« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2013-016621 Judge: Martin, Daniel
File Date: 12/21/2013 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Maraen Foley   Plaintiff  Female  J Taber 
Roman Catholic Church Of The Diocese Of Phoenix, The   Defendant    Keith Ricker 
Thomas J Olmsted   Defendant  Male  Keith Ricker 
Patrick Robinson   Defendant  Male  Keith Ricker 
Blessed Sacrament Roman Catholic Parish Scottsdale   Defendant    Keith Ricker 
Allison Griffeth   Intervenor  Female  Ilya Lerma 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/24/2017  047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal  1/24/2017   
11/4/2016  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  11/4/2016   
10/31/2016  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  11/1/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF GRIFFETH'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: ECKERSON 
10/10/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  10/10/2016   
9/29/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  9/29/2016   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
9/12/2016  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  9/12/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice 
9/8/2016  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  9/8/2016   
8/25/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue  8/25/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Griffeth's Motion (1) to Continue on Active Calendar; (2) Schedule Mandatory Settlement Conference; (3) Schedule Trial Setting Conference 
8/25/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  8/25/2016   
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (FOLEY) 
8/24/2016  NOT - Notice  8/25/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ALLISON GRIFFETH’S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANT BRANDON T. ECKERSON 
8/22/2016  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  8/23/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice (Foley) 
7/19/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  7/19/2016   
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 
7/19/2016  331 - ME: Settlement Conference  7/19/2016   
7/18/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  7/18/2016   
7/15/2016  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  7/15/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 
7/12/2016  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  7/12/2016   
7/8/2016  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  7/11/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement 
7/7/2016  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  7/8/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement (Foley) 
7/5/2016  RES - Response  7/5/2016   
NOTE: Defendants Response to Plaintiff Foleys Seventh Motion to Compel 
7/5/2016  RES - Response  7/6/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs Eight Motion to Compel 
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
7/1/2016  EMF - Email Filed  7/5/2016   
6/30/2016  SOF - Statement Of Facts  7/1/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Foley's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Finding She Was Sexually Assaulted 
6/30/2016  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  7/1/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Foleys Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Finding She Was Sexually Assaulted 
6/29/2016  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  6/29/2016   
NOTE: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re E-Mails/Investigation 
6/21/2016  MTQ - Motion To Quash  6/22/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition of Catherine Ecklund 
6/17/2016  STA - Statement  6/17/2016   
NOTE: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF JASON COVAULT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S FIRST MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANTS MR. AND MRS. ECKERSON 
6/17/2016  MTC - Motion To Compel  6/17/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S FIRST MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANTS MR. AND MRS. ECKERSON 
6/17/2016  MTC - Motion To Compel  6/20/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S SEVENTH MOTION TO COMPEL: REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION REGARDING CHURCH’S NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NOTICE OF NEED FOR SUPERVISION  
6/17/2016  STA - Statement  6/20/2016   
NOTE: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF JASON COVAULT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S SEVENTH MOTION TO COMPEL AGAINST CHURCH: REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION REGARDING CHURCH’S NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NOTICE OF NEED FOR SUPERVISION 
6/17/2016  MTC - Motion To Compel  6/20/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S EIGHTH MOTION TO COMPEL AGAINST CHURCH: WITNESS INFORMATION UNDER RULE 26.1 
6/17/2016  STA - Statement  6/20/2016   
NOTE: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF JASON COVAULT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S EIGHTH MOTION TO COMPEL: WITNESS INFORMATION UNDER RULE 26.1 
6/15/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  6/15/2016   
6/13/2016  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  6/13/2016   
6/7/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  6/7/2016   
6/7/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  6/7/2016   
NOTE: DOCUMENTS REVIEWED IN-CAMERA 
6/3/2016  CER - Certificate  6/6/2016   
