« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Probation Violation
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Brian Travis Henry - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Reedy, Kyle
Judge
Phillips
Case #
CR2013-109891-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2013-109891-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Brian Travis Henry
Crime Date
2/27/2013
Date
5/2/2013
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Brian Travis Henry
Crime Date
2/27/2013
Date
6/24/2013
Description
RESISTING ARREST
ARSCode
13-2508 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Brian Travis Henry
Crime Date
2/27/2013
Date
6/24/2013
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2015
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2015
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
2/24/2015
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
11/13/2014
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2014
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
SUP - Supplemental Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2014
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2014
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2014
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2014
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2013
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
11/1/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2013
Description
ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1/WARRANTLESS
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2013
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2013
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $900 BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
7/17/2013
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
$900
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2013
Description
PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
6/27/2013
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2013
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2013
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2013
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2013
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2013
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2013
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1800 WILLIAMSBURG NATIONAL INS CO
Filing Date
3/12/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2013
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/28/2013
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/7/2013
Time
8:35
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/11/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/2/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/2/2013
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
6/24/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
7/8/2013
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/15/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/31/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
9/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
10/31/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
1/7/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
2/10/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
2/19/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/6/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
6/2/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference