« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TR2010-138125
Judge:
Cheuvront, Ken
File Date:
7/20/2010
Location:
Encanto Justice Court
Case Type:
Criminal Traffic
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Desmond Vidal Velasquez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Blaire Griffin
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2010
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
7/20/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/10/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/15/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/8/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/26/2024
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
1/30/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/1/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.