Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Garrow, Philip      
Olena Kulakova - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Kimerer, Michael   Reckart  CR2009-005863-001  
Paul Balikian - (3)
 
Defendant  M   Mitchell, Barry   Reckart  CR2009-005863-002  
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Paul Balikian  13-1003 (F2)  CONSPIRACY  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2010 
Paul Balikian  13-2308C (F4)  ASSIST CRIMINAL SYNDICATE  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2010 
Paul Balikian  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2010 
Paul Balikian  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2010 
Paul Balikian  13-2408 (M1)  SECURE PROCEEDS OF OFFENSE  5/1/2006  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  7/31/2009 
Paul Balikian  13-2312B (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2010 
Olena Kulakova  13-1003 (F2)  CONSPIRACY  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2308A1 (F2)  MANAGE/FINANCE CRIM SYNDICATE  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  5/1/2006  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  7/14/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  5/1/2006  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  7/14/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2317 (F3)  MONEY LAUNDERING  5/1/2006  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  7/14/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2312B (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  5/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/6/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/6/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/8/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/8/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/20/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/26/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/29/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/10/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/11/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/19/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/24/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/25/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/10/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/11/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/14/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/17/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/23/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/23/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/24/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  9/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  9/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  9/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  9/14/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  9/14/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  9/18/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  9/19/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  10/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  10/13/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/23/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/2/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  5/19/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/16/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/22/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/26/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  8/24/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  10/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  10/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  10/13/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/18/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  1/6/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  1/6/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/8/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/8/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/20/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/26/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/29/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  7/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  7/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  7/10/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  7/11/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  7/19/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  7/24/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  7/25/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/10/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/11/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/14/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/17/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/23/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/23/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/24/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  9/1/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  9/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  9/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  9/14/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  9/14/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  9/18/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  9/19/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  10/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  10/13/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  1/23/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3408A5 (F4)  NARC DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  2/2/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  5/19/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/5/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/16/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/22/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  6/26/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  8/24/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  10/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  10/2/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  10/13/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Olena Kulakova  13-3407A5 (F4)  DANG DRUG-ADMIN TO ANOTHER  1/18/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/10/2009 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/29/2014  PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: COUNTS 4, 5 AND 6/NO BOND 
4/29/2014  PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: Issued 2014-04-29 
3/20/2014  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  3/25/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 4 
4/24/2012  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  5/8/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 6 
12/12/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/12/2011   
11/7/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/9/2011  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO CORRECT/MODIFY COMMUNITY RESTITUTION HOURS AMOUNT 
9/13/2011  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  9/19/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 4 
9/13/2011  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  9/19/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 6 
8/29/2011  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  9/2/2011   
8/19/2010  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)  8/19/2010   
7/22/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/22/2010   
7/9/2010  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  7/9/2010   
NOTE: Stipulation To Amount Of Money Involved In Money Laundering- Count 6  
6/14/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  6/14/2010   
6/11/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/16/2010   
NOTE: RE: MOTION FOR RESTITUTION 
5/24/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/25/2010   
NOTE: FOR ORDER OF RESTITUTION 
5/5/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/5/2010   
4/29/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/3/2010   
NOTE: TO STATE MOTION FOR ORDER OF RESTITUTION 
4/19/2010  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  4/20/2010   
NOTE: Stipulation for Substitution of Consel 
4/7/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  4/7/2010   
4/1/2010  ORD - Order - Party (002)  4/6/2010   
NOTE: TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT 
3/31/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/2/2010   
NOTE: FOR ORDER OF RESTITUTION 
3/18/2010  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  3/18/2010   
3/17/2010  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  3/23/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 4 
2/25/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  2/25/2010   
NOTE: TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
2/22/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  2/22/2010   
2/19/2010  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (002)  2/26/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 6 
2/19/2010  ORD - Order - Party (002)  3/1/2010   
NOTE: GRANTING TERMINATION OF DR BALIKIANS PROBATION EFFECTIVE THIS DATE AND DESIGNATING AS A MISDEMEANOR OF OFFENSE TO WHICH HE PLED GUILTY 
2/2/2010  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  2/4/2010   
1/26/2010  110 - ME: Suspension Of Sentence - Unsupervised Probation - Party (002)  1/26/2010   
1/26/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  1/26/2010   
NOTE: Motion for Termination of Probation and Misdemeanor Designation 
1/25/2010  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  1/28/2010   
1/25/2010  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)  2/8/2010   
1/25/2010  REP - Report - Party (002)  2/4/2010   
NOTE: COMMUNITY SERVICE ATTENDANCE LOG 
12/21/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  12/23/2009   
12/15/2009  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  12/15/2009   
12/10/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
12/10/2009  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
12/10/2009  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
12/10/2009  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
12/10/2009  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  12/28/2009   
11/12/2009  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)  11/12/2009   
11/2/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  11/2/2009   
NOTE: Motion to Continue November 6 2009 Sentencing Hearing 
10/28/2009  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)  10/28/2009   
10/27/2009  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  10/27/2009   
9/29/2009  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  9/29/2009   
9/15/2009  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  9/17/2009   
NOTE: SENTENCING/ 
8/11/2009  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)  8/11/2009   
8/11/2009  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  8/11/2009   
7/31/2009  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)  8/18/2009   
7/20/2009  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  7/20/2009   
7/15/2009  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  7/15/2009   
7/15/2009  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  7/15/2009   
7/14/2009  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  7/23/2009   
7/9/2009  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/9/2009   
7/2/2009  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/7/2009   
NOTE: SECOND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 7/6/09 
6/26/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  6/26/2009   
6/24/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  6/24/2009   
6/23/2009  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  6/23/2009   
6/23/2009  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  6/23/2009   
6/22/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  6/22/2009   
6/11/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/11/2009   
NOTE: Motion to Waive Dr. Paul Balikians Appearance at the Case Management Conference Scheduled for July 6, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. 
