« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2017-001831 Judge: Kiley, Daniel
File Date: 3/9/2017 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Robert Burns   Plaintiff  Male  William Richards 
Arizona Public Service Company   Defendant    Mary O'Grady 
Pinnacle West Capital Corporation   Defendant    Mary O'Grady 
Donald Brandt   Defendant  Male  Mary O'Grady 
Tom Forese   Intervenor  Male  Paul Vaporean 
Arizona Corporation Commission   Defendant    Timothy Lasota 
Andy Tobin   Defendant  Male  David Cantelme 
Doug Little   Defendant  Male  Timothy Lasota 
Boyd Dunn   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/12/2018  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel  9/12/2018   
8/28/2018  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  8/30/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL OF RECORD 
8/27/2018  MEM - Memorandum  8/29/2018   
NOTE: COMMISSION DEFENDANTS’ REPLY MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 
8/21/2018  NOT - Notice  8/22/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Errata: Corrected Reply Brief 
8/20/2018  REL - Reply  8/21/2018   
NOTE: Reply Brief in Support of Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 
8/16/2018  NOT - Notice  8/17/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Second Extension of Time to File Reply Supporting Motions to Dismiss 
8/13/2018  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  8/13/2018   
8/6/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/6/2018   
7/31/2018  NOT - Notice  8/2/2018   
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of time to file Reply Supporting Motions to Dismiss 
7/30/2018  RES - Response  8/1/2018   
NOTE: Response to Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 
7/30/2018  RES - Response  8/1/2018   
NOTE: Response to Defendants Arizona Corporation Commission and Commissions Forese, Little, Tobin and Dunn's Motion to Dismiss 
7/19/2018  NOT - Notice  7/20/2018   
NOTE: Rule 7.1(g) Notice of Agreement to Second Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 
7/16/2018  STP - Stipulation  7/17/2018   
NOTE: Rule 7.1 (g) Notice of Agreement To First Extension Of Time For Plaintiff To File Response To Defendants Arizona Corporation Commission and Commissioners Forese, Little, Tobin And Dunn's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 
7/2/2018  NOT - Notice  7/3/2018   
NOTE: Rule 7.1(g) Notice of Agreement to First Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 
7/2/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  7/5/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS ARIZONA CORPORATION COMMISSION AND COMMISSIONERS FORESE, LITTLE, TOBIN, AND DUNN’S MOTION TO DISMISS 
6/25/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  6/26/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 
6/14/2018  NOT - Notice  6/15/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address of Counsel 
6/5/2018  AMC - Amended Complaint  6/7/2018   
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint 
6/5/2018  NOF - Notice Of Filing  6/7/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Filing and Service of Second Amended Complaint 
5/30/2018  005 - ME: Hearing  5/30/2018   
4/23/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  4/23/2018   
4/16/2018  REL - Reply  4/18/2018   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 
4/11/2018  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  4/13/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Disassociation of Attorneys From Firm and Association of New Counsel Within Firm 
4/11/2018  NOT - Notice  4/13/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Disassociation of Attorney From Firm 
4/11/2018  NOT - Notice  4/13/2018   
NOTE: RULE 7.1(g) NOTICE OF AGREEMENT TO SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 
3/28/2018  NOT - Notice  3/29/2018   
NOTE: Rule 7.1(g) Notice of Agreement to First Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 
3/26/2018  RES - Response  3/27/2018   
NOTE: COMMISSION DEFENDANTS’ JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 
3/26/2018  RES - Response  3/27/2018   
NOTE: Response to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 
3/19/2018  REL - Reply  3/21/2018   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Proposed Form of Judgment 
3/6/2018  RES - Response  3/8/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Response and Objection to Notice of Filing of Proposed Judgment Filed by The Arizona Corporation Commission 
3/6/2018  MTA - Motion To Amend  3/8/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 
2/20/2018  NOT - Notice  2/22/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging of Proposed Judgment 
2/16/2018  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  2/16/2018   
1/16/2018  RES - Response  1/17/2018   
NOTE: JOINT JOINDER TO DEFENDANTS ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION, PINNACLE WEST CAPITAL CORPORATION, AND DONALD BRANDT'S RESPONSE TO COMMISSIONER BURN'S NOTICE RE NEW FACTUAL INFORMATION 
1/10/2018  RES - Response  1/11/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Arizona Public Service Corporation, Pinnacle West Capital Corporaiton, and Donald Brandt's Response to Commissioner Burns' Notice re New Factual Information 
