« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Moore, William
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Bruce Allan Henry - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Fox, Taylor
Judge
Whitehead
Case #
CR2000-092541-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2000-092541-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Bruce Allan Henry
Crime Date
10/10/1999
Date
8/10/2000
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Bruce Allan Henry
Crime Date
10/10/1999
Date
6/28/2000
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2007
Description
OVJ - Order Vacating Judgment - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND RESTORING CIVIL AND GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
10/25/2007
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
CFO INFORMATION
Filing Date
9/26/2007
Description
AVJ - Application to Vacate Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/2/2007
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AND RESTORE CIVIL AND GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
2/14/2003
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/27/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2002
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2002
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/6/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2000
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR EARLY RELEASE
Filing Date
8/25/2000
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/25/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2000
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/16/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2000 8:43:00 AM
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/10/2000 8:43:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
8/10/2000
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/16/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2000
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/17/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
8/10/2000
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/17/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2000
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/2/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2000
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2000
Description
TRM - Transmittal - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/11/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 6-29-00
Filing Date
6/15/2000
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/16/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO SET INITIAL APPEARANCE DATE TO QUASH BENCH WARRANT
Filing Date
6/13/2000
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/13/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2000
Description
INF - Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1,2/TRAFFICKING IN STOLEN PROPERTY/CL 3 FEL
Filing Date
5/25/2000
Description
COM - Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/26/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG CL 3 FEL; CT 2: TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG CL 3 FEL; DOC: ON 10/10/1999 CR0000900FE
Filing Date
5/25/2000
Description
BIN - Bindover - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/26/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE ORD: O.R. - - WPH/ARR: 05-24-2000/06-02-2000-PIA: 05-10-2000 DEF ATTY: TAYLOR FOX ¢PD!; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION-------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS-------------------------
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.