6/9/2009  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  6/9/2009   
6/9/2009  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)  6/9/2009   
6/1/2009  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  6/1/2009   
6/1/2009  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)  6/1/2009   
6/1/2009  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/2/2009   
NOTE: FIRST JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT / (FOR JUNE 2, 2009) 
4/8/2009  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  4/8/2009   
4/7/2009  ORD - Order - Party (002)  4/9/2009   
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRAVEL OUTSIDE THE STATE OF ARIZONA 
4/1/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  4/1/2009   
3/31/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  4/2/2009   
NOTE: TO TRAVEL OUTSIDE THE STATE OF ARIZONA 
3/31/2009  ORD - Order - Party (002)  4/7/2009   
NOTE: GRANTING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
3/25/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  3/25/2009   
3/25/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  3/25/2009   
3/24/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/27/2009   
NOTE: OF WAIVER OF DEFENDANT PAUL BALIKIAN'S APPEARANCE AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUNE 02, 2009 
3/24/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/24/2009   
3/20/2009  ORD - Order - Party (002)  3/24/2009   
NOTE: GRANTING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 
3/19/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/23/2009   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
3/18/2009  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/18/2009   
3/18/2009  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  3/18/2009   
3/18/2009  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)  3/18/2009   
3/18/2009  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  3/18/2009   
3/17/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/19/2009   
NOTE: TO WAIVE DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE AT THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/23/2009 
3/5/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/5/2009   
NOTE: Defendant Balikians Initial Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 15.2 
3/3/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/3/2009   
3/2/2009  ORD - Order - Party (002)  3/2/2009   
NOTE: GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND FOR 30 DAYS UNTIL 03/25/2009 
2/27/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/3/2009   
NOTE: DISCLOSURE 
2/27/2009  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)  3/3/2009   
2/27/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/3/2009   
NOTE: TO DESIGNATE CASE COMPLEX 
2/27/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/3/2009   
NOTE: DISCLOSURE 
2/27/2009  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  3/3/2009   
2/27/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/3/2009   
NOTE: TO DESIGNATE CASE COMPLEX 
2/24/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/23/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
NOTE: FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION 
2/20/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/20/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/20/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/20/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/20/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/20/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/20/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/19/2009  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  2/19/2009   
NOTE: Deadline for Filing Motion to Remand 
2/11/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/11/2009   
2/9/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/9/2009   
NOTE: OFFICE OF CONTRACT COUNSEL 
2/9/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/10/2009   
2/9/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  2/10/2009   
2/9/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/10/2009   
2/6/2009  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/10/2009   
NOTE: FOR PRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE 
2/6/2009  STA - Statement - Party (001)  2/10/2009   
NOTE: RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE 
2/6/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/10/2009   
1/29/2009  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  1/29/2009   
1/29/2009  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  1/29/2009   
1/28/2009  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)  1/29/2009   
1/28/2009  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/29/2009   
1/28/2009  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (002)  1/29/2009   
1/28/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  1/29/2009   
1/28/2009  DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001)  2/5/2009   
1/22/2009  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  1/22/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 1/16/09 
1/22/2009  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)  1/22/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 1/16/09 
1/14/2009  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  1/22/2009   
1/14/2009  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)  1/22/2009   
1/14/2009  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/22/2009   
1/14/2009  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  1/22/2009   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/28/2009  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/28/2009  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/9/2009  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/9/2009  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/23/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/23/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/2/2009  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
6/2/2009  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
6/23/2009  8:30   Settlement Conference 
6/23/2009  8:30   Settlement Conference 
6/30/2009  9:00   Settlement Conference 
7/6/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/6/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/14/2009  8:30   Change Of Plea 
7/31/2009  15:30   Settlement Conference 
8/10/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/10/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/11/2009  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
9/11/2009  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
9/11/2009  11:00   Trial Management Conference 
9/11/2009  11:00   Trial Management Conference 
9/17/2009  8:30   Sentencing 
9/21/2009  10:00   Trial 
9/21/2009  10:00   Trial 
10/5/2009  8:00   Trial 
10/5/2009  8:00   Trial 
10/5/2009  10:00   Trial 
10/5/2009  10:00   Trial 
10/22/2009  8:30   Sentencing 
10/23/2009  8:30   Sentencing 
11/6/2009  11:00   Sentencing 
12/10/2009  8:30   Sentencing 
1/25/2010  9:30   Sentencing