« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Armijo, Maria
Judge
Case #
Party Name
B Grand Jury - (2)
Relationship
Deft Grand Jury
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Benjamin Matthew Bethel - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
MCNALLY, COLLEEN
Judge
Kreamer
Case #
CR1996-002960-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1996-002960-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Benjamin Matthew Bethel
Crime Date
3/13/1996
Date
7/24/1996
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3415A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Benjamin Matthew Bethel
Crime Date
3/13/1996
Date
7/24/1996
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3405A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Benjamin Matthew Bethel
Crime Date
3/13/1996
Date
6/21/1996
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3408A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Benjamin Matthew Bethel
Crime Date
3/13/1996
Date
7/24/1996
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS/USE
ARSCode
13-3407A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Benjamin Matthew Bethel
Crime Date
3/13/1996
Date
6/21/1996
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3407A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2003
Description
OVJ - Order Vacating Judgment - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/15/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2003
Description
ORD - Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/8/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENIED VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CHARGES
Filing Date
3/13/2003
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/1/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPLICATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND CONVICTION OF GUILT AND RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS
Filing Date
2/19/2003
Description
AVJ - Application to Vacate Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/4/2003
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/5/2001
Description
ORD - Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/5/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTORING CIVIL RIGHTS GRANTED/VACATING JUDGMENT/DISMISS CHARGES DENIED/GUN; RIGHT DENIED
Filing Date
7/27/2001
Description
AVJ - Application to Vacate Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/9/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE JUDGEMENT/DISMISS CHARGES/RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
3/1/2000
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2000
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/3/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2000
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/3/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1997
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/1997
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/17/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1997
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/7/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1997
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/7/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1997
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/18/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 1-28-97
Filing Date
2/5/1997
Description
LET - Letter - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/18/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/1997
Description
PVS - Probation Violation Summons - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/28/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1996
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/23/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY BOND $795 AMWEST SURETY INS CO
Filing Date
8/2/1996
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/6/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/1996
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/2/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/1996 9:23:00 PM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/24/1996 9:23:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
7/24/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/5/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
7/24/1996
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/6/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/1996
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/5/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1996
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1996
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1996
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/1/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/22/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/1/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES & REQUEST FOR NOT OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/17/1996
Description
ORD - Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/1/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS
Filing Date
4/12/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY INTERVIEWS EVIDENCE AND PLEA OFFER
Filing Date
4/1/1996
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/3/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/1996
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/11/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUB DEF 3-29-96
Filing Date
3/29/1996
Description
STA - Statement - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/11/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
P3 FIN/
Filing Date
3/21/1996
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/22/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/1996
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/22/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-5 BOND $795 POSTED
Filing Date
3/20/1996
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/22/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
DR 60-417945 PHX PD DOC: ON OR ABT 03-13-96
Filing Date
3/20/1996
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/22/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/1996
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/22/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: POSSESSION OF DANG DRUGS FOR SALE CL 3 FEL; CT 2: POSSESSION OF DANG DRUGS CL 4 FEL; CT 3: POSSESSION OF NARCOTIC DRUGS FOR SALE CL 2 FEL; CT 4: POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA CL 6 FEL; CT 5: POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA CL 6 FEL
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.