1/5/2018  NOT - Notice  1/8/2018   
NOTE: Notice Re: New Factual Information Relevant to Argued Motion to Dismiss 
12/20/2017  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  12/20/2017   
10/24/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  10/24/2017   
10/20/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference  10/20/2017   
10/3/2017  ORD - Order  10/3/2017   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO ADDITIONAL PAGES FOR REPLY 
10/2/2017  REL - Reply  10/3/2017   
NOTE: Reply in support of JOINT Motion to Dismiss FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF 
10/2/2017  REL - Reply  10/3/2017   
NOTE: Defendants Arizona Public Service, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 
9/28/2017  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  9/28/2017   
9/26/2017  NOT - Notice  9/27/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Errata - Correct Exhibit 2 to Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 
9/25/2017  NOT - Notice  9/26/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF 
9/25/2017  NOT - Notice  9/26/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Errata Regarding Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 
9/21/2017  RES - Response  9/22/2017   
NOTE: Response in Opposition to Joint Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim for Relief 
9/20/2017  REL - Reply  9/21/2017   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION TO STAY AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND CONSIDERATION OF SAME 
9/20/2017  RES - Response  9/21/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 
9/18/2017  RES - Response  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Joint Motion to Stay Briefing and Consideration to Same Filed by Defendants Arizona Corporation Commission and Commissioners Tom Forese, Doug Little, Andy Tobin and Boyd Dunn 
9/18/2017  NOT - Notice  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Rule 7.1(g) Notice of Agreement to First Extension of Response and Reply to APS, Pinnacle West and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss and Stipulation to Additional Pages for Reply 
9/18/2017  NOT - Notice  9/20/2017   
NOTE: Rule 7.1(g) Notice of Agreement to First Extension of Response and Reply to the Arizona Corporation Commission, and Commissioners Tom Forese, Doug Little, Andy Tobin, and Boyd Dunn's Motion to Dismiss and Stipulation to Additional Pages for Reply 
9/6/2017  MDJ - Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction  9/8/2017   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATER JRUISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF 
9/6/2017  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  9/8/2017   
NOTE: Joint Report 
9/6/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  9/8/2017   
NOTE: Defendants Arizona Public Service Company, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation and Donald Brandt's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 
9/1/2017  RES - Response  9/6/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE, PINNACLE WEST CAPITAL CORPORATION AND DONALD BRANDT’S RESPONSE TO JOINT MOTION TO STAY AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND CONSIDERATION OF SAME FILED BY DEFENDANTS ARIZONA CORPORATION COMMISSION AND COMMISSIONERS TOM FORESE, DOUG LITTLE, ANDY TOBIN AND BOYD DUNN 
8/30/2017  MOT - Motion  8/31/2017   
NOTE: Joint Motion to Stay and for Expedited Briefing and Consideration of Same Filed by Defendants Arizona Corporation Commission and Commissioners Tom Forese, Doug Little, Andy Tobin and Boyd Dunn 
8/28/2017  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  8/28/2017   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
8/25/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/28/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Andy Tobin/efile billing $239 
8/25/2017  NOT - Notice  8/28/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Association 
8/22/2017  STP - Stipulation  8/23/2017   
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JOINT REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER 
8/15/2017  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service - Defendant Boyd Dunn 
8/15/2017  NOF - Notice Of Filing  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Filing of Acceptance of Service for Defendants Commissioner Tom Forese and Commissioner Boyd Dunn 
8/11/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference  8/11/2017   
8/11/2017  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  8/14/2017   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service - Defendant Tom Forese 
8/10/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/14/2017   
NOTE: ANDY TOBIN 
8/10/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/14/2017   
NOTE: DOUG LITTLE 
8/9/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/14/2017   
NOTE: ARIZONA CORPORATION COMMISSION 
8/7/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  8/7/2017   
8/4/2017  AMC - Amended Complaint  8/7/2017   
NOTE: First Amended Complaint 
8/3/2017  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  8/3/2017   
8/2/2017  NOT - Notice  8/4/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Notice of Clarification Regarding Question at 8/2/2017 Oral Argument Concerning Previous Litigation 
