« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2012-055129 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Blakey
File Date: 10/19/2012 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Plattner Schneidman Schneider & Jeffries P C   Plaintiff    Jamin Carnahan 
R & R Surplus Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
R & R Surplus-Dallas Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
R & R Surplus-Arizona Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Joe-Fizz L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
D K A L, L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Steven Rosenstein   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Andrea Rosenstein   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/2/2013  047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal  10/2/2013   
3/27/2013  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  3/27/2013   
11/7/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/14/2012   
NOTE: R&R SURPLUS-DALLAS INC 
11/7/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/14/2012   
NOTE: STEVEN ROSENSTEIN 
11/7/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2012   
NOTE: ANDREA ROSENSTEIN 
11/7/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2012   
NOTE: R&R SURPLUS INC 
11/7/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2012   
NOTE: JOE-FIZZ LLC 
11/7/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2012   
NOTE: DKAL LLC 
11/7/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2012   
NOTE: R&R SURPLUS-ARIZONA INC 
10/19/2012  COM - Complaint  10/22/2012   
10/19/2012  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/22/2012   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Self-Service Center