« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Faleh Hassan Almaleki - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Defender, Public   Master Calendar  CR2009-008053-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Faleh Hassan Almaleki  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  10/20/2009  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/2/2009 
Faleh Hassan Almaleki  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  10/20/2009  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/2/2009 
Faleh Hassan Almaleki  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  10/20/2009  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/14/2010 
Faleh Hassan Almaleki  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  10/20/2009  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/14/2010 
Faleh Hassan Almaleki  28-661 (F2)  HIT AND RUN W/DEATH/INJURY  10/20/2009  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/14/2010 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/24/2010  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/26/2010   
5/18/2010  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/20/2010   
5/18/2010  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/20/2010   
5/18/2010  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/20/2010   
1/15/2010  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)  1/15/2010   
1/12/2010  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/12/2010   
1/11/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  1/11/2010   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
1/8/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/8/2010   
NOTE: FOR OPEN DEATH PENALTY PROCESS
1/6/2010  PMS - Pretrial Management Statement - Party (001)  1/13/2010   
12/24/2009  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  12/24/2009   
12/24/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/30/2009   
12/23/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  12/23/2009   
12/23/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/23/2009   
12/23/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/23/2009   
12/22/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
NOTE: MOTION AND ORDER FOR EXPEDITIOUS DISCLOSURE OF 911 TAPES
12/22/2009  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS
12/22/2009  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES
12/22/2009  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
12/22/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE
12/3/2009  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  12/3/2009   
11/24/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/24/2009   
11/16/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/17/2009   
NOTE: TO APPOINT COURT INTERPRETER
11/10/2009  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  11/10/2009   
11/9/2009  173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)  11/9/2009   
11/9/2009  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  11/9/2009   
11/9/2009  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  11/12/2009   
11/2/2009  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  11/2/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 10/31/09
10/28/2009  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  11/2/2009   
NOTE: USED FOR EXEMPT ONLY
10/23/2009  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  11/2/2009   
10/23/2009  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  11/2/2009   
10/21/2009  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  10/22/2009   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/5/2009  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
11/9/2009  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
11/23/2009  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
1/6/2010  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/8/2010  8:15   Status Conference 
click here for Self-Service Center