NOTE: CertificAte of Good Faith 
6/3/2016  MTQ - Motion To Quash  6/6/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition 
5/26/2016  377 – Case on Dismissal Calendar – Partial  5/26/2016   
5/18/2016  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  5/19/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement 
5/5/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/5/2016   
5/5/2016  SDO - Order to Seal Documents  5/5/2016   
NOTE: COPIES OF RECORDS FOR REVIEW BY JUDGE STARR 
5/4/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  5/4/2016   
4/28/2016  ORD - Order  4/28/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY PERIOD TO COMPLETE PENDING DEPOSITIONS 
4/25/2016  STP - Stipulation  4/26/2016   
NOTE: Stipulated Extension Of Discovery Period To Complete Pending Depositions 
4/25/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  4/25/2016   
4/22/2016  ANS - Answer  4/25/2016   
NOTE: Answer to Third Amended Complaint on Behalf of Defendants The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Phoenix, The Most Rev. Thomas J. Olmsted, Rev. Patrick Robinson Assigned to the Honorable Patricia Starr 
4/22/2016  SDO - Order to Seal Documents  4/25/2016   
NOTE: CD IN PLASTIC CASE AND ATTACHED DOCUMENT 
4/15/2016  AMC - Amended Complaint  4/18/2016   
NOTE: THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Negligence, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress) 
4/11/2016  RES - Response  4/11/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Allison Griffeth's Joinder in Plaintiff Foley's Response to Defendants' Objection to Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition 
4/11/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/15/2016   
4/11/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/15/2016   
4/8/2016  RES - Response  4/11/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF FOLEY’S RULE 30(b)(6) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION 
4/8/2016  REP - Report  4/11/2016   
NOTE: Report to the Court 
4/6/2016  EMF - Email Filed  4/7/2016   
4/4/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  4/4/2016   
4/1/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  4/4/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF FOLEY'S RULE 30(b)(6) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION 
3/31/2016  NOT - Notice  4/1/2016   
NOTE: E-MAIL FROM KEITH RICKER 
3/29/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/29/2016   
3/25/2016  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  3/25/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Reconsider 
3/21/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  3/21/2016   
3/16/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  3/16/2016   
3/10/2016  REL - Reply  3/10/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Foleys Reply in Support of Motion For Leave to File The Third Amended Complaint 
3/5/2016  RES - Response  3/7/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ALLISON GRIFFETH’S JOINDER IN PLAINTIFF MARAEN FOLEY’S RESPONSE TO CHURCH’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO BLOCK DEPOSITION OF NAMED DEFENDANT BISHOP OLMSTED & SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE THERETO 
3/4/2016  NOT - Notice  3/4/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
3/4/2016  RES - Response  3/4/2016   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Plaintiff Foley's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint 
3/2/2016  REL - Reply  3/2/2016   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order re Bishop Olmsted 
2/25/2016  RES - Response  2/25/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF FOLEY’S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO CHURCH’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OPPOSING DEPOSITION BISHOP OLMSTED 
2/23/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  2/23/2016   
2/22/2016  005 - ME: Hearing  2/22/2016   
2/17/2016  MOT - Motion  2/18/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Foleys Motion For Leave to File The Third Amended Complaint 
2/17/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/18/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LIMITED-SCOPE APPEARANCE FOR NON-PARTY WITNESS 
2/17/2016  RES - Response  2/18/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF FOLEY’S RESPONSE TO CHURCH’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO BLOCK DEPOSITION OF NAMED DEFENDANT BISHOP OLMSTED 
2/17/2016  REL - Reply  2/18/2016   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S FIFTH MOTION TO COMPEL: RESPONSES TO ALL AGREED UPON REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 
2/11/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  2/11/2016   
2/10/2016  RES - Response  2/10/2016   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF FOLEY'S FIFTH MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO ALL AGREED UPON REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
2/5/2016  022 - ME: Order Signed  2/5/2016   
2/4/2016  REL - Reply  2/5/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S COMBINED REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF THIRD AND FOURTH MOTIONS TO COMPEL: DEPOSITIONS OF DENNIS NAUGHTON AND MARIANNE CANNING 
2/4/2016  REL - Reply  2/5/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO MOTION TO CONTACT MS. JESSIE HENDRICKS TO SCHEDULE DEPOSITION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 
2/3/2016  RES - Response  2/3/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff Foley's Motion for Rule 56(f) Relief re: Respondeat Superior 
