« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2016-016708 Judge: Mroz, Rosa
File Date: 11/4/2016 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Yolanda Daniels   Plaintiff  Female  Sean Berberian 
Lisa Becker   Plaintiff  Female  Sean Berberian 
Arizona Department Of Health Services   Defendant    Aubrey Corcoran 
Cara Christ   Defendant  Female  Aubrey Corcoran 
Doug Ducey   Defendant  Male  Aubrey Corcoran 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/27/2018  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  11/28/2018   
11/27/2018  MAN - Order Of Mandate  11/28/2018   
8/3/2018  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  8/6/2018   
7/26/2018  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  7/27/2018   
7/13/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  7/16/2018   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
7/13/2018  AIX - Appeals Index  7/16/2018   
NOTE: AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
6/27/2018  MEM - Memorandum  6/28/2018   
8/15/2017  LET - Letter  8/16/2017   
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE 
8/14/2017  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  8/15/2017   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
8/14/2017  AIX - Appeals Index  8/15/2017   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
8/14/2017  LET - Letter  8/15/2017   
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE 
8/14/2017  LET - Letter  8/15/2017   
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE 
7/20/2017  NOT - Notice  7/21/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Transcript Order 
7/11/2017  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  7/12/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal-PAID $92.00 RECEIPT 26045753 
6/20/2017  022 - ME: Order Signed  6/20/2017   
6/19/2017  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  6/21/2017   
5/25/2017  NOT - Notice  5/26/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Order AND Judgment of Dismissal 
5/15/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  5/15/2017   
4/12/2017  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/12/2017   
4/11/2017  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  4/11/2017   
3/17/2017  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  3/17/2017   
3/7/2017  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  3/7/2017   
3/2/2017  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance  3/3/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
2/22/2017  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  2/22/2017   
1/10/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  1/10/2017   
1/4/2017  ORD - Order  1/4/2017   
NOTE: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
1/3/2017  REL - Reply  1/4/2017   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS 
1/3/2017  MOT - Motion  1/4/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' Motion to Exceed Page Limit 
12/19/2016  RES - Response  12/21/2016   
NOTE: Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
11/28/2016  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/29/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
11/28/2016  MOT - Motion  11/30/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Exceed Page Limit 
11/23/2016  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  11/23/2016   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
11/22/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/23/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/8/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2016   
NOTE: CARA CHRIST 
11/8/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2016   
NOTE: DOUG DUCEY 
11/8/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2016   
NOTE: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES 
11/8/2016  SUM - Summons  11/10/2016   
11/8/2016  SUM - Summons  11/10/2016   
11/8/2016  SUM - Summons  11/10/2016   
11/4/2016  COM - Complaint  11/8/2016   
11/4/2016  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/8/2016   
11/4/2016  CSH - Coversheet  11/8/2016   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/24/2017  9:30  Oral Argument 
3/10/2017  11:00  Oral Argument 
3/14/2017  10:00  Status Conference 
4/6/2017  10:00  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center