« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Garvin, Adam      
Carlos Sierra - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Koplow, Lawrence   Giaquinto  CR2013-103480-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
             
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A1 (F4)  AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI  1/19/2013  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/28/2013 
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A1 (F4)  AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI  1/19/2013  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/28/2013 
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A2 (F4)  AGGRAVATED DUI-THIRD DUI  1/19/2013  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/28/2013 
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A2 (F4)  AGGRAVATED DUI-THIRD DUI  1/19/2013  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/28/2013 
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A1 (F4)  AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI  1/19/2013  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  7/22/2014 
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A2 (F4)  AGGRAVATED DUI-THIRD DUI  1/19/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/29/2014 
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A1 (F4)  AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI  1/19/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/29/2014 
Carlos Sierra  28-1383A1 (F4)  AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI  1/19/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/29/2014 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/15/2017  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  11/21/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 1
11/15/2017  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)  11/21/2017   
11/20/2014  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  11/20/2014   
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines and /or Other Fees
9/15/2014  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  9/17/2014   
9/15/2014  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  9/17/2014   
9/9/2014  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  9/9/2014   
8/29/2014  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  9/26/2014   
8/29/2014  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  8/29/2014   
8/29/2014  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  9/10/2014   
8/29/2014  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  9/9/2014   
8/29/2014  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  9/12/2014   
7/24/2014  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  7/24/2014   
7/22/2014  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  7/30/2014   
7/21/2014  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  7/21/2014   
7/15/2014  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/22/2014   
NOTE: JOINT PRE-TRIAL /FOR TRIAL
7/11/2014  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  7/11/2014   
6/9/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  6/9/2014   
4/2/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/2/2014   
3/31/2014  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/31/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL SET FOR APRIL 8,2014
2/28/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/28/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES
1/29/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/29/2014   
1/27/2014  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/29/2014   
NOTE: FEBRUARY 3, 2014 JURY TRIAL
1/22/2014  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  1/22/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
1/22/2014  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/22/2014   
NOTE: Request for Discovery/ Notice of Defenses/ List of Witnesses Exhibits
11/22/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  11/22/2013   
10/18/2013  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/18/2013   
9/30/2013  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  9/30/2013   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
9/16/2013  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  9/18/2013   
9/11/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/11/2013   
NOTE: NOT SERVED
9/10/2013  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  9/10/2013   
9/6/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/10/2013   
NOTE: OF ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER FROM LEGAL ADVOCATE TO OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES
9/6/2013  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/6/2013   
9/4/2013  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  9/4/2013   
8/28/2013  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)  8/28/2013   
8/27/2013  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/28/2013  Plaintiff (1)  
8/27/2013  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/28/2013   
8/27/2013  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  8/28/2013  Plaintiff (1)  
8/26/2013  NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)  8/29/2013   
8/2/2013  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)  8/2/2013   
8/1/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/6/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE AND/ OF ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER OFFICE OF THE LEGAL ADVOCATE
7/30/2013  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
7/29/2013  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
7/17/2013  179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)  7/17/2013   
7/15/2013  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  7/18/2013   
7/15/2013  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)  7/18/2013   
6/14/2013  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  6/14/2013   
6/14/2013  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  6/17/2013   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/15/2013  13:30   Initial Appearance 
7/29/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
8/5/2013  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
8/26/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
8/29/2013  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/4/2013  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/17/2013  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/18/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
1/27/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/3/2014  10:30   Trial 
4/1/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/8/2014  10:30   Trial 
5/27/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/2/2014  10:30   Trial 
7/8/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/15/2014  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/15/2014  10:30   Trial 
7/22/2014  9:30   Trial 
8/27/2014  9:00   Sentencing 
8/29/2014  8:30   Sentencing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center