Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Rodney Eugene SmithJr. - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Harrison, V   Mulleneaux  CR2008-146855-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/24/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/5/2008 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/24/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/5/2008 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/24/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/5/2008 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/24/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/22/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/24/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/22/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Rodney Eugene Smith Jr.  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  7/24/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  7/9/2010 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/10/2013  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  4/12/2013   
4/10/2013  115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  4/10/2013   
4/5/2013  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  4/23/2013   
4/5/2013  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
3/7/2013  117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (001)  3/7/2013   
3/6/2013  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  3/6/2013   
NOTE: STATES 
2/27/2013  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  2/27/2013   
2/13/2013  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/13/2013   
2/7/2013  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  2/7/2013   
10/31/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/31/2012   
10/31/2012  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  10/31/2012   
10/15/2012  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  10/15/2012   
10/15/2012  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  10/15/2012   
9/28/2012  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  9/28/2012   
9/12/2012  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/13/2012   
NOTE: IA Packet 
9/12/2012  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  9/13/2012   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
8/31/2012  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/31/2012   
7/25/2012  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  7/25/2012   
7/6/2012  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  7/6/2012   
7/2/2012  004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)  7/2/2012   
6/29/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  7/11/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
6/29/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  7/11/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 3 
3/2/2012  MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (001)  3/8/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
2/15/2012  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  2/24/2012   
6/28/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: FOR EARLY RELEASE  
6/10/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/14/2011  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: FRO EARLY RELEASE 
4/29/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/3/2011  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: FOR EARLY RELEASE 
3/1/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/2/2011  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: FOR WORK RELEASE 
12/6/2010  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  12/6/2010   
12/3/2010  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  12/16/2010   
10/29/2010  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  10/29/2010   
10/18/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  10/18/2010   
10/6/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/7/2010   
NOTE: FOR RESTITUTION ORDER 
8/17/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/17/2010   
8/10/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/12/2010  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO BE TRANSFERRED TO WORK RELEASE FROM WORK FURLOUGH 
7/27/2010  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  7/29/2010   
7/12/2010  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  7/12/2010   
7/9/2010  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  7/13/2010   
7/9/2010  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  7/13/2010   
7/9/2010  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  7/13/2010   
7/9/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/19/2010   
7/9/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/19/2010   
7/9/2010  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  7/12/2010   
7/9/2010  SUP - Supplemental Presentence Report - Party (001)  7/12/2010   
6/17/2010  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  6/17/2010   
6/14/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  6/17/2010   
NOTE: OF CORRESPONDENCE 
5/20/2010  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  5/20/2010   
5/17/2010  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/19/2010   
NOTE: SENTENCING 
4/16/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
NOTE: TO VACATE AND RESET SENTENCING 
4/14/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/14/2010   
4/14/2010  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  4/16/2010   
4/8/2010  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  4/8/2010   
NOTE: for temporary modification of release conditions 
4/7/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/12/2010   
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS 
3/24/2010  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  3/24/2010   
3/22/2010  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  3/26/2010   
3/15/2010  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  3/15/2010   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO PENALTY OR SENTENCE 
3/12/2010  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  3/18/2010   
NOTE: OF SERVICE 3-9-10 
3/9/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  3/9/2010   
3/8/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/8/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 03/05/10 
3/4/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/5/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST 
3/3/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/4/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 03/02/10 
3/3/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/4/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 03/02/10 
3/3/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/4/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 03/02/10 
3/3/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/4/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 03/02/10 
3/1/2010  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  3/1/2010   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE VICTIMS PROBATION STATUS  
3/1/2010  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  3/1/2010   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED GANG MEMBERSHIP OR ASSOCIATION 
2/23/2010  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  2/23/2010   
2/16/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/17/2010   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST 
2/15/2010  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  2/16/2010   
NOTE: Defendants Settlement Conference Memorandum 
1/20/2010  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  1/20/2010   
12/2/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  12/2/2009   
12/1/2009  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  12/1/2009   
11/24/2009  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  11/24/2009   
11/19/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/23/2009   
NOTE: TRIAL 
10/13/2009  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  10/13/2009   
10/13/2009  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/13/2009   
10/7/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/15/2009   
NOTE: FOR COURT ORDER TO RELEASE MEDICAL RECORDS AND INTERVIEW HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 
10/7/2009  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/15/2009   
NOTE: TO RELEASE MEDICAL RECORDS AND INTERVIEW HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 
10/6/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  10/6/2009   
9/23/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/23/2009   