2/3/2016  RES - Response  2/3/2016   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RULE 56(F) RELIEF – MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: NEGLIGENT HIRING/RETENTION/SUPERVISION 
2/3/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  2/3/2016   
2/2/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  2/2/2016   
2/2/2016  MOT - Motion  2/2/2016   
NOTE: Motion for Protective Order 
2/2/2016  SOF - Statement Of Facts  2/2/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Supplement to Omnibus Statement of Facts Assigned to the Honorable Patricia Starr 
2/2/2016  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  2/2/2016   
NOTE: Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of DIOCESE OF PHOENIX AND BISHOP OLMSTED 
2/2/2016  CER - Certificate  2/2/2016   
NOTE: Certificate of Good Faith 
2/2/2016  MOT - Motion  2/2/2016   
NOTE: Motion for Expedited Ruling 
2/1/2016  SCO – Scheduling Order  2/2/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED 
1/29/2016  MOT - Motion  1/29/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF FOLEY’S MOTION FOR RULE 56(f) RELIEF AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: RESPONDEAT SUPERIOR AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
1/29/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  1/29/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF FOLEY’S OBJECTIONS TO THE CHURCH’S OMNIBUS STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFF’S CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS 
1/29/2016  NOT - Notice  2/3/2016   
NOTE: E-MAIL FROM JOHN SLONE 
1/25/2016  RES - Response  1/26/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CONTACT MS. JESSIE HENDRICKS/ RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PREVENTING CHURCH FROM CONTACTING MS. HENDRICKS TO DISCUSS SUBSTANTIVE ISSUES 
1/22/2016  MOT - Motion  1/25/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF FOLEY’S MOTION FOR RULE 56(f) RELIEF AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: NEGLIGENT HIRING, RETENTION AND SUPERVISION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
1/22/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  1/25/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF FOLEY’S OBJECTIONS TO THE CHURCH’S OMNIBUS STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFF’S CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS 
1/21/2016  REL - Reply  1/21/2016   
NOTE: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF GRIFFETH'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER/JOINDER IN PLAINTIFF FOLEY'S RESPONSE 
1/20/2016  MTC - Motion To Compel  1/20/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S FIFTH MOTION TO COMPEL: RESPONSES TO ALL AGREED UPON REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
1/20/2016  STA - Statement  1/20/2016   
NOTE: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF JASON COVAULT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S FIFTH MOTION TO COMPEL: RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 
1/19/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  1/19/2016   
1/19/2016  MTC - Motion To Compel  1/20/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff Allison Griffeth's Joinder in Plaintiff Maraen Foley's Second Motion to Compel: Requesting Church's Privilege Log and Reply Thereto 
1/14/2016  NOF - Notice Of Filing  1/14/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Filiing Supplemental Authority IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF FOLEY'S THIRD AND FOURTH MOTIONS TO COMPEL 
1/8/2016  RES - Response  1/11/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff Foley's Third and Fourth Motions to Compel 
1/7/2016  RES - Response  1/8/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF GRIFFETH'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; JOINDER IN (FOLEY) RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 
12/31/2015  RES - Response  12/31/2015   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Scheduling Order 
12/18/2015  NOT - Notice  12/18/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Rule 35 Psychological Evaluation 
12/15/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference  12/15/2015   
12/3/2015  NOT - Notice  12/3/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Firm Address 
11/25/2015  SOF - Statement Of Facts  11/25/2015   
NOTE: Omnibus Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment  
11/25/2015  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  11/25/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Respondeat Superior 
11/6/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/6/2015   
11/4/2015  NOT - Notice  11/5/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Law Firm Change 
10/21/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  10/21/2015   
10/12/2015  REP - Report  10/12/2015   
NOTE: Updated Status Report 
10/1/2015  REP - Report  10/1/2015   
NOTE: Status Report 
9/28/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/28/2015   
9/23/2015  NOT - Notice  9/23/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ALLISON GRIFFETH’S NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION TO RESETTING ORAL ARGUMENT CURRENTLY SET FOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2015 
9/18/2015  NOT - Notice  9/18/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MARAEN FOLEY’S NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION TO RESETTING ORAL ARGUMENT CURRENTLY SET FOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2015 
