« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
JC2008-181510
Judge:
Begay, Deborah
File Date:
12/31/2008
Location:
Moon Valley Justice Court
Case Type:
Justice Criminal
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Determined To Be
Party Name
PAMELA KAY SPEER
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/24/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/14/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/16/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/4/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/29/2010
Time
14:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/7/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/22/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
3/8/2017
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
3/17/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.