATED BY REFERENCE AND GRANTING THE STATES REQUEST
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/25/2017
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 012517
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/25/2016
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/25/2016
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST TO TRANSPORT WITNESS TO DOC
Filing Date
1/20/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST TO TRANSPORT WITNESS TO DOC
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/11/17
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS A WITNESS
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/18/2017
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2017
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 1-7-17
Filing Date
1/12/2017
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2017
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 1-4-17
Filing Date
1/10/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/9/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/29/16
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/29/16
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/30/16
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/30/2016
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/30/2016
Filing Date
1/5/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/5/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MALICKI'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12-28-16
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12-28-16
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECURING ATTENDANCE
Filing Date
12/28/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/23/16
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WINTNESS
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/08/16
Filing Date
12/12/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2016
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S GUINTA'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2016
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNSECURE APPEARANCE BOND $5000 CASH
Filing Date
10/18/2016
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
10/18/2016
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/7/16
Filing Date
10/10/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/8/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GIUNTA'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
10/5/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10-3-19
Filing Date
10/4/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9/30/16
Filing Date
9/29/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR ARREST WARRANT
Filing Date
9/29/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST FOR ARREST WARRANT
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS
Filing Date
8/30/2016
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
8/24/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/05/16
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO CONTINUE DEPOSITION OF RASCHELLE GUZMAN
Filing Date
6/13/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO CONTINUE DEPOSITION TO RASCHELLE GUZMAN
Filing Date
5/13/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITNESS’S INTENT TO INVOKE THE FIFTH AMENDMENT PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
5/13/2016
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Witness Intent to Invoke the Fifth Amendment Privilege
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/18/16
Filing Date
4/20/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/18/16
Filing Date
4/19/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/22/16
Filing Date
3/28/2016
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2016
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/15/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-10-16
Filing Date
3/15/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-10-16
Filing Date
3/10/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/03/16
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
2/8/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/08/16
Filing Date
1/21/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/21/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/13/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
1/6/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/1/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/06/2015
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/24/15
Filing Date
9/22/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 8-26-15
Filing Date
8/31/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2015
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2015
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/AS WITNESS
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/AS WITNESS
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT ALL ISSUED TRIAL SUBPOENAS DATED FOR 08/12/2015 SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT, FOR THE NEW TRIAL DATE OF 09/01/2015 BEFORE THE MASTER CALENDAR
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT ALL ISSUED TRIAL SUBPOENAS DATED FOR 08/12/15 SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT FOR THE TRIAL DATE OF 09/01/15 BEFORE THE MASTER CALENDAR
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 8-7-15
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 8-5-15
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 8-9-15
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/03/2015
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/03/15
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/03/15
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/28/15
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 8-3-15
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUESTED SUBPOENA ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUESTED SUBPOENA ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/27/2015
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/30/15
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/30/15
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/30/15
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/30/15
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/30/2015
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/27/15
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2015
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
7/2/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Request for Appointment of Counsel
Filing Date
7/2/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/12/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
6/12/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 2-6-15
Filing Date
2/5/2015
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2015
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2014
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE EXPARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
12/2/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2014
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2014
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2014
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIALS
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/7/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2014
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
5/21/2014
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/15/14
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Waive Defendents Presence
Filing Date
1/6/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: CAMERA COVERAGE
Filing Date
12/26/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/26/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2013
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE COURT APPEARANCE
Filing Date
11/27/2013
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO
CONSOLIDATE COURT APPEARANCE
Filing Date
11/12/2013
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit
Filing Date
11/12/2013
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL
DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR AN
EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL
DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR AN
EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
10/8/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/16/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/15/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
8/15/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR
CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF
HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
))
CR2013-416818-001
Defendant. )))))
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2013
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2013
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR FURTHER
EXTENSION OF TIME TO
CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY
PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
5/14/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND ORDER FOR
EXPEDITIOUS DISCLOSURE
OF 911 TAPES AND/OR
RADIO BROADCASTS
Filing Date
5/14/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/14/2013
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/14/2013
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2013
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2013
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2013
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/7/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/6/2013
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2013
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2013
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2013
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ISSUED ON 4/23/2013
Filing Date
4/24/2013
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/24/2013
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2013
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2013
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/16/2013
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/23/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/24/2013
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/26/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/1/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/1/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/21/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/10/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/19/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/19/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/15/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/15/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/3/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/3/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/5/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/5/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/12/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/12/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/19/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/19/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/29/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/29/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/19/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/19/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/1/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/1/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/8/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/19/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/19/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/5/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/5/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/10/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/10/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/17/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/17/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/24/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/9/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/9/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/16/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/16/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/18/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/18/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/22/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/22/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/3/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/3/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/15/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/15/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/9/2015
Time
9:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/9/2015
Time
9:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/5/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/5/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/12/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/12/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/25/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/25/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/1/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/1/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/15/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/22/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/24/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/1/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/27/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/3/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/23/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/30/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/6/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/6/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/13/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/13/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/27/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/27/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/3/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/3/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/9/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/9/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/16/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/18/2016
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/21/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/15/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/18/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/18/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/21/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/28/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/27/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/17/2016
Time
13:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/28/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/29/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/29/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/5/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/9/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/9/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/9/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/7/2016
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/12/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/12/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/13/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/13/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/17/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/17/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/18/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/1/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/1/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/7/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/8/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/30/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/30/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/8/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/8/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/9/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/12/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
2/27/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/6/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/6/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/9/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/9/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/13/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/13/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/15/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/15/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/23/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/23/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/28/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/28/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/29/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/29/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/18/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/18/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/19/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/19/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/20/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/20/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/25/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/25/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/26/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/26/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/1/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/1/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/2/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/2/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/4/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/4/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/8/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/8/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/9/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/9/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/30/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/30/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/31/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/31/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/1/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/1/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/8/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/8/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/15/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/15/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/16/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/16/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/19/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/19/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/20/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/20/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/26/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/26/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/29/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/29/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/24/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/25/2017
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/25/2017
Time
14:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
9/25/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/20/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/27/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/4/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/7/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/12/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/5/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/8/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/12/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/31/2018
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/11/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/11/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
8/20/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/27/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/28/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/30/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/18/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/26/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/8/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/9/2018
Time
13:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/25/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
11/15/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/6/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/1/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/8/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/1/2019
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/22/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/25/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/25/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/29/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/1/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/6/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/13/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/10/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/12/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/29/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/6/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/13/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/15/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/22/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2019
Time
14:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/13/2019
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/17/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/17/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/9/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/15/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/15/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/16/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/16/2020
Time
10:31
Event
Trial
Date
4/15/2020
Time
8:29
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/1/2020
Time
8:45
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/2/2020
Time
8:29
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/4/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/25/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/29/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/1/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing