« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TR2013-100836
Judge:
Sears, Elaissia
File Date:
12/31/2012
Location:
West Mesa Justice Court
Case Type:
Criminal Traffic
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Ryan McPhie
Party Name
Christopher John Epp
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Justice Court - General Public Defender
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2012
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
12/31/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/9/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/19/2013
Time
13:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/19/2013
Time
13:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/23/2013
Time
13:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/21/2013
Time
13:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/24/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/26/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.