« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TR2007-132204
Judge:
Sama, Jennifer
File Date:
5/17/2007
Location:
El Centro Justice Court
Case Type:
Criminal Traffic
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Chad Arturo Wolter
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2007
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
5/17/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/13/2007
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/9/2007
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/17/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/5/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/11/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/16/2009
Time
16:45
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
5/7/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
5/14/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
3/2/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.