« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
JC2006-179510
Judge:
Williams, Gerald
File Date:
12/26/2006
Location:
North Valley Justice Court
Case Type:
Justice Criminal
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Trevor Allen Loyd
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2006
Description
CIT - Citation
Docket Date
12/26/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/10/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/16/2007
Time
9:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/20/2007
Time
13:00
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
3/6/2007
Time
13:00
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
5/21/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/22/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
10/25/2017
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
11/3/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
9/11/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
1/31/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.