NOTE: FOR COURT ORDER TO RELEASE MEDICAL RECORDS AND INTERVIEW HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 
9/23/2009  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  9/23/2009   
NOTE:  
9/17/2009  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  9/17/2009   
9/16/2009  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/28/2009   
9/11/2009  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/11/2009   
8/25/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/25/2009   
8/24/2009  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/26/2009   
NOTE: TO STATE'S RESPONDE REGARDING MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS 
8/18/2009  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/19/2009   
NOTE: TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
8/14/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/17/2009   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
7/30/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  7/30/2009   
7/27/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/27/2009   
7/20/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/21/2009   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / OF WITNESSES 
7/6/2009  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  7/6/2009   
5/28/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  5/28/2009   
5/18/2009  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  5/18/2009   
5/14/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/18/2009   
NOTE: JOINT / TRIAL 
5/5/2009  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/5/2009   
4/30/2009  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  4/30/2009   
4/24/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/24/2009   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
3/16/2009  591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)  3/16/2009   
3/10/2009  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)  3/17/2009   
2/17/2009  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  2/17/2009   
2/2/2009  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/2/2009   
1/30/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/2/2009   
1/30/2009  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/2/2009   
NOTE: FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE 
1/28/2009  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  1/28/2009   
1/23/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/23/2009   
1/23/2009  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  1/23/2009   
1/16/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/20/2009   
NOTE: TRIAL AND NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS 
12/29/2008  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  12/29/2008   
NOTE: TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
12/22/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/29/2008   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
12/5/2008  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  12/5/2008   
11/26/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/28/2008   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
10/30/2008  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/30/2008  BON - Bond - Party (001)  10/31/2008   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $16,000.00 BANKERS INS. CO. 
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008  Defendant (2)  
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  LET - Letter - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
10/22/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  10/24/2008   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE/SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $16,000 10/22/2008 
10/17/2008  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/17/2008   
10/15/2008  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  10/15/2008   
10/15/2008  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  10/15/2008   
NOTE: TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
10/9/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/9/2008   
NOTE: joint casea management plan 
10/8/2008  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  10/8/2008   
10/7/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/8/2008   
10/6/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/7/2008   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
10/3/2008  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  10/3/2008   
9/30/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  10/6/2008   
9/30/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/6/2008   
9/30/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/6/2008   
9/30/2008  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/30/2008  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/26/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/26/2008   
NOTE: TO DESIGNATE COMPLEX 
9/23/2008  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
NOTE:  
9/12/2008  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  9/12/2008   
9/11/2008  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)  9/12/2008   
8/22/2008  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  8/22/2008   
8/22/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/22/2008   
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW 
8/15/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)  8/18/2008   
NOTE:  
8/6/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  8/6/2008   
8/4/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  8/6/2008   
NOTE: VACATE 
8/4/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/6/2008   
NOTE: TO VACATE HEARING 
8/4/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/5/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
8/4/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/5/2008   
8/4/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  8/5/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
7/28/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  7/28/2008   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/31/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
8/4/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
8/13/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/24/2008  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/14/2008  8:45   Status Conference 
10/22/2008  8:15   Oral Argument 
12/1/2008  8:45   Status Conference 
1/20/2009  8:00   Hearing Pending Motion 
1/20/2009  8:45   Status Conference 
1/26/2009  8:45   Oral Argument 
2/9/2009  8:45   Status Conference 
3/10/2009  8:45   Status Conference 
4/27/2009  8:45   Status Conference 
4/27/2009  10:45   Trial 
5/1/2009  8:45   Status Conference 
5/14/2009  8:45   Trial Management Conference 
5/18/2009  10:45   Trial 
7/22/2009  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/27/2009  8:00   Trial 
7/27/2009  10:45   Trial 
9/4/2009  8:15   Oral Argument 
9/16/2009  11:00   Status Conference 
10/7/2009  9:30   Status Conference 
11/25/2009  9:00   Oral Argument 
12/1/2009  8:30   Trial 
12/1/2009  9:00   Trial 
1/15/2010  9:30   Settlement Conference 
2/19/2010  11:00   Settlement Conference 
3/5/2010  11:31   Settlement Conference 
3/19/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
3/22/2010  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/30/2010  10:30   Trial 
4/23/2010  8:30   Sentencing 
5/28/2010  8:30   Sentencing 
6/14/2010  8:30   Sentencing 
7/9/2010  8:30   Sentencing 
10/27/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
12/3/2010  8:30   Restitution Hearing 
6/28/2012  10:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
7/5/2012  8:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
7/24/2012  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
8/23/2012  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
9/25/2012  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
10/2/2012  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
10/15/2012  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
10/24/2012  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
11/1/2012  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
11/7/2012  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
11/14/2012  11:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/4/2013  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/11/2013  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/11/2013  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/25/2013  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/25/2013  10:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/26/2013  10:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/27/2013  10:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/5/2013  8:45   Disposition Hearing