« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
COUNTY ATTORNEY CRIMINAL -CCC,
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Amber Monique Henry - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Valdez, Gabriel
Judge
Minder
Case #
CR2004-007662-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2004-007662-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Amber Monique Henry
Crime Date
11/15/2003
Date
9/14/2004
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Amber Monique Henry
Crime Date
11/15/2003
Date
11/1/2004
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED CIVIL RIGHTS/DENIED VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CHARGES
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CFO INFO
Filing Date
12/27/2010
Description
AVJ - Application to Vacate Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS
Filing Date
5/14/2008
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2007
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2007
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2007
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
8/21/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2006
Description
RPT - Response to Petition for Early Termination - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2006
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2004
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/24/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2004
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2004
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2004
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2004
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2004
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2004
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2004
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING
Filing Date
10/21/2004
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2004
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2004
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2004
Description
TDA - Trial Date Acknowledgement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2004
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF AMOUNT OF DRUGS EQUAL TO OR IN EXCESS OF THE STATUTORY THRESHOLD AMOUNT
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
7/27/2004
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2004
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2004
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2004
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2004
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2004
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2004
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2004
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2004
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 7/12/04
Filing Date
3/15/2004
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2004
Description
612 - ME: Gj Quash Summons/Issue Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2004
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2004
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/19/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/25/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/3/2004
Time
15:15
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/14/2004
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/18/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/1/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/13/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
12/15/2004
Time
9:30
Event
Trial