8/1/2017  REL - Reply  8/3/2017   
NOTE: Reply to Plaintiff ROBERT BURNS' Response to TOM Forese's Motion to Intervene for Limited Purpose to Object to Plaintiff's Attempt to Name Him as a Party DEFENDANT 
7/31/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  7/31/2017   
7/31/2017  REL - Reply  8/2/2017   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 
7/26/2017  RES - Response  7/27/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ EMERGENCY MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT 
7/23/2017  NOT - Notice  7/25/2017   
NOTE: Second Notice of Errata re: Proposed First Amended Complaint 
7/23/2017  RES - Response  7/25/2017   
NOTE: Response to Tom Forese's Motion to Intervene for Limited Purpose to Object to Plainitff's Attempt to Name Him as a Party Defendant 
7/20/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  7/20/2017   
7/18/2017  MTI – Motion to Intervene  7/19/2017   
NOTE: TOM FORESE’S MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE TO OBJECT TO PLAINTIFF’S ATTEMPT TO NAME HIM AS A PARTY DEFENDANT - Efile billing $319 
7/11/2017  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  7/11/2017   
7/11/2017  NOT - Notice  7/12/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Errata Regarding Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Complaint 
7/9/2017  MTA - Motion To Amend  7/10/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Complaint 
7/7/2017  NOT - Notice  7/10/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Pending Proceedings Before Arizona Corporation Commission Relevant to July 10, 2017, 1:30 P.M. Status Conference 
5/30/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  5/30/2017   
5/26/2017  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  5/26/2017   
5/23/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  5/23/2017   
5/12/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  5/12/2017   
5/12/2017  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  5/12/2017   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HACE VICE 
5/11/2017  NOT - Notice  5/12/2017   
NOTE: Joint Notice Of Pending Motions 
5/11/2017  REL - Reply  5/13/2017   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SPEEDY HEARING AND EXPEDITED RULING ON DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS PER RULE 57, ARIZ.R.CIV.P. 
5/8/2017  RES - Response  5/10/2017   
NOTE: Response to Emergency Motion for Speedy Hearing and Expedited Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Per Rule 57, Ariz. R. Civ. P. 
5/5/2017  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  5/5/2017   
5/1/2017  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  5/3/2017   
NOTE: Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew E. Price 
5/1/2017  RES - Response  5/3/2017   
NOTE: Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss 
5/1/2017  NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right  5/3/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Judge 
4/26/2017  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  4/26/2017   
4/19/2017  NOT - Notice  4/20/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Response To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss And Emergency Motion For Speedy Hearing And Expedited Ruling On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Per Rule 57, Ariz.R.Civ.P. 
4/18/2017  RES - Response  4/20/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
4/18/2017  MOT - Motion  4/20/2017   
NOTE: Emergency Motion For Speedy Hearing And Expedited Ruling On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Per Rule 57, Ariz.R.Civ.P. 
4/3/2017  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  4/3/2017   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
3/30/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  3/31/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
3/21/2017  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  3/22/2017   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service 
3/17/2017  NOT - Notice  3/20/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Errata And Substitution Regarding Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration 
3/15/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/21/2017   
NOTE: PINNACLE WEST CAPITAL CORPORATION 
3/14/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/21/2017   
NOTE: ARIZONA PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY 
3/10/2017  COM - Complaint  3/13/2017   
3/10/2017  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  3/13/2017   
3/10/2017  CSH - Coversheet  3/13/2017   
3/10/2017  MOT - Motion  3/13/2017   
NOTE: FOR DESIGNATION AS A COMPLEX CASE 
3/10/2017  CER - Certificate  3/13/2017   
NOTE: CERTIFICATION OF COMPLEXITY 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/25/2017  14:00  Oral Argument 
7/10/2017  13:30  Status Conference 
7/19/2017  8:30  Status Conference 
8/2/2017  13:30  Oral Argument 
8/10/2017  14:00  Status Conference 
10/19/2017  9:00  Status Conference 
12/19/2017  9:30  Oral Argument 
5/29/2018  10:00  Oral Argument 
10/5/2018  13:30  Oral Argument 
11/13/2018  14:00  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center