« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2015-051936 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 5/15/2015 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Alfred Pettersen   Plaintiff  Male  Philip Nathanson 
Tarl Robinson   Defendant  Male  Joshua Ernst 
Plexus Holdco L L P   Defendant    Joshua Ernst 
Plexus Holdings Inc   Defendant    Joshua Ernst 
Plexus Worldwide L L P   Defendant    Joshua Ernst 
Plexus Worldwide L L C   Defendant    Joshua Ernst 
Plexus Worldwide Inc   Defendant    Joshua Ernst 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/12/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  12/13/2017   
12/12/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  12/13/2017   
3/29/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  3/30/2017   
3/29/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  3/30/2017   
1/18/2017  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  1/18/2017   
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 
1/12/2017  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  1/13/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 
12/29/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  12/29/2016   
12/19/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  12/19/2016   
12/19/2016  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  12/19/2016   
10/21/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  10/21/2016   
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL 
9/9/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  9/12/2016   
6/21/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  6/22/2016   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
6/21/2016  AIX - Appeals Index  6/22/2016   
6/6/2016  LET - Letter  6/7/2016   
NOTE: FROM COA RE: APPELLANT'S FILING FEE & OPENING BRIEF DUE DATES 
5/6/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/6/2016   
5/3/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  5/3/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE AND PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, DENYING RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION AND OTHER ORDERS ENTERED IN CONNECTION HEREWITH 
5/2/2016  NOT - Notice  5/3/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING FOR SIGNATURE BY THE COURT OF A PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, DENYING RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION AND OTHER ORDERS ENTERED IN CONNECTION THEREWITH.. 
4/29/2016  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  5/2/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Petersen's Notice of Appeal/eFile Billing $92.00 
4/21/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  4/21/2016   
4/15/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  4/18/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A FINDING OF APPEALABILITY 
4/1/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  4/5/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A FINDING OF APPEALABILITY PUSUANT TO ARIZ.R.CIV.P. 54(B),AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION 
4/1/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  4/5/2016   
NOTE: JUDGMENT UNDER ARIZ.R.CIV.P. 54(B) 
4/1/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  4/5/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED JUDGMENT UNDR ARIZ.R.CIV.P. 54(B) 
4/1/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  4/5/2016   
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF ALFRED PETTERSEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A FINDING OF APPEALABILITY 
3/30/2016  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  3/30/2016   
3/28/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  3/28/2016   
3/22/2016  ORD - Order  3/22/2016   
NOTE: IT IS ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendants’ Response to Plaintiffs Application for a Preliminary Injunction until after the Court rules on the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration. If the Court denies the Motion to Compel Arbitration as to the claims that are the subject of Plaintiff’s Application for a Preliminary Injunction, the parties will stipulate to a briefing schedule to complete the briefing on the Application. 
3/21/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  3/23/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 
3/18/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  3/18/2016   
3/18/2016  ORD - Order  3/18/2016   
NOTE: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file their Response to Plaintiff’s Application on or before March, 21, 2016. 
3/17/2016  STP - Stipulation  3/17/2016   
NOTE: StipUlation to Extend Date to File Response to Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction 
3/16/2016  STP - Stipulation  3/16/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Date to File Response to Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction 
3/16/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  3/17/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 
3/4/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set  3/4/2016   
3/4/2016  RES - Response  3/7/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 
3/2/2016  NOT - Notice  3/2/2016   
NOTE: JOINT LIST OF PENDING MOTIONS 
3/1/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  3/3/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SETTING AN ACCELERATED HEARING ON WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE 
2/25/2016  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  2/25/2016   
2/25/2016  NOT - Notice  2/25/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Extension OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION COMPEL ARBITRATION 
2/24/2016  ORD - Order  2/24/2016   
NOTE: ORDER OF TRANSFER TO COMMERCIAL COURT 
2/22/2016  STP - Stipulation  2/22/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Transfer Case to Commercial Court 
2/17/2016  NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar  2/17/2016   
2/5/2016  MTC - Motion To Compel  2/5/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration 
2/5/2016  MTT - Motion To Transfer  2/5/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Transfer to Commercial Court 
2/5/2016  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  2/5/2016   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
1/29/2016  ORD - Order  1/29/2016   
NOTE: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. 
1/29/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
1/7/2016  ORD - Order  1/7/2016   
NOTE: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFF’S PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SAME. 
1/7/2016  ORD - Order  1/8/2016   
NOTE: ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL COURT RECORDS 
1/4/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  1/5/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SAME 
12/31/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  1/4/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HIS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF ASKS FOR ACCELERATED CONSIDERATION OF THIS MOTION. 
12/28/2015  MOT - Motion  12/29/2015   
NOTE: TO SEAL COURT RECORDS 
10/21/2015  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  10/21/2015   
9/8/2015  WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons  9/8/2015   
NOTE: Waiver of Service of Summons ALL DEFENDANTS 
8/19/2015  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  8/19/2015   
5/15/2015  COM - Complaint  5/19/2015   
5/15/2015  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  5/19/2015   
5/15/2015  CSH - Coversheet  5/19/2015   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
3/17/2016  8:30  Hearing 
3/24/2016  13:30  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center