« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TR2013-066190
Judge:
Riggs, Cathy
File Date:
6/26/2013
Location:
Desert Ridge Justice Court
Case Type:
Criminal Traffic
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Determined To Be
Party Name
SAMUEL E BRNCIK
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Bernardo Garcia
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/19/2013
Time
15:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/29/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/13/2013
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
8/26/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/25/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/19/2014
Time
15:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/6/2014
Time
16:15
Event
Administrative Hearing
Date
1/25/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.