« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TR2012-128195
Judge:
Sears, Elaissia
File Date:
5/25/2012
Location:
West Mesa Justice Court
Case Type:
Criminal Traffic
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Nathaniel O. Whitenburg
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Craig Penrod
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2012
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
5/25/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/6/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/10/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/14/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/11/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/25/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/9/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/11/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/26/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/6/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/6/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/9/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/19/2013
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/19/2013
Time
14:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/28/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/26/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/29/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Trial
Date
4/23/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/26/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/3/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/6/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/9/2013
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/6/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
11/20/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.