« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2013-015308
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Sinclair
File Date:
11/25/2013
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Northeast Healthcare Recruitment Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Kenneth Frakes
Party Name
Sun Valley Medical Group P C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2014
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2014
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
3/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2014
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
3/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
3/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sum Certain Declaration
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF AWARD OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Statement of Costs
Filing Date
1/13/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/7/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR
ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/7/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application and Affidavit for Motion for Default
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUN VALLEY MEDICAL GROUP PC
Filing Date
11/25/2013
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2013
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
11/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2013
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
11/26/2013
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
3/3/2014
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Northeast Healthcare Recruitment Inc
A: Sun Valley Medical Group P C
A: Sun Valley Medical Group P C
Amount
$1,303.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
3/3/2014
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Northeast Healthcare Recruitment Inc
A: Sun Valley Medical Group P C
A: Sun Valley Medical Group P C
Amount
$486.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
3/3/2014
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Northeast Healthcare Recruitment Inc
A: Sun Valley Medical Group P C
A: Sun Valley Medical Group P C
Amount
$36,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status