9/18/2015  RES - Response  9/18/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MARAEN FOLEY’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO PENDING MOTIONS AND MOTION FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 
9/18/2015  MOT - Motion  9/21/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CONTACT MS. JESSIE HENDRICKS TO SCHEDULE DEPOSITION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PREVENTING CHURCH FROM CONTACTING MS. HENDRICKS TO DISCUSS SUBSTANTIVE ISSUES 
9/17/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/17/2015   
9/16/2015  MOT - Motion  9/16/2015   
NOTE: Motion Requesting Additional Time to Respond to Pending Motions 
9/14/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  9/14/2015   
9/14/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  9/14/2015   
9/14/2015  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  9/15/2015   
NOTE: Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Negligent Hiring, Retention and Supervision 
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/11/2015  EMF - Email Filed  9/14/2015   
9/8/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  9/8/2015   
9/4/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  9/4/2015   
9/4/2015  RES - Response  9/4/2015   
NOTE: Response to Defendants Motion for Protective Order 
9/4/2015  STA - Statement  9/4/2015   
NOTE: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF JASON COVAULT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DENNIS NAUGHTON 
9/4/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  9/4/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel: Deposition of Dennis Naughton 
9/4/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  9/4/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Fourth Motion to Compel: Deposition of Marianne Canning 
9/4/2015  STA - Statement  9/4/2015   
NOTE: Separate Statement of Jason Covault in Support of Plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Compel: Depsition of Marianne Canning 
9/3/2015  RES - Response  9/3/2015   
NOTE: Response to Defendants Motion to Compel Records of Prior Counseling 
8/31/2015  CER - Certificate  8/31/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ALLISON GRIFFETH’S (ONTROVER1 ING RILE 37( )(2)(() CERTIFiCATE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION To I)EFEDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL RECORDS OF PRIOR COUNSELING  
8/28/2015  RES - Response  8/28/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ALLISON GRIFFETH’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL RECORDS OF PRIOR COUNSELING 
8/24/2015  REL - Reply  8/24/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL: REQUESTING CHURCH’S PRIVILEGE LOG 
8/19/2015  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  8/19/2015   
8/18/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/19/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Compel Records of Prior Counseling 
8/18/2015  MOT - Motion  8/18/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Protective Order 
8/17/2015  REL - Reply  8/17/2015   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL CHURCH’S EMAILS IDENTIFIED IN PRIVILEGE LOG DATED JUNE 30, 2015 
8/10/2015  RES - Response  8/10/2015   
NOTE: Response to Plaintiff Foley's Second Motion to Compel: Requesting Church's Privilege Log 
8/10/2015  STA - Statement  8/10/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS KELSEY ZUTZ AND ELITE PUSH MODELS, LLC’S MOTION TO STAY ACTION 
8/6/2015  STA - Statement  8/6/2015   
NOTE: Separate Statement of Jason Covault in Support of Motion to Compel Churchs Privilege Log Dated June 30 2015 
8/5/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/5/2015   
8/3/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/3/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ALLISON GRIFFETH’S JOINDER IN PLAINTIFF MARAEN FOLEY’S MOTION TO COMPEL CHURCH’S EMAILS IDENTIFIED IN PRIVILEGE LOG DATE JUNE 30, 2015 
8/3/2015  RES - Response  8/4/2015   
NOTE: Response to Plaintiff Foley's Motion to Compel Church's E-Mails IDENTIFIED IN PRIVILEGE LOG DATED JUNE 30, 2015 
7/29/2015  RES - Response  7/29/2015   
NOTE: Response to Invocation of Victim's Bill of Rights 
7/28/2015  NOT - Notice  7/28/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF ALLISON GRIFFETH’S INVOCATION OF THE ARIZONA VICTIMS’ BILL OF RIGHTS 
7/28/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  7/28/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Compel Churchs Emails Identified in Privilege Log DATED JUNE 30, 2015 
7/28/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  7/28/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Requesting Churchs Privilege Log 
7/23/2015  NOT - Notice  7/23/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF MARAEN FOLEY’S INVOCATION OF THE ARIZONA VICTIMS’ BILL OF RIGHTS TO REFUSE DEFENDANTS REQUESTED PSYCHOLOGICAL IME 
7/20/2015  RES - Response  7/20/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Joint Response to Defendant's Roman Catholic CHurch and Diocese of Phoenix (the "Diocese") Motion to Expedite 
7/20/2015  REL - Reply  7/20/2015   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ALLOW PSYCHOLGICAL TESTING 
7/13/2015  RES - Response  7/13/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL TESTING AND CROSS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 
7/1/2015  REQ - Request  7/1/2015   
NOTE: Defendants Request for Expedited Ruling 
6/30/2015  NOT - Notice  7/1/2015   
NOTE: Defendants' Privilege Log 
6/24/2015  MOT - Motion  6/24/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Allow Testing for Psychological Evaluations 
6/24/2015  CER - Certificate  6/24/2015   
NOTE: Certificate of Good Faith 
