« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Bernard Henry - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Defender, Public
Judge
Davison
Case #
CR2008-103331-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2008-103331-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Bernard Henry
Crime Date
7/29/2007
Date
1/8/2009
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bernard Henry
Crime Date
7/29/2007
Date
1/8/2009
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bernard Henry
Crime Date
7/29/2007
Date
6/30/2010
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Bernard Henry
Crime Date
7/29/2007
Date
7/30/2010
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2012
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2010
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2010
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2010
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2010
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2010
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2010
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2010
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2010
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2010
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2010
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2010
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2010
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/08/10
Filing Date
2/1/2010
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
$900 PAID TO COUNTY TREASURER
Filing Date
1/22/2010
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
$900 BOND FORFEITURE
Filing Date
1/20/2010
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2009
Description
195 - ME: Bond Forfeited - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2009
Description
BFJ - Bond Forfeiture Judgment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2009
Description
180 - ME: Bond Forfeiture Hrg - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2009
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2009
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2009
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/26/2009
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 01/22/2009
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 01/21/09
Filing Date
1/20/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2009
Description
DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2009
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/7/2009
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2009
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/7/2009
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2009
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL
Filing Date
12/12/2008
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $900 BOND AMERICAN CONTRACTOR INDEMNITY COMPANY
Filing Date
12/4/2008
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED RELEASE AND SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $900 12/02/08
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
11/28/2008
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/25/08
Filing Date
11/19/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHOW LOW JUSTICE COURT
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2008
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2008
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/20/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/2/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/5/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/6/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/9/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/15/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/26/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/9/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
6/11/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
10/13/2009
Time
13:31
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
6/15/2010
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
6/15/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
6/29/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/30/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/30/2010
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/30/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing