« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2012-105480-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2012-105480-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
10/27/2011
Date
3/13/2012
Description
FALSE REPT FIRE/BOMB/EMERGENCY
ARSCode
13-2907 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
10/27/2011
Date
3/13/2012
Description
FORGERY
ARSCode
13-2002 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
11/1/2011
Date
3/13/2012
Description
FALSE REPORT TO LAW ENFORCE
ARSCode
13-2907.01 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
1/25/2011
Date
3/13/2012
Description
RESISTING ARREST
ARSCode
13-2508 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
10/27/2011
Date
8/9/2012
Description
FALSE REPT FIRE/BOMB/EMERGENCY
ARSCode
13-2907 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
10/27/2011
Date
8/9/2012
Description
FORGERY
ARSCode
13-2002 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
11/1/2011
Date
9/10/2012
Description
FALSE REPORT TO LAW ENFORCE
ARSCode
13-2907.01 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lisa Marie Hollis
Crime Date
1/25/2012
Date
9/10/2012
Description
RESISTING ARREST
ARSCode
13-2508 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2014
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
10/1/2013
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2013
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
8/26/2013
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2012
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RECORD
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/10/2012
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2012
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2012
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2012
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2012
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/
Filing Date
6/7/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT DEFENDANT SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS
Filing Date
5/30/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRIOR FELONY
CONVICTION PURSUANT TO
A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TAKING PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
5/14/2012
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2012
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2012
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1800 (BOND POSTED)
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $1800 INTERNATIONAL CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA REINSURANCE
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
3/6/2012
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2012
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2012
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2012
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2012
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2012
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2012
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/1/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/8/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/13/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/15/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/27/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/6/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/9/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/19/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/7/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/11/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/9/2012
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/16/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/10/2012
Time
8:45
Event
Sentencing