6/17/2015  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  6/17/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL 
6/16/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/16/2015   
6/16/2015  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  6/16/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel 
6/2/2015  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  6/2/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel 
3/18/2015  SCO – Scheduling Order  3/18/2015   
NOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER 
3/13/2015  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  3/16/2015   
NOTE: Joint Rule 16 Report (Standard Case) 
1/20/2015  053 - ME: Case Consolidation  1/20/2015   
1/14/2015  ORD - Order  1/20/2015   
NOTE: GRANTING INETERVENOR ALLISION GRIFFETHS MOTION TO INTERVENE, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 
1/8/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  1/8/2015   
1/6/2015  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  1/7/2015   
NOTE: Eckersons' Joinder in Opposition to Intervene or Consolidate 
12/30/2014  RES - Response  12/30/2014   
NOTE: PLAINITFF Marian Foley's Response in Support of Intervenor's Motion to Intervene; Motion to Consolidate 
12/30/2014  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  12/30/2014   
NOTE: Intervenor's Reply in Support of Her Motion to Intervene; Motion to Consolidate 
12/17/2014  RES - Response  12/18/2014   
NOTE: Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene/Motion to Consolidate 
12/8/2014  MTI – Motion to Intervene  12/9/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Intervene; Motion to Consolidate / EFILE BILLING $319.00 
9/19/2014  SCO – Scheduling Order  9/19/2014   
NOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER 
9/16/2014  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  9/17/2014   
NOTE: Joint Report 
9/10/2014  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  9/22/2014   
NOTE: BLESSED SACRAMENT ROMAN CATHOLIC PARISH SCOTTSDALE 
9/10/2014  SUM - Summons  9/18/2014   
9/9/2014  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  9/10/2014   
NOTE: Amended Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration 
9/9/2014  ANS - Answer  9/10/2014   
NOTE: ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH OF THE DIOCESE OF PHOENIX, THE MOST REV. THOMAS J. OLMSTED, REV. PATRICK ROBINSON 
9/9/2014  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  9/10/2014   
NOTE: AMENDED DEMAND FOR TRIAL JURY BY JURY 
8/29/2014  AMC - Amended Complaint  9/2/2014   
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint 
8/22/2014  ORD - Order  8/22/2014   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2nd AMENDED COMPLAINT 
8/13/2014  339 - ME: 100 Day Notice  8/13/2014   
7/21/2014  MTA - Motion To Amend  7/22/2014   
NOTE: Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint 
6/17/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  6/17/2014   
5/28/2014  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  5/28/2014   
4/30/2014  ANS - Answer  4/30/2014   
NOTE: Answer of Eckersons/Efile billing $222.00 
4/15/2014  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  4/16/2014   
NOTE: Demand for Trial by Jury 
4/15/2014  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  4/16/2014   
NOTE: Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration 
4/15/2014  ANS - Answer  4/16/2014   
NOTE: Answer on Behalf of Defendants The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Phoenix, The Most Rev. Thomas J. Olmsted, Rev. Patrick Robinson / efile billing $222 
3/31/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/3/2014   
NOTE: BRANDON T ECKERSON AND LISA ECKERSON 
3/31/2014  SUM - Summons  4/2/2014   
3/27/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/2/2014   
NOTE: AMENDED REV. PATRICK ROBINSON 3/25/14 
3/27/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/2/2014   
NOTE: AMENDED THE MOST REV. THOMAS J. OLMSTED 3/25/14 
3/26/2014  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  3/26/2014   
3/26/2014  SUM - Summons  3/31/2014   
3/26/2014  SUM - Summons  3/31/2014   
3/26/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/2/2014   
NOTE: THE MOST REV. THOMAS J OLMSTED 3/24/14 
3/26/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/2/2014   
NOTE: PATRICK ROBINSON 
3/25/2014  SUM - Summons  3/26/2014   
3/25/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/1/2014   
NOTE: THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH OF THE DIOCESE OF PHOENIX 
1/21/2014  AMC - Amended Complaint  1/22/2014   
NOTE: 1st Amended Complaint 
12/21/2013  COM - Complaint  12/23/2013   
12/21/2013  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  12/23/2013   
12/21/2013  CSH - Coversheet  12/23/2013   
12/21/2013  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  12/23/2013   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/15/2015  14:30  Oral Argument 
6/22/2015  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/14/2015  11:00  Oral Argument 
9/30/2015  9:00  Oral Argument 
12/11/2015  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
1/29/2016  8:45  Status Conference 
1/29/2016  16:00  Status Conference 
2/5/2016  9:00  Status Conference 
2/18/2016  9:00  Oral Argument 
3/24/2016  10:00  Status Conference 
6/9/2016  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
7/6/2016  11:15  Settlement Conference 
9/2/2016  8:45  Pre-Trial Conference 
10/3/2016  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
11/2/2016  9:00  Status Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center