« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Brandon Jessie Henry - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Defender, Public
Judge
Simon
Case #
CR2012-148218-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2012-148218-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Brandon Jessie Henry
Crime Date
9/11/2012
Date
9/19/2012
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Brandon Jessie Henry
Crime Date
9/11/2012
Date
10/17/2012
Description
ASSAULT-INTENT/RECKLESS/INJURE
ARSCode
13-1203A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Brandon Jessie Henry
Crime Date
9/11/2012
Date
10/17/2012
Description
CRIMINAL DAMAGE
ARSCode
13-1602 (M2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Brandon Jessie Henry
Crime Date
9/11/2012
Date
10/17/2012
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/30/2015
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2015
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
3/27/2015
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2012
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2012
Description
SUP - Supplemental Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2012
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2012
Description
SUP - Supplemental Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2012
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORAL ARGUMENT 09/28/2012
Filing Date
9/27/2012
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2012
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2012
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/12/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/19/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/19/2012
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/28/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Modify Release Conditions
Date
10/17/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt