« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2014-009068 Judge: Ash, Lori
File Date: 6/26/2014 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil eFile
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Kylie Steinmetz   Plaintiff  Male  Craig Knapp 
Desirre McCarthy   Plaintiff  Female  Craig Knapp 
State Of Arizona   Defendant    Brock Heathcotte 
Arizona State Forestry Division   Defendant    Brock Heathcotte 
Marcia McKee   Consolidated  Female  Craig Knapp 
Herman O Federwisch   Consolidated  Male  Craig Knapp 
Michael Parrish   Endorsement Case  Male  MICHAEL PARRISH 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/9/2017  MAN - Order Of Mandate  6/15/2017   
6/8/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  6/9/2017   
5/9/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  5/10/2016   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
5/9/2016  AIX - Appeals Index  5/10/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED 
5/3/2016  MEM - Memorandum  5/4/2016   
12/9/2015  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  12/10/2015   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
12/9/2015  AIX - Appeals Index  12/10/2015   
12/9/2015  LET - Letter  12/11/2015   
NOTE: COA/APPELLANTS FILING FEE DUE W/CONSOLIDATED CASES CV2014-009069 AND CV2014-009070 
11/16/2015  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  11/16/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal -- First Amended Notice / E-FILE BILLING $92 
11/5/2015  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  12/3/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal 
10/20/2015  049 - ME: Judgment Signed  10/20/2015   
10/14/2015  JUD - Judgment  10/19/2015   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
9/8/2015  NOT - Notice  9/8/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Revised Proposed Form of Judgment 
8/31/2015  NOT - Notice  8/31/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment 
8/11/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  8/11/2015   
7/28/2015  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  7/28/2015   
5/19/2015  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  5/19/2015   
1/16/2015  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  1/16/2015   
1/15/2015  ORD - Order  1/21/2015   
NOTE: VACATING THE ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN THE CONSOLIDATED STEINMETZ FEDERWISCH AND MCKEE CASES 
1/5/2015  STP - Stipulation  1/6/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESCHEDULE ORAL ARGUMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS 
12/3/2014  053 - ME: Case Consolidation  12/3/2014   
12/3/2014  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  12/3/2014   
11/26/2014  339 - ME: 100 Day Notice  11/26/2014   
10/31/2014  REL - Reply  11/4/2014   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS 
10/21/2014  NOT - Notice  10/21/2014   
NOTE: Rule 7.1(g)Notice of Second Extension of Time to File Memoranda 
10/6/2014  MEM - Memorandum  10/7/2014   
NOTE: JOINT RULE 16.3(a) MEMORANDUM 
9/29/2014  RES - Response  9/30/2014   
NOTE: Response to Motion to Dismiss 
9/15/2014  RES - Response  9/16/2014   
NOTE: RESPONSE BY THE STEINMETZ, FEDERWISCH, AND McKEE PLAINTIFFS TO THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOUR CASES: CV 2014-009068, CV 2014-009069, CV 2014-009070, AND CV 2014-009160, PURSUANT TO RULE 42(a), ARCP 
8/29/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  8/29/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
8/29/2014  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  9/2/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOUR CASES: CV2014-009068, CV2014-009069, CV2014-009070, AND CV2014-009160, PURSUANT TO RULE 42(a), ARCP 
8/28/2014  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  8/28/2014   
8/28/2014  CME - Credit Memo  8/29/2014   
NOTE: Credit Memo GORDON ACRI COMPLEX FEE $500.00 
8/22/2014  325 ME: Case Reassignment / Complex Designation  8/22/2014   
8/22/2014  NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right  8/22/2014   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE 
8/14/2014  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  8/14/2014   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
8/11/2014  MOT - Motion  8/12/2014   
NOTE: Joint Motion for Complex Civil Litigation Designation 
8/11/2014  NOT - Notice  8/12/2014   
NOTE: Rule 7.1(g) Notice of First Extension of Time to File Memoranda 
7/10/2014  SUM - Summons  7/14/2014   
7/10/2014  SUM - Summons  7/14/2014   
7/10/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/22/2014   
NOTE: ARIZONA STATE FORESTRY DIVISION 
7/10/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/22/2014   
NOTE: Served State of Arizona 7/9/2014 
6/26/2014  COM - Complaint  6/27/2014   
6/26/2014  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  6/27/2014   
6/26/2014  CSH - Coversheet  6/27/2014   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/27/2015  9:30  Oral Argument 
5/22/2015  13:30  Oral Argument 
7/24/2015  13:30  Oral Argument 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
10/14/2015  A:     One Time  Judgment Only   
click here for Law Library Resource Center