« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
TR2007-118599
Judge:
Watts, Donald
File Date:
3/20/2007
Location:
Manistee Justice Court
Case Type:
Criminal Traffic
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Richard Tracy Parris
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2007
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
3/20/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/25/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/23/2007
Time
8:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/20/2007
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/26/2007
Time
8:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/30/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/12/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/13/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.