« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, P T D - Prelim Bureau A
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Carlos Henry - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Kratter, Marci
Judge
ZZ CR Admin
Case #
CR2009-116049-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Carlos Henry
Crime Date
3/4/2009
Date
4/17/2009
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2009
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2009
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2009
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2009
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2009
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LETTERS
Filing Date
8/14/2009
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2009
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LETTERS
Filing Date
6/23/2009
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2009
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2009
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2009
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2009
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2009
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2009
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/17/2009
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2009
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2009
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2009
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/12/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/13/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/17/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/17/2009
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/22/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/19/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/14/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing