« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
JC2012-146910
Judge:
Williams, Gerald
File Date:
8/31/2012
Location:
North Valley Justice Court
Case Type:
Justice Criminal
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Austin Warren Flowers
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2012
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
8/31/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/26/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/9/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/27/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/23/2013
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/8/2014
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/15/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/10/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/9/2014
Time